Richard Monahan v. Red Mule Express LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Monahan
Defendant: Red Mule Express LLC
