Christian Construction Inc., et al v. Heather Owens, et al
Plaintiff: Christian Construction Inc. and James D. Parnell
Defendant: Heather Owens, Assistant City Attorney, Mike McQuay, Code Enforcement, City of Jonesboro, Municipality and Harold Copenhaver, Mayor, City of Jonesboro
Case Number: 24-1327
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 CLERK ORDER:On March 20, 2024, Appellant Christian Construction Inc. was directed to attain counsel within fourteen days. An attorney has not entered an appearance on behalf of Christian Construction Inc and the time for doing so has expired. Christian Construction Inc. is ordered to show cause, within fourteen days of the date of this order, why they should not be dismissed as a party to this appeal. Response of Christian Construction Inc. due 04/29/2024 [5383512] [24-1327] (CAH) [Entered: 04/15/2024 02:20 PM]
March 20, 2024 CLERK ORDER: Christian Construction Inc., a corporation, may not proceed pro se on appeal and may not be represented by James D. Parnell, who is not an attorney. If an attorney does not enter an appearance for Christian Construction Inc. within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, the clerk will enter an order to show cause why Christian Construction Inc. should not be dismissed as a party to this appeal. [5375136] [24-1327] (CMH) [Entered: 03/20/2024 09:17 AM]
February 23, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jenna Adams for Appellees Heather Owens, Mike McQuay, City of Jonesboro and Harold Copenhaver w/service 02/23/2024 [5366513] [24-1327] (JAA) [Entered: 02/23/2024 09:58 AM]
February 20, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 1/18/24, judgment 1/18/24. [5365046] [24-1327] (CAH) [Entered: 02/20/2024 02:44 PM]
February 20, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5365035] [24-1327] (CAH) [Entered: 02/20/2024 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christian Construction Inc., et al v. Heather Owens, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Parnell
Represented By: James D. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Owens, Assistant City Attorney
Represented By: Jenna Allison Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McQuay, Code Enforcement
Represented By: Jenna Allison Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jonesboro, Municipality
Represented By: Jenna Allison Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Copenhaver, Mayor, City of Jonesboro
Represented By: Jenna Allison Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?