State of Arkansas, et al v. EDUC, et al
Plaintiff: State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of Arkansas, A.F., a minor, by Sara Ford, her mother, State of South Dakota and State of North Dakota
Defendant: Miguel Cardona, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Education, Catherine E. Lhamon, in her official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights at the United States Department of Education, United States Department of Education and Randolph Wills, in his official capacity as Deputy Assistant Secretary for Enforcement at the United States Department of Education
Case Number: 24-2921
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2024 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volume, Comments: 3 copies [5458764] [24-2921] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/20/2024 02:24 PM]
November 20, 2024 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5458205-2 ] filed by Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, EDUC and Randolph Wills 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [5458761] [24-2921] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/20/2024 02:20 PM]
November 19, 2024 Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Steven A. Myers for Appellants EDUC, Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills. Record Deficiency due on 11/25/2024. [5458211-1] [24-2921] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/19/2024 12:39 PM]
November 19, 2024 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, EDUC and Randolph Wills , w/service 11/19/2024 [5458207] [24-2921] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/19/2024 12:37 PM]
November 19, 2024 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, EDUC and Randolph Wills. w/service 11/19/2024 , Length: 12,674 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, United States Department of Education and Randolph Wills due 11/25/2024 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of A.F., State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota and State of South Dakota due on 12/19/2024 [5458205] [24-2921] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/19/2024 12:36 PM]
November 19, 2024 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5458177] [24-2921] (SAM) [Entered: 11/19/2024 12:03 PM]
November 19, 2024 Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Steven A. Myers for Appellants EDUC, Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills. New electronic copy of addendum due on 11/25/2024 [5458052] [24-2921] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/19/2024 09:52 AM]
November 18, 2024 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5457847] [24-2921] (SAM) [Entered: 11/18/2024 03:41 PM]
November 18, 2024 APPELLANT brief of Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5457841] [24-2921] (SAM) [Entered: 11/18/2024 03:38 PM]
October 16, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Natalie D. Thompson for Appellee A.F. w/service 10/16/2024 [5446932] [24-2921] (NDT) [Entered: 10/16/2024 02:57 PM]
October 3, 2024 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5442602-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by David Peters. Brief of Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, United States Department of Education and Randolph Wills due 11/18/2024. Appendix due on 11/18/2024. [5442756] [24-2921] (JMB) [Entered: 10/03/2024 10:27 AM]
October 2, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/02/2024 [5442601] [24-2921] (DP) [Entered: 10/02/2024 05:26 PM]
October 2, 2024 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/18/2024, filed by Attorney David Peters for Appellants Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, EDUC and Randolph Wills w/service 10/02/2024. [5442602] [24-2921] (DP) [Entered: 10/02/2024 05:28 PM]
October 2, 2024 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills. w/service 10/02/2024 [5442599] [24-2921] (DP) [Entered: 10/02/2024 05:24 PM]
October 2, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills - w/service 10/02/2024. [5442596] [24-2921] (DP) [Entered: 10/02/2024 05:23 PM]
October 2, 2024 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills. No Transcript[5442593] [24-2921] (DP) [Entered: 10/02/2024 05:21 PM]
September 27, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan A. Scruggs for Appellee A.F. w/service 09/27/2024 [5440797] [24-2921] (JAS) [Entered: 09/27/2024 04:45 PM]
September 27, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Jacob P. Warner for Appellee A.F. w/service 09/27/2024 [5440795] [24-2921] (JPW) [Entered: 09/27/2024 04:42 PM]
September 24, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellees State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota and State of South Dakota w/service 09/24/2024 [5439101] [24-2921] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/24/2024 08:57 AM]
September 24, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Nicholas J. Bronni for Appellees State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota and State of South Dakota w/service 09/24/2024 [5439100] [24-2921] (NJB) [Entered: 09/24/2024 08:55 AM]
September 23, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 07/24/2024, and Order of Preliminary Injunction 07/24/2024.[5438709] [24-2921] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2024 10:35 AM]
September 23, 2024 *****DOCUMENT LOCKED***** APPEARANCE filed by Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellee State of Arkansas w/service 09/23/2024 [5438905] [24-2921]--[Edited because filer will file new appearance form, listing all parties represented 09/24/2024 by JMB] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/23/2024 02:42 PM]
September 23, 2024 *****DOCUMENT LOCKED***** APPEARANCE filed by Nicholas J. Bronni for Appellee State of Arkansas w/service 09/23/2024 [5438903] [24-2921]--[Edited because attorney has filed a new form listing all parties represnted 09/24/2024 by JMB] (NJB) [Entered: 09/23/2024 02:39 PM]
September 23, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Steven A. Myers for Appellants Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills w/service 09/23/2024 [5438755] [24-2921] (SAM) [Entered: 09/23/2024 11:14 AM]
September 23, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by David L. Peters for Appellants Miguel Cardona, EDUC, Catherine E. Lhamon and Randolph Wills w/service 09/23/2024 [5438736] [24-2921] (DP) [Entered: 09/23/2024 11:02 AM]
September 23, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/04/2024. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Miguel Cardona, Catherine E. Lhamon, United States Department of Education and Randolph Wills due 11/04/2024. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5438717] [24-2921] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2024 10:41 AM]
September 23, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5438695] [24-2921] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2024 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Arkansas, et al v. EDUC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Lincoln J. Korell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F., a minor, by Sara Ford, her mother
Represented By: Jacob P. Warner
Represented By: Natalie D. Thompson
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Scruggs
Represented By: Rachel Rouleau
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Henry Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Charles David McGuigan
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: Philip J. Axt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Cardona, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Represented By: Hannah M. Solomon-Strauss
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Clayton Louis Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine E. Lhamon, in her official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights at the United States Department of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Represented By: Hannah M. Solomon-Strauss
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Clayton Louis Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Represented By: Hannah M. Solomon-Strauss
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Clayton Louis Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Wills, in his official capacity as Deputy Assistant Secretary for Enforcement at the United States Department of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Represented By: Hannah M. Solomon-Strauss
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Clayton Louis Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?