United States v. Calvin Wedington
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Calvin Scott Wedington
Case Number: 22-3360
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5232503-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Robin M. Wolpert. Brief of Calvin Scott Wedington due 04/03/2023. Appendix due on 04/03/2023. No further extensions will be granted. [5232536] [22-3360] (CNL) [Entered: 01/04/2023 10:54 AM]
January 4, 2023 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/03/2023, filed by Attorney Ms. Robin M. Wolpert for Appellant Mr. Calvin Scott Wedington w/service 01/04/2023. [5232503] [22-3360] (RMW) [Entered: 01/04/2023 10:16 AM]
January 3, 2023 ****DOCUMENT LOCKED****APPEARANCE filed by Robin M. Wolpert for Appellant Mr. Calvin Scott Wedington w/service 01/03/2023 [5232255] [22-3360]--[Edited 01/03/2023 by CNL] APPEARANCE REFILED [ # 5232271-2 ] WITH CORRECTED CONTACT INFORMATION. NDA RESENT. (RMW) [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:17 PM]
January 3, 2023 APPEARANCE filed by Robin M. Wolpert for Appellant Mr. Calvin Scott Wedington w/service 01/03/2023 [5232271] [22-3360]--[Edited 01/03/2023 by CNL. Modified to correct docket text. NDA resent.] (RMW) [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:34 PM]
December 28, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: On the courts own motion, the briefing schedule has been revised and deadlines extended. Appendix due on 01/27/2023. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Calvin Scott Wedington due 01/27/2023. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5230839] [22-3360] (MMH) [Entered: 12/28/2022 11:43 AM]
December 28, 2022 CLERK ORDER: Appointing Ms. Robin M. Wolpert for Calvin Scott Wedington under the Criminal Justice Act, nunc pro tunc to November 10, 2022. [5230802] [22-3360] (MMH) [Entered: 12/28/2022 10:58 AM]
November 16, 2022 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Motions Hearing - District Court document #241 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/05/2022, No. of Pgs.: 210, Court Reporter: Simpson, Lori Ann [5218307] [22-3360] (STL) [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:28 AM]
November 15, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Erin M. Secord for Appellee United States of America w/service 11/15/2022 [5218021] [22-3360] (ES) [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:20 PM]
November 10, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, SEALED Report and Recommendation 8/9/22, SEALED Order adopting R&R 10/27/22, and Judgment 10/28/22 [5216963] [22-3360] (MMH) [Entered: 11/10/2022 11:02 AM]
November 10, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Calvin Scott Wedington due 12/20/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5216974] [22-3360] (MMH) [Entered: 11/10/2022 11:07 AM]
November 10, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5216948] [22-3360] (MMH) [Entered: 11/10/2022 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Calvin Wedington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Erin Secord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin Scott Wedington
Represented By: Calvin Scott Wedington
Represented By: Robin M. Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?