Vanessa Smith v. United Industries Ultra Board
Plaintiff: Vanessa C. Smith
Defendant: United Industries Ultra Board
Case Number: 24-1288
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 MOTION for extension of time to file petition for rehearing, filed by Appellant Vanessa C. Smith w/service 04/11/2024. [5382528] [24-1288] (BNW) [Entered: 04/11/2024 12:29 PM]
April 11, 2024 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5382528-2 ] motion for extension of time to file rehearing filed by Appellant Vanessa C. Smith. Petition for Rehearing due on 04/26/2024. [5382531] [24-1288] (BNW) [Entered: 04/11/2024 12:31 PM]
March 29, 2024 JUDGMENT FILED - The district court's order is summarily affirmed. JAMES B. LOKEN, DUANE BENTON and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp Mar 2024 [5378778] [24-1288] --[Edited 03/29/2024 by BNW to add panel names to docket text] (BNW) [Entered: 03/29/2024 02:36 PM]
March 29, 2024 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges James B. Loken, Duane Benton, L. Steven Grasz in St. Louis [5378776] [24-1288] (BNW) [Entered: 03/29/2024 02:34 PM]
February 26, 2024 RECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Comments: 1 folder containing District Court document #5 and #6 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / WAF [5367161] [24-1288] (STL) [Entered: 02/26/2024 10:43 AM]
February 14, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Report and Recommendation 1/17/24, Order 2/6/24, docket entries, [5363473] [24-1288] (AEV) [Entered: 02/14/2024 10:25 AM]
February 14, 2024 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5363474] [24-1288] (AEV) [Entered: 02/14/2024 10:26 AM]
February 14, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5363470] [24-1288] (AEV) [Entered: 02/14/2024 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vanessa Smith v. United Industries Ultra Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa C. Smith
Represented By: Vanessa C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Industries Ultra Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?