Michael Davitt v. Michael Krage, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael T. Davitt
Defendant / Appellee: Michael Spindler Krage and Thomas Canan
Case Number: 23-1835
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Accommodation

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 21, 2024 Summary Davitt v. Krage

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies, PAGE 206 IS SEALED. [5286777] [23-1835] (MTB) [Entered: 06/14/2023 11:13 AM]
June 14, 2023 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5284231-2 ] filed by Mr. Michael T. Davitt 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [5286773] [23-1835] (MTB) [Entered: 06/14/2023 11:10 AM]
June 14, 2023 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5286766-2 ] motion to seal filed by Mr. R. Scott Johnson. The Court is hereby sealing the following: page 206 of the appendix, subject to further order of the court. [5286770] [23-1835] (MTB) [Entered: 06/14/2023 11:07 AM]
June 14, 2023 MOTION to seal appendix page 206, filed by Attorney Mr. R. Scott Johnson for Appellant Mr. Michael T. Davitt w/service 06/14/2023. [5286766] [23-1835] (MTB) [Entered: 06/14/2023 11:04 AM]
June 6, 2023 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Michael T. Davitt , w/service 06/06/2023 [5284233] [23-1835] (MTB) [Entered: 06/06/2023 11:29 AM]
June 6, 2023 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Michael T. Davitt. w/service 06/06/2023 , Length: 7,962 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Michael T. Davitt due 06/12/2023 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Thomas Canan and Michael Spindler Krage due on 07/06/2023 [5284231] [23-1835] (MTB) [Entered: 06/06/2023 11:27 AM]
June 5, 2023 APPELLANT brief of Mr. Michael T. Davitt submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5283944] [23-1835] (RSJ) [Entered: 06/05/2023 06:54 PM]
June 5, 2023 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Michael T. Davitt. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5283945] [23-1835] (RSJ) [Entered: 06/05/2023 06:56 PM]
May 8, 2023 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Michael T. Davitt. No Transcript Certificate of Waiver of Transcript [5274717] [23-1835] (RSJ) [Entered: 05/08/2023 04:08 PM]
May 8, 2023 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Michael T. Davitt - Joint Appendix - w/service 05/08/2023 [5274715] [23-1835] (RSJ) [Entered: 05/08/2023 04:04 PM]
April 26, 2023 APPEARANCE filed by Gregory James Griffiths for Appellee Thomas Canan w/service 04/26/2023 [5269399] [23-1835] (GJG) [Entered: 04/26/2023 09:08 AM]
April 25, 2023 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 4/14/2023, Order filed 2/14/2023, Judgment filed 2/15/2023, Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal filed 4/14/2023, Order on motion filed 4/17/2023, 2nd Appeal filed 4/20/2023, and docket entries, [5269217] [23-1835] (ASL) [Entered: 04/25/2023 03:29 PM]
April 25, 2023 APPEARANCE filed by Sarah B. Golwitzer for Appellant Mr. Michael T. Davitt w/service 04/25/2023 [5269280] [23-1835] (RSJ) [Entered: 04/25/2023 04:35 PM]
April 25, 2023 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/05/2023. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Michael T. Davitt due 06/05/2023. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5269265] [23-1835] (ASL) [Entered: 04/25/2023 04:14 PM]
April 25, 2023 APPEARANCE filed by Aaron M. Bostrom for Appellee Michael Spindler Krage w/service 04/25/2023 [5269262] [23-1835] (AMB) [Entered: 04/25/2023 04:13 PM]
April 25, 2023 APPEARANCE filed by Susan M. Tindal for Appellee Michael Spindler Krage w/service 04/25/2023 [5269261] [23-1835] (SMT) [Entered: 04/25/2023 04:11 PM]
April 25, 2023 APPEARANCE filed by Robert Scott Johnson for Appellant Mr. Michael T. Davitt w/service 04/25/2023 [5269248] [23-1835] (RSJ) [Entered: 04/25/2023 04:02 PM]
April 24, 2023 Civil case docketed. [5268484] [23-1835] (ASL) [Entered: 04/24/2023 03:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Davitt v. Michael Krage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael T. Davitt
Represented By: Sarah Beth Golwitzer
Represented By: Robert Scott Johnson
Represented By: Barbara Marchevsky
Represented By: R. Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Spindler Krage
Represented By: Susan Marie Tindal
Represented By: Aaron Mark Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas Canan
Represented By: Aaron Mark Bostrom
Represented By: Gregory James Griffiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?