State of North Dakota, et al v. U.S. Dept. of Interior, et al
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota, State of Montana, State of Texas, State of Wyoming and State of Utah
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of Interior, Bureau of Land Management, Tracy Stone Manning, in her official capacity as the Director of the Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, in her official capacity as the Director of the Montana-Dakotas Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of Interior
Case Number: 24-3299
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2024 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5470809-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Paul Martin Seby. Brief of State of Montana, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming due 01/29/2025. [5471151] [24-3299] (NDG) [Entered: 12/31/2024 03:22 PM]
December 30, 2024 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/29/2025, filed by Attorney Paul Martin Seby for Appellee State of North Dakota w/service 12/30/2024. [5470809] [24-3299] (PMS) [Entered: 12/30/2024 06:35 PM]
December 30, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Peter M. Torstensen, Jr. for Appellee State of Montana w/service 12/30/2024 [5470653] [24-3299] (PMT) [Entered: 12/30/2024 01:48 PM]
December 30, 2024 ***LOCKED DOCUMENT*** APPEARANCE filed by Peter M. Torstensen, Jr. for Appellee State of Montana w/service 12/30/2024 [5470514] [24-3299] --[Edited 12/30/2024 by DNS] Counsel directed to refile with amended signature and to include certificate of service date (PMT) [Entered: 12/30/2024 10:55 AM]
December 30, 2024 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5469175-2 ] filed by Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning and DOI 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [5470504] [24-3299] (DNS) [Entered: 12/30/2024 10:44 AM]
December 26, 2024 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volume, Comments: 3 sets [5469851] [24-3299] (HAG) [Entered: 12/26/2024 01:44 PM]
December 23, 2024 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning and DOI. w/service 12/23/2024 , Length: 12,994 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning and United States Department of Interior due 12/30/2024 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of State of Montana, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming due on 01/22/2025 [5469175] [24-3299] (MTB) [Entered: 12/23/2024 10:28 AM]
December 23, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Paul M. Seby for Appellee State of North Dakota w/service 12/23/2024 [5469528] [24-3299] (PMS) [Entered: 12/23/2024 04:15 PM]
December 23, 2024 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning and DOI , w/service 12/23/2024 [5469176] [24-3299] (MTB) [Entered: 12/23/2024 10:28 AM]
December 20, 2024 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5469043] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 12/20/2024 09:08 PM]
December 20, 2024 APPELLANT brief of Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5469042] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 12/20/2024 09:04 PM]
November 26, 2024 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning. w/service 11/26/2024 [5460874] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 11/26/2024 03:44 PM]
November 26, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning - w/service 11/26/2024. [5460861] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 11/26/2024 03:34 PM]
November 26, 2024 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning. No Transcript[5460856] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 11/26/2024 03:32 PM]
November 26, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning - Separate Appendix - w/service 11/26/2024 [5460846] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 11/26/2024 03:24 PM]
November 13, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 11/11/2024, Order filed 9/12/2024, and docket entries, [5456177] [24-3299] (ASL) [Entered: 11/13/2024 12:12 PM]
November 13, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Richmond for Appellants Bureau of Land Management, DOI, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland and Tracy Stone Manning w/service 11/13/2024 [5456428] [24-3299] (BWR) [Entered: 11/13/2024 04:56 PM]
November 13, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 12/23/2024. Appendix due 01/02/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning and United States Department of Interior due 01/02/2025 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5456274] [24-3299] (ASL) [Entered: 11/13/2024 02:04 PM]
November 13, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5456170] [24-3299] (ASL) [Entered: 11/13/2024 12:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of North Dakota, et al v. U.S. Dept. of Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of Interior
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Represented By: Samuel B. Stratton
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Benjamin W. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Represented By: Samuel B. Stratton
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Benjamin W. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone Manning, in her official capacity as the Director of the Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Represented By: Samuel B. Stratton
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Benjamin W. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Germann, in her official capacity as the Director of the Montana-Dakotas Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Represented By: Samuel B. Stratton
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Benjamin W. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Represented By: Samuel B. Stratton
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Benjamin W. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Paul Martin Seby
Represented By: Philip J. Axt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Christopher Lee Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Represented By: D. David DeWald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Kathy A.F. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?