Antoine Williams v. United States
Petitioner / Appellant: Antoine Williams
Respondent / Appellee: United States of America
Case Number: 22-3558
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5240670-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Nova D. Janssen. Brief of Antoine Williams due 02/28/2023. Appendix due on 02/28/2023. [5240687] [22-3558] (CNL) [Entered: 01/31/2023 10:13 AM]
January 31, 2023 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/28/2023, filed by Attorney Ms. Nova D. Janssen for Appellant Mr. Antoine Williams w/service 01/31/2023. [5240670] [22-3558] (NDJ) [Entered: 01/31/2023 09:48 AM]
January 5, 2023 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Antoine Williams - Separate Appendix - w/service 01/05/2023 [5233086] [22-3558] (NDJ) [Entered: 01/05/2023 12:52 PM]
December 30, 2022 RECORD FILED - SEALED PSI REPORT, 1 volumes, Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies of Sealed PSI Report, Addendum, and Sentencing Worksheet, Source Location: USDC / NI [5231557] [22-3558] (STL) [Entered: 12/30/2022 11:58 AM]
December 27, 2022 LETTER from Appellant Mr. Antoine Williams regarding substitution of counsel. w/service 12/27/2022 [5230287] [22-3558] (NDJ) [Entered: 12/27/2022 10:15 AM]
December 23, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Nova Janssen for Appellant Mr. Antoine Williams w/service 12/23/2022 [5230037] [22-3558] (NDJ) [Entered: 12/23/2022 10:05 AM]
December 22, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/31/2023. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Antoine Williams due 01/31/2023. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5229979] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/22/2022 04:38 PM]
December 22, 2022 CLERK ORDER:The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5229975] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/22/2022 04:26 PM]
December 22, 2022 District court order of 12/19/2022 granting coa on issue of whether petitioner's voluntary dismissal of a previous Section 2255 petition renders this current petition a second or successive petition., [5229932] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/22/2022 03:09 PM]
December 13, 2022 CLERK ORDER: This case is remanded to the district court for a determination of whether to issue a certificate of appealability, with directions that, if granted, the certificate of appealability specify the issue or issues that are to be considered on appeal. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2253; Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 22(b); United States v. Lambros, 404 F.3d 1034 (8th Cir. 2005); Tiedeman v. Benson, 122 F.3d 518 (8th Cir. 1997). [5226824] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/13/2022 11:04 AM]
December 12, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 10/6/22, judgment 10/6/22, docket text order 11/25/22. [5226064] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/12/2022 09:34 AM]
December 12, 2022 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5226067] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/12/2022 09:35 AM]
December 12, 2022 Prisoner case docketed. [5226056] [22-3558] (CAH) [Entered: 12/12/2022 09:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Antoine Williams v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Antoine Williams
Represented By: Antoine Williams
Represented By: Bradley Ryan Hansen
Represented By: Nova D. Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Dan Chatham
Represented By: Lisa C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?