Scott Brandsrud v. Dawn Hespenheide, et al
Plaintiff: Scott Brandsrud
Defendant: Dawn Hespenheide, (Dolan), Donald Hedlund, Edward Christian and Hennepin County District Court
Case Number: 24-1448
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 PETITION for rehearing by panel filed by Appellant Scott Brandsrud, w/service by USCA8 04/29/2024. [5388204] [24-1448] (HAG) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:29 PM]
April 29, 2024 Tendered Petition for Rehearing received from Appellant Scott Brandsrud [5388110] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 04/29/2024 11:12 AM]
April 19, 2024 Tendered Appellant's Opening Brief received from Appellant Scott Brandsrud [5385386] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 04/19/2024 02:30 PM]
April 19, 2024 DOCUMENT FILED - Pro Se Appellant's Brief filed by Scott Brandsrud. **Crossed in the mail with the 04/17/2024 judgment. No action taken. [5385415] [24-1448] (HAG) [Entered: 04/19/2024 02:59 PM]
April 17, 2024 JUDGMENT FILED - This case is summarily affirmed in accordance with Eighth Circuit Rule 47A. RALPH R. ERICKSON, L. STEVEN GRASZ and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp Apr 2024 [5384172] [24-1448] (HAG) [Entered: 04/17/2024 09:11 AM]
April 15, 2024 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Ralph R. Erickson, L. Steven Grasz, Jonathan A. Kobes in St. Louis [5384169] [24-1448] (HAG) [Entered: 04/17/2024 09:05 AM]
March 21, 2024 DOCUMENT FILED - Notice that a transcript will not be requested for the record on appeal filed by Scott Brandsrud. w/service 03/22/2024 [5375979] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 03/22/2024 08:39 AM]
March 5, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 3/4/2024, Memorandum Opinion and Order filed 2/7/2024, Judgment filed 2/8/2024, and docket entries, [5369989] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:27 AM]
March 5, 2024 CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 03/26/2024, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5369990] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:29 AM]
March 5, 2024 CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5369994] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:31 AM]
March 5, 2024 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 24-1448: from due to paid - cs] RECEIPT number 400004856 in the amount of $605.00 issued to Scott Brandsrud. [5370264] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 03/05/2024 03:43 PM]
March 5, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5369974] [24-1448] (ASL) [Entered: 03/05/2024 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Scott Brandsrud v. Dawn Hespenheide, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Brandsrud
Represented By: Scott Brandsrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Hespenheide, (Dolan)
Represented By: Nicolas Louis Hanson
Represented By: Mark Valderman Steffenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Hedlund
Represented By: Nicolas Louis Hanson
Represented By: Mark Valderman Steffenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Christian
Represented By: Nicolas Louis Hanson
Represented By: Mark Valderman Steffenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County District Court
Represented By: Michael P. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?