Reporters Comm. for Freedom of the Press v. United States
Petitioner / Appellant: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Respondent / Appellee: United States of America
Case Number: 22-3326
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press - w/service 11/21/2022. [5219906] [22-3326] (MKG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 02:46 PM]
November 21, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press - Joint Appendix - w/service 11/21/2022 [5219912] [22-3326] (MKG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 02:49 PM]
November 21, 2022 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/26/2023, for extension of time to file Joint Appendix until 01/26/2023[5219922], filed by Attorney Ms. Megan K. Graham for Appellant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press w/service 11/21/2022. [5219922] [22-3326] (MKG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 02:53 PM]
November 21, 2022 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5219922-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief and joint appendix filed by Ms. Megan K. Graham. Brief of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press due 01/26/2023. Appendix due on 01/26/2023. [5220021] [22-3326] (AT) [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:20 PM]
November 14, 2022 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. - FOR CAL [5217640] [22-3326] (MKG) [Entered: 11/14/2022 02:32 PM]
November 14, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Megan Graham for Appellant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press w/service 11/14/2022 [5217631] [22-3326] (MKG) [Entered: 11/14/2022 02:23 PM]
November 9, 2022 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #52 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/21/2022, No. of Pgs.: 53, Court Reporter: Richter, Paula [5216381] [22-3326] (STL) [Entered: 11/09/2022 08:48 AM]
November 9, 2022 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Status Conference - District Court document #33 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Cony on File], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/22/2021, No. of Pgs.: 31, Court Reporter: Beauvais, Debra [5216380] [22-3326] (STL) [Entered: 11/09/2022 08:45 AM]
November 9, 2022 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Status Conference - District Court document #26 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 02/24/2021, No. of Pgs.: 16, Court Reporter: Beauvais, Debra [5216377] [22-3326] (STL) [Entered: 11/09/2022 08:42 AM]
November 7, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, Order filed 10/11/2022, Judgment filed 10/12/2022, and Notice of Appeal filed 11/4/2022. [5215362] [22-3326] (CBO) [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:05 AM]
November 7, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 12/19/2022. Appendix due 12/27/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press due 12/27/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5215365] [22-3326] (CBO) [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:07 AM]
November 7, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5215356] [22-3326] (CBO) [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Reporters Comm. for Freedom of the Press v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Represented By: Megan K. Graham
Represented By: Mary ("Leita") A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: David W. Fuller
Represented By: Kimberly A. Svendsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?