State of Kansas, et al v. United States, et al
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee, State of New Hampshire, State of Nebraska, State of Montana, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Kansas, State of Idaho, State of Alabama, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Missouri, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Texas and Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant: United States of America and Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Appellant: CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres
Case Number: 24-3521
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 23, 2024 Summary State of Kansas v. United States

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order APPELLEE brief of State of Kansas, State of Alabama, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee and State of Texas submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5483807] [24-3521] (AJP) [Entered: 02/07/2025 04:31 PM]
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Paper copies Amicus Brief, [ # 5481978-2 ] filed by CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres 10 paper copies received. [5483547] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 02/07/2025 10:57 AM]
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by James Rodriguez for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 02/05/2025 [5482469] [24-3521] (JR) [Entered: 02/05/2025 10:21 AM]
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 02/04/2025 , Length: 6,487 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres due 02/10/2025 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [5481978] [24-3521]--[Edited 02/04/2025 by CRJ. Entry edited to send form.] (CRJ) [Entered: 02/04/2025 11:23 AM]
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order AMICUS/INTERVENOR brief of Claudia Moya Lopez, Hyun Kim, Dania Quezada Torres, and CASA, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [5481729] [24-3521] (MSR) [Entered: 02/03/2025 10:56 PM]
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5480951-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Abhishek S. Kambli. Abhishek S. Kambli for State of Kansas has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [5481220] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 02/03/2025 10:11 AM]
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order 28(j) citation filed by Appellants United States of America and Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services w/service 01/31/2025 - FOR CAL [5480947] [24-3521] (JK) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:12 PM]
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Abhishek S. Kambli for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 01/31/2025. [5480951] [24-3521] (ASK) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:18 PM]
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Matthew S. Rozen for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Claudia Moya Lopez, Dania Quezada Torres and Hyun Kim. [5480408] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/30/2025 12:33 PM]
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Allen Huang for Appellee State of Florida w/service 01/29/2025 [5480022] [24-3521] (AH) [Entered: 01/29/2025 03:46 PM]
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Anthony J. Powell for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 01/29/2025 [5479959] [24-3521] (AJP) [Entered: 01/29/2025 02:52 PM]
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order AMICUS/INTERVENOR brief of Claudia Moya Lopez, Hyun Kim, Dania Quezada Torres, and CASA, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [5479435] [24-3521] (MSR) [Entered: 01/28/2025 04:37 PM]
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order CLERK ORDER:Parties are notified that absent the filing of a formal objection within10 days, the motion of American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Lung Association, Epilepsy Foundation of America, Leukemia & Lymphoma Society and Muscular Dystrophy Association for leave to participate as amicus curiae in support of Appellants will be deemed as granted. [5479357] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/28/2025 03:14 PM]
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order MOTION interested party, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network; American Lung Association; Epilepsy Foundation of America; Leukemia & Lymphoma Society; Muscular Dystrophy Association , for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Defendants-Appellants. w/service 01/24/2025. [5478294] [24-3521] (JC) [Entered: 01/24/2025 02:45 PM]
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5477802-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Clifton E. Katz. Clifton E. Katz for State of South Dakota has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [5478190] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/24/2025 12:44 PM]
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order ***DOCUMENT LOCKED***AMICUS/INTERVENOR brief of American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network; American Lung Association; Epilepsy Foundation of America; Leukemia & Lymphoma Society; Muscular Dystrophy Association submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [5477919] [24-3521]--[Edited 01/27/2025 by CRJ. Counsel has resubmitted the brief, along with a motion using the correct relief. See history #5478294] (JC) [Entered: 01/24/2025 08:08 AM]
