Adrian Johnson v. Frontier Living LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Johnson
Defendant: State of Minnesota Department of Human Services, Greystar Management Services, L.P., Lakehaus Apartments LLC, doing business as Lakehaus Apartments, Frontier Living LLC and John Does, 1-5, unknown employees of the State of Minnesota Department of Human Services - sued in their individual capacities
Case Number: 25-1051
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Accommodation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Christoffel for Appellee Greystar Management Services, L.P. w/service 02/10/2025 [5484217] [25-1051] (MPT) [Entered: 02/10/2025 01:49 PM]
February 10, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Malcolm P. Terry for Appellee Greystar Management Services, L.P. w/service 02/10/2025 [5484214] [25-1051] (MPT) [Entered: 02/10/2025 01:48 PM]
January 17, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of court orders of 1/15/2025 (text-only, cancelling hearing) & 1/16/2025 staying dist court case pending appeal. [5475916] [25-1051] (MMH) [Entered: 01/17/2025 10:29 AM]
January 17, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Leonard J. Schweich for Appellee Department of Human Services w/service 01/17/2025 [5476055] [25-1051] (EBA) [Entered: 01/17/2025 01:48 PM]
January 14, 2025 Civil case docketed. [5474687] [25-1051] (MMH) [Entered: 01/14/2025 01:58 PM]
January 14, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order denying TRO and prelim. injunction 12/17/24, and Judgment 12/17/24 [5474752] [25-1051]--[Edited 01/29/2025 by MMH to clarify scope of Order] (MMH) [Entered: 01/14/2025 02:52 PM]
January 14, 2025 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Transcript due on or before 02/24/2025. BRIEF APPELLANT, Adrian Johnson due 03/05/2025 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5474759] [25-1051] (MMH) [Entered: 01/14/2025 02:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Adrian Johnson v. Frontier Living LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota Department of Human Services
Represented By: Leonard Jacob Schweich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Terry
Represented By: Andrew Christoffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakehaus Apartments LLC, doing business as Lakehaus Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Living LLC
Represented By: Richard Sauceda
Represented By: Patrick J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-5, unknown employees of the State of Minnesota Department of Human Services - sued in their individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Johnson
Represented By: Adrian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?