George Prentiss, III v. State of Iowa
Petitioner: George Prentiss, III
Respondent: State of Iowa
Case Number: 24-2765
Filed: August 28, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 JUDGMENT FILED - Denying [ # 5430439-2 ] motion for successive habeas petition filed by Petitioner George Prentiss, III.; Denying as moot [ # 5430448-2 ] motion for appointment of counsel filed by Petitioner George Prentiss, III., Mandate shall issue forthwith. DENIED. LAVENSKI R. SMITH, RAYMOND W. GRUENDER and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp Sep 2024 [5435595] [24-2765] (DNS) [Entered: 09/13/2024 02:43 PM]
September 13, 2024 MANDATE ISSUED. [5435601] [24-2765] (DNS) [Entered: 09/13/2024 02:48 PM]
September 9, 2024 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Lavenski R. Smith, Raymond W. Gruender, Jonathan A. Kobes in St. Louis [5435594] [24-2765] (DNS) [Entered: 09/13/2024 02:41 PM]
September 3, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin Parrott for Respondent State of Iowa w/service 09/03/2024 [5431438] [24-2765] (BMP) [Entered: 09/03/2024 02:39 PM]
September 3, 2024 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 5430439-2 ] filed by Attorney Benjamin Milton Parrott for Respondent State of Iowa , w/service 09/03/2024. [5431444] [24-2765] (BMP) [Entered: 09/03/2024 02:43 PM]
August 28, 2024 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING case docketed. [5430436] [24-2765] (AEV) [Entered: 08/29/2024 04:27 PM]
August 28, 2024 MOTION for Permission to file a Successive Habeas Petition (Rec'd by MAIL),filed by Petitioner George Prentiss, III w/service 08/29/2024. Response of State of Iowa due 09/12/2024. [5430439] [24-2765] (AEV) [Entered: 08/29/2024 04:29 PM]
August 28, 2024 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Petitioner George Prentiss, III w/service 08/29/2024. [5430448] [24-2765] (AEV) [Entered: 08/29/2024 04:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: George Prentiss, III v. State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Iowa
Represented By: Benjamin Milton Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Prentiss, III
Represented By: George Prentiss III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?