Nersius Artisani v. State of Iowa, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Nersius Adonliel Artisani, also known as Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: State of Iowa, Captain Neff, Captain, Black Hawk County Jail, Lt. Braun, Black Hawk County Sheriff's Office, Sergeant Paulsen, Black Hawk County Sheriff's Office and Thompson, Sheriff, Black Hawk County
Case Number: 23-2984
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 22, 2024 Nersius Artisani v. State of Iowa

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 DOCUMENT FILED - request for extension of time to pay appellate filing fee filed by Nersius Adonliel Artisani. No action taken as filing fee has been paid. [5327736] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 10/19/2023 11:29 AM]
October 11, 2023 DOCUMENT FILED - Receipt for payment of appellate docketing fee filed by Nersius Adonliel Artisani. [5324758] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 10/11/2023 08:44 AM]
October 11, 2023 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 23-2984: paid - cs] [5324761] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 10/11/2023 08:46 AM]
September 18, 2023 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Nersius Adonliel Artisani w/service 09/19/2023. [5317755] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 09/19/2023 11:23 AM]
September 14, 2023 RECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Comments: 1 envelope containing District Court documents #1-1 and #8-1 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / NI [5316210] [23-2984] (STL) [Entered: 09/14/2023 09:36 AM]
September 5, 2023 CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 10/03/2023, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [5312761] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 09/05/2023 08:11 AM]
September 5, 2023 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 23-2984: due] [5312760] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 09/05/2023 08:10 AM]
September 5, 2023 Originating court document filed consisting of originating district court order of 09/01/2023 denying motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5312759] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 09/05/2023 08:10 AM]
August 31, 2023 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 8/9/2023, Judgment 8/9/2023, and docket entries. [5312123] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 08/31/2023 11:30 AM]
August 31, 2023 CLERK ORDER: for limited remand. This case is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of determining the appellant's IFP status and assessment of the docketing fees pursuant to 28 USC Section 1915 as amended by PLRA. [5312130] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 08/31/2023 11:35 AM]
August 31, 2023 CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5312135] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 08/31/2023 11:37 AM]
August 31, 2023 Prisoner case docketed. [5312115] [23-2984] (CMH) [Entered: 08/31/2023 11:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nersius Artisani v. State of Iowa, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nersius Adonliel Artisani, also known as Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr.
Represented By: Nersius Adonliel Artisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain Neff, Captain, Black Hawk County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lt. Braun, Black Hawk County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Paulsen, Black Hawk County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thompson, Sheriff, Black Hawk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?