Thomas Brewer v. United States
Plaintiff / Appellant: Thomas Joseph Brewer
Respondent / Appellee: United States of America
Case Number: 22-3452
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5233385-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Molly C. Quinn. Brief of Thomas Joseph Brewer due 01/30/2023. Appendix due on 01/30/2023. [5233428] [22-3452] (HAG) [Entered: 01/06/2023 11:33 AM]
January 6, 2023 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/30/2023, filed by Attorney Ms. Molly C. Quinn for Appellant Mr. Thomas Joseph Brewer w/service 01/06/2023. [5233385] [22-3452] (MCQ) [Entered: 01/06/2023 10:34 AM]
December 13, 2022 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas Joseph Brewer. w/service 12/13/2022 [5226705] [22-3452] (MCQ) [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:05 AM]
December 13, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas Joseph Brewer - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/13/2022 [5226708] [22-3452] (MCQ) [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:08 AM]
December 13, 2022 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas Joseph Brewer - w/service 12/13/2022. [5226710] [22-3452] (MCQ) [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:10 AM]
December 5, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Molly C. Quinn for Appellant Mr. Thomas Joseph Brewer w/service 12/05/2022 [5224051] [22-3452] (RS) [Entered: 12/05/2022 05:03 PM]
November 30, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/09/2023. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Thomas Joseph Brewer due 01/09/2023. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5222517] [22-3452] (ASL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 02:10 PM]
November 30, 2022 UPDATED fee status - from pending to IFP. [Case Number 22-3452: In Forma Pauperis] [5222513] [22-3452] (ASL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 02:04 PM]
November 30, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 11/30/2022 granting IFP on appeal, [5222511] [22-3452] (ASL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 02:00 PM]
November 28, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order filed 9/13/2022, Judgment filed 9/13/2022, Memorandum and Order (granting COA) filed 11/23/2022, and docket entries, [5221592] [22-3452] (ASL) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:40 PM]
November 28, 2022 CLERK ORDER: The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5221597] [22-3452] (ASL) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:41 PM]
November 28, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Kevin Koliner for Appellee United States of America w/service 11/28/2022 [5221607] [22-3452] (KK) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:49 PM]
November 28, 2022 Prisoner case docketed. [5221574] [22-3452] (ASL) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Thomas Brewer v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Joseph Brewer
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Brewer
Represented By: Molly C. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Koliner
Represented By: Benjamin Patterson
Represented By: Gregg Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?