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Clifton E. Katz for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 01/23/2025. [5477802] [24-3521] (CEK) [Entered: 01/23/2025 03:42 PM]
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan K. Van Patten for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 01/23/2025 [5477759] [24-3521] (JKV) [Entered: 01/23/2025 03:12 PM]
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #89 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / ND, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/15/2024, No. of Pgs.: 63, Court Reporter: Colby, Ronda L. [5476836] [24-3521] (STL) [Entered: 01/22/2025 08:07 AM]
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volume, Comments: 3 copies [5477211] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/22/2025 02:46 PM]
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America. w/service 01/21/2025 , Length: 12,998 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America due 01/27/2025 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee and State of Texas due on 02/07/2025 [5476436] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/21/2025 11:08 AM]
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America , w/service 01/21/2025 [5476437] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/21/2025 11:10 AM]
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5476201] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 01/17/2025 05:58 PM]
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order APPELLANT brief of Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5476200] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 01/17/2025 05:56 PM]
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Robert M. Overing for Appellee State of Alabama w/service 01/15/2025 [5474928] [24-3521] (RMO) [Entered: 01/15/2025 08:51 AM]
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Tanya Broder for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 01/14/2025 [5474788] [24-3521] (TB) [Entered: 01/14/2025 03:22 PM]
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Hilda Bonilla for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 01/14/2025 [5474807] [24-3521] (HB) [Entered: 01/14/2025 03:31 PM]
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 01/14/2025 [5474802] [24-3521] (JEI) [Entered: 01/14/2025 03:29 PM]
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Nicholas Espiritu for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 01/14/2025 [5474792] [24-3521] (NDE) [Entered: 01/14/2025 03:25 PM]
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5470219-2 ] motion to withdraw as retained counsel filed by Nicholas J. Bronni. Nicholas J. Bronni for State of Arkansas has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [5470260] [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 12/27/2024 04:34 PM]
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by John Matthew Butler for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/27/2024 [5470227] [24-3521] (JMB) [Entered: 12/27/2024 03:35 PM]
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Betty Yang for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/27/2024 [5470225] [24-3521] (BY) [Entered: 12/27/2024 03:33 PM]
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Matthew S. Rozen for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/27/2024 [5470224] [24-3521] (MSR) [Entered: 12/27/2024 03:32 PM]
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Nicholas J. Bronni for Appellee State of Arkansas w/service 12/27/2024. [5470219] [24-3521] (NJB) [Entered: 12/27/2024 03:28 PM]
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order RESPONSE: Amicus brief in support of appellants' motion for stay [ # 5466501-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew S. Rozen for Amici on Behalf of Appellant(s) CASA, Claudia Moya Lopez, Dania Quezada Torres and Hyun Kim , w/service 12/23/2024. [5469587] [24-3521] (AMT) [Entered: 12/23/2024 07:24 PM]
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order JUDGE ORDER:Granting [ # 5467921-2 ] appellees' motion to exceed word limit filed by Adam Thomas Steinhilber.; Granting [ # 5468355-2 ] motion to file an overlength reply filed by Leif Eric Overvold. Granting [ # 5468356-2 ] motion leave to file amicus brief. CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres in 24-3521 have been changed to amici curiae in this case. Adp Dec 2024 [5469586] [24-3521] (AMT) [Entered: 12/23/2024 07:08 PM]
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Lavenski R. Smith, Jane Kelly and L. Steven Grasz (PUBLISHED), DISSENT BY: Jane Kelly The administrative stay is vacated, the agencys motion for stay pending appeal is denied, and the Clerk of Court is ordered to expedite the briefing schedule for full consideration by a merits panel. [ # 5466501-2 ] [5469589] [24-3521] (AMT) [Entered: 12/23/2024 07:40 PM]
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK ORDER: Pursuant to the Courts Opinion filed on December 23, 2024, the parties are directed to comply with the following expedited briefing deadlines. Transcript is due January 14, 2025. Appellants brief and joint appendix are due January 17, 2025. Appellees brief is due February 7, 2025. Appellants' reply brief is due February 19, 2025. [5469591] [24-3521] (AMT) [Entered: 12/23/2024 08:10 PM]
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America. No Transcript[5468762] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 12/20/2024 11:22 AM]
