Monty Jones v. Lincoln National Life Ins. Co., et al
Plaintiff: Monty E. Jones
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Wells Fargo
Case Number: 25-1049
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 JUDGE ORDER: Appellant's [ # 5487750-2 ] motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Adp Feb 2025 [5492170] [25-1049] (HAG) [Entered: 03/04/2025 02:01 PM]
March 3, 2025 LETTER from Appellees Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Wells Fargo regarding Barbara J. D'Aquila's Withdrawal of Appearance. w/service 03/03/2025 [5491594] [25-1049] (BJD) [Entered: 03/03/2025 12:57 PM]
February 20, 2025 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellant Monty E. Jones w/service by USCA8 02/20/2025. [5487750] [25-1049] (HAG) [Entered: 02/20/2025 02:29 PM]
February 4, 2025 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Transcript due on or before 03/17/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, Monty Jones due 03/26/2025 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5481963] [25-1049] (ASL) [Entered: 02/04/2025 11:15 AM]
February 4, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 02/03/2025 granting Jone's motion for extension of time, [5481951] [25-1049] (ASL) [Entered: 02/04/2025 11:08 AM]
January 21, 2025 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Wells Fargo. - FOR CAL [5476739] [25-1049] (KMC) [Entered: 01/21/2025 04:28 PM]
January 21, 2025 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [5476693] [25-1049] (KMC) [Entered: 01/21/2025 03:55 PM]
January 17, 2025 **LOCKED-COUNSEL TO REFILE INDICATING ALL PARTIES BEING REPRESENTED** APPEARANCE filed by Barbara D'Aquila for Appellee Lincoln National Life Insurance Company w/service 01/17/2025 [5476041] [25-1049]--[Edited 01/17/2025 by HAG to lock] (BJD) [Entered: 01/17/2025 01:34 PM]
January 17, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Barbara D'Aquila for Appellees Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Wells Fargo w/service 01/17/2025 [5476120] [25-1049] (BJD) [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:26 PM]
January 17, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Kathleen McLeod Caminiti for Appellees Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Wells Fargo w/service 01/17/2025 [5476146] [25-1049] (KMC) [Entered: 01/17/2025 04:01 PM]
January 13, 2025 Civil case docketed. [5474242] [25-1049] (ASL) [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:10 PM]
January 13, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 1/8/2025, SEALED notice of appeal exhibits filed 1/8/2025, Opinion and Order filed 11/20/2024, Judgment filed 11/20/2024, Order filed 12/17/2024, and docket entries, [5474260] [25-1049] (ASL) [Entered: 01/13/2025 02:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Monty Jones v. Lincoln National Life Ins. Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen L. Odash
Represented By: Kathleen McLeod Caminiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Represented By: Kathleen McLeod Caminiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty E. Jones
Represented By: Monty E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?