State of Kansas, et al v. Claudia Lopez, et al
Plaintiff: State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Indiana, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Iowa, State of Florida, State of Alabama, State of Missouri, State of Ohio, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Montana, State of Idaho, State of South Carolina, State of Kansas, State of Nebraska and State of Arkansas
Defendant: United States of America and Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Movant: Claudia Moya Lopez, CASA, Dania Quezada Torres and Hyun Kim
Case Number: 24-3532
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2025 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5477808-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Clifton E. Katz. Clifton E. Katz for State of South Dakota has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [5478181] [24-3532] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/24/2025 12:37 PM]
January 23, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan K. Van Patten for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 01/23/2025 [5477834] [24-3532] (JKV) [Entered: 01/23/2025 04:10 PM]
January 23, 2025 MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Clifton E. Katz for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 01/23/2025. [5477808] [24-3532] (CEK) [Entered: 01/23/2025 03:46 PM]
January 23, 2025 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan K. Van Patten for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 01/23/2025 [5477772] [24-3532]--[Edited 01/24/2025 by CRJ. Counsel has refiled the app form with the correct case title. See history #5477834] (JKV) [Entered: 01/23/2025 03:17 PM]
January 16, 2025 MANDATE ISSUED. [5475622] [24-3532] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/16/2025 02:40 PM]
January 16, 2025 JUDGMENT FILED - The parties have filed a joint stipulation for dismissal. [ # 5474888-2 ] The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [5475610] [24-3532] (CRJ) [Entered: 01/16/2025 02:35 PM]
January 14, 2025 STIPULATION for dismissal filed by Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres. w/service 01/14/2025 [5474888] [24-3532] (MSR) [Entered: 01/14/2025 09:04 PM]
January 7, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Adam T. Steinhilber for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 01/07/2025 [5472892] [24-3532] (ATS) [Entered: 01/07/2025 03:21 PM]
December 27, 2024 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres. No Transcript[5470276] [24-3532] (MSR) [Entered: 12/27/2024 05:06 PM]
December 27, 2024 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres - Joint Appendix - w/service 12/27/2024 [5470275] [24-3532] (MSR) [Entered: 12/27/2024 05:05 PM]
December 27, 2024 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres - w/service 12/27/2024. [5470274] [24-3532] (MSR) [Entered: 12/27/2024 05:02 PM]
December 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Joseph D. Spate for Appellee State of South Carolina w/service 12/20/2024 [5469001] [24-3532] (JDS) [Entered: 12/20/2024 04:15 PM]
December 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by John Matthew Butler for Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/20/2024 [5468850] [24-3532] (JMB) [Entered: 12/20/2024 01:22 PM]
December 20, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Betty Yang for Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/20/2024 [5468847] [24-3532] (BY) [Entered: 12/20/2024 01:20 PM]
December 20, 2024 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant CASA. - FOR CAL [5468841] [24-3532] (MSR) [Entered: 12/20/2024 01:16 PM]
December 19, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Sean M. Corkery for Appellee State of Idaho w/service 12/19/2024 [5468594] [24-3532] (SMC) [Entered: 12/19/2024 04:04 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Kevin M. Gallagher for Appellee Commonwealth of Virginia w/service 12/18/2024 [5468127] [24-3532] (KMG) [Entered: 12/18/2024 09:57 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Hilda Bonilla for Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/18/2024 [5467896] [24-3532] (HB) [Entered: 12/18/2024 12:56 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Tanya Broder for Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/18/2024 [5467891] [24-3532] (TB) [Entered: 12/18/2024 12:52 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram for Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/18/2024 [5467877] [24-3532] (JEI) [Entered: 12/18/2024 12:41 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Nicholas Espiritu for Appellants CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/18/2024 [5467875] [24-3532] (NDE) [Entered: 12/18/2024 12:33 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Henry C. Whitaker for Appellee State of Florida w/service 12/18/2024 [5467873] [24-3532] (HCW) [Entered: 12/18/2024 12:28 PM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Abhishek Kambli for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/18/2024 [5467582] [24-3532] (ASK) [Entered: 12/18/2024 08:20 AM]
December 18, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Brandon Chase for Appellee State of New Hampshire w/service 12/18/2024 [5467898] [24-3532] (BFC) [Entered: 12/18/2024 12:59 PM]
December 17, 2024 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed by Abhishek Kambli for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/17/2024 [5467502] [24-3532]--[Edited 12/18/2024 by NDG] This document is lockerd as a corrected form has been filed 12/18/2024 by counsel. See document ID 5467582. (ASK) [Entered: 12/17/2024 04:28 PM]
December 17, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Clifton E. Katz for Appellee State of South Dakota w/service 12/17/2024 [5467440] [24-3532] (CEK) [Entered: 12/17/2024 03:32 PM]
December 17, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by T. Elliot Gaiser for Appellee State of Ohio w/service 12/17/2024 [5467408] [24-3532] (TEG) [Entered: 12/17/2024 02:59 PM]
December 17, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by James A. Barta for Appellee State of Indiana w/service 12/17/2024 [5467390] [24-3532] (JAB) [Entered: 12/17/2024 02:37 PM]
December 17, 2024 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed by Abhishek Kambli for Appellee State of Kansas w/service 12/17/2024 [5467378] [24-3532]--[Edited 12/18/2024 by NDG] This document is locked as a corrected form has been refiled 12/18/2024 by counsel. See document ID 5467582 (ASK) [Entered: 12/17/2024 02:14 PM]
December 17, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Joshua M. Koppel for Not Party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and United States of America w/service 12/17/2024 [5467340] [24-3532] (JK) [Entered: 12/17/2024 01:24 PM]
December 16, 2024 APPEARANCE filed by Matthew S. Rozen for Appellants Claudia Moya Lopez, Hyun Kim, CASA and Dania Quezada Torres w/service 12/16/2024 [5467048] [24-3532] (MSR) [Entered: 12/16/2024 04:45 PM]
December 13, 2024 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order on motions for prelim. injunction and stay, TRO, and to dismiss 12/9/24 [5466567] [24-3532] (MMH) [Entered: 12/13/2024 05:49 PM]
December 13, 2024 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 01/22/2025. Appendix due 02/03/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, CASA, Hyun Kim, Claudia Moya Lopez and Dania Quezada Torres due 02/03/2025 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5466570] [24-3532] (MMH) [Entered: 12/13/2024 05:53 PM]
December 13, 2024 Civil case docketed. [5466563] [24-3532]--[Edited 12/13/2024 by MMH] (MMH) [Entered: 12/13/2024 05:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Kansas, et al v. Claudia Lopez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Brandon F. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Philip J. Axt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: James A. Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Marty J. Jackley
Represented By: Jonathan K. Van Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Whitney D. Hermandorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Monroe D. Bryant Jr.
Represented By: Munera Al-Fuhaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Zachary Zimmerer
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Eric H. Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Represented By: Henry Charles Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Robert M. Overing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Thomas Elliot Gaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: Matthew Maurer
Represented By: Alan M. Hurst
Represented By: Sean M. Corkery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Joseph David Spate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Adam Thomas Steinhilber
Represented By: James Rodriguez
Represented By: Kris William Kobach
Represented By: Abhishek S. Kambli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Zachary Brent Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Claudia Moya Lopez
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CASA
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dania Quezada Torres
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Hyun Kim
Represented By: Betty Yang
Represented By: Joanna E. Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: John Matthew Butler
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Hilda Bonilla
Represented By: Matthew S. Rozen
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?