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/20/2024 [5468759] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 12/20/2024 11:20 AM]
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America - w/service 12/20/2024. [5468756] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 12/20/2024 11:18 AM]
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTION to file an overlength reply, filed by Attorney Leif Eric Overvold for Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/19/2024. [5468355] [24-3521]--[Edited 12/19/2024 by CRJ. Entry edited to correct docket text.] (LEO) [Entered: 12/19/2024 11:52 AM]
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Leif Eric Overvold for Appellants United States of America and Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services correcting [ # 5468355-2 ] motion to file an overlength reply. [5468433] [24-3521]--[Edited 12/19/2024 by CRJ. Entry edited to correct docket text.] (LEO) [Entered: 12/19/2024 01:21 PM]
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance with exact word count. No action will be taken on your motion to file an overlength brief, [ # 5468355-2 ], submitted by Leif Eric Overvold in 24-3521 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance with the exact word count using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [24-3521] (CRJ) [Entered: 12/19/2024 01:10 PM]
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order REPLY to response in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5467926-2 ] filed by Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/19/2024. [5468358] [24-3521]--[Edited 12/19/2024 by CRJ. Entry edited to correct docket text.] (LEO) [Entered: 12/19/2024 11:55 AM]
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTION interested party, Claudia Moya Lopez, Dania Quezada Torres, Hyun Kim, and CASA, Inc. , for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Claudia Moya Lopez, Dania Quezada Torres, Hyun Kim, and CASA, Inc.. w/service 12/19/2024. [5468356] [24-3521] (MSR) [Entered: 12/19/2024 11:53 AM]
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTION To Exceed Word Limit, filed by Attorney Adam Thomas Steinhilber for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/18/2024. [5467921] [24-3521] (ATS) [Entered: 12/18/2024 01:42 PM]
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5466501-2 ] filed by Attorney Adam Thomas Steinhilber for Appellee State of Kansas , w/service 12/18/2024. [5467926] [24-3521] (ATS) [Entered: 12/18/2024 01:49 PM]
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by T. Elliot Gaiser for Appellee State of Ohio w/service 12/17/2024 [5467393] [24-3521] (TEG) [Entered: 12/17/2024 02:38 PM]
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Marty J. Jackley for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 12/17/2024 [5467245] [24-3521] (MJJ) [Entered: 12/17/2024 11:34 AM]
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Philip Axt for Appellee State of North Dakota w/service 12/16/2024 [5466936] [24-3521] (PJA) [Entered: 12/16/2024 02:54 PM]
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order ****DOCUMENT LOCKED**** JUDGE ORDER: Appellant's request for a temporary administrative stay of the district court's December 9, 2024 order, pending this court's consideration of Appellant's motion to stay the district court's order pending appeal, is granted. Appellees are directed to file any response(s) to Appellant's motion for stay pending appeal by December 18, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. Any reply from Appellant is due by 12:00 p.m. Central Time on December 19, 2024. [ # 5466501-2 ]. Adp Dec 2024 [5466719] [24-3521]--[Edited 12/23/2024 by AMT] THIS ORDER HAS BEEN VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S OPINION FILED ON DECEMBER 23, 2024. (AMT) [Entered: 12/16/2024 10:46 AM]
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Brandon Chase for Appellee State of New Hampshire w/service 12/16/2024 [5466699] [24-3521] (BFC) [Entered: 12/16/2024 10:27 AM]
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Henry C. Whitaker for State of Florida for Appellee State of Florida w/service 12/16/2024 [5466601] [24-3521] (HCW) [Entered: 12/16/2024 08:35 AM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTION for stay pending appeal, filed by Attorney Leif Eric Overvold for Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/13/2024. [5466501] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 12/13/2024 03:52 PM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Joshua M. Divine for Appellee State of Missouri w/service 12/13/2024 [5466070] [24-3521] (JD) [Entered: 12/13/2024 08:24 AM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Kevin M. Gallagher for Appellee Commonwealth of Virginia w/service 12/13/2024 [5466316] [24-3521] (KMG) [Entered: 12/13/2024 02:13 PM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Joseph D. Spate for Appellee State of South Carolina w/service 12/13/2024 [5466367] [24-3521] (JDS) [Entered: 12/13/2024 03:01 PM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order ****DOCUMENT LOCKED**** MOTION Notice of Intent to File Response, filed by Attorney Abhishek S. Kambli for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/13/2024. [5466556] [24-3521]--[Edited 12/16/2024 by AMT] THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS BEING REFILED BY THE CLERK'S OFFICE AS A LETTER. (ASK) [Entered: 12/13/2024 04:48 PM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by James A. Barta for Appellee State of Indiana w/service 12/13/2024 [5466573] [24-3521] (JAB) [Entered: 12/13/2024 06:34 PM]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order LETTER from Abhishek S. Kambli for State of Kansas regarding Appellees' Intent to File Response. w/service 12/13/2024 [5466697] [24-3521] (AMT) [Entered: 12/16/2024 10:27 AM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Clifton E. Katz for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 12/12/2024 [5465877] [24-3521] (CEK) [Entered: 12/12/2024 02:03 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 01/21/2025. Appendix due 01/31/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States due 01/31/2025 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5465694] [24-3521] (MMH) [Entered: 12/12/2024 10:52 AM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Joshua M. Koppel for Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/12/2024 [5465768] [24-3521] (JK) [Entered: 12/12/2024 11:54 AM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Zachary B. Pohlman for Appellee State of Nebraska w/service 12/12/2024 [5465782] [24-3521] (ZBP) [Entered: 12/12/2024 12:03 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Leif Overvold for Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/12/2024 [5465802] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 12/12/2024 12:21 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Abhishek S. Kambli for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/12/2024 [5465863] [24-3521] (ASK) [Entered: 12/12/2024 01:29 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Sean M. Corkery for Appellee State of Idaho w/service 12/12/2024 [5465870] [24-3521] (SMC) [Entered: 12/12/2024 01:54 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Eric H. Wessan for Appellee State of Iowa w/service 12/12/2024 [5465873] [24-3521] (EHW) [Entered: 12/12/2024 01:57 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order on motions for prelim. injunction and stay, TRO, and to dismiss 12/9/24 [5465690] [24-3521] (MMH) [Entered: 12/12/2024 10:49 AM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Whitney D. Hermandorfer for Appellee State of Tennessee w/service 12/12/2024 [5465881] [24-3521] (WDH) [Entered: 12/12/2024 02:17 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Matthew F. Kuhn for Appellee Commonwealth of Kentucky w/service 12/12/2024 [5465889] [24-3521] (MFK) [Entered: 12/12/2024 02:32 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Adam T. Steinhilber for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/12/2024 [5465905] [24-3521] (ATS) [Entered: 12/12/2024 02:50 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellee State of Arkansas w/service 12/12/2024 [5465906] [24-3521] (DAB) [Entered: 12/12/2024 02:51 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Munera Al-Fuhaid for Appellee State of Texas w/service 12/12/2024 [5465926] [24-3521] (MA) [Entered: 12/12/2024 03:10 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by David Bryant for Appellee State of Texas w/service 12/12/2024 [5465931] [24-3521] (MDB) [Entered: 12/12/2024 03:12 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Peter M. Torstensen, Jr. for Appellee State of Montana w/service 12/12/2024 [5466009] [24-3521] (PMT) [Entered: 12/12/2024 04:35 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE filed by Melissa Patterson for Appellants Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/12/2024 [5466039] [24-3521] (LEO) [Entered: 12/12/2024 07:40 PM]
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Civil case docketed. [5465671] [24-3521] (MMH) [Entered: 12/12/2024 10:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Kansas, et al v. United States, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Whitney D. Hermandorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Brandon F. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Zachary Brent Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Joseph David Spate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Marty J. Jackley
Represented By: Jonathan K. Van Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Philip J. Axt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Thomas Elliot Gaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Adam Thomas Steinhilber
Represented By: James Rodriguez
Represented By: Kris William Kobach
Represented By: Anthony J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: Matthew Maurer
Represented By: Alan M. Hurst
Represented By: Sean M. Corkery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Robert M. Overing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Zachary Zimmerer
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Represented By: Allen Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: James A. Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Eric H. Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Monroe D. Bryant Jr.
Represented By: Munera Al-Fuhaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa N. Patterson
Represented By: Leif Eric Overvold
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Christopher A. Eiswerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Melissa N. Patterson
Represented By: Leif Eric Overvold
Represented By: Joshua Koppel
Represented By: Christopher A. Eiswerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CASA
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hyun Kim
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Claudia Moya Lopez
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dania Quezada Torres
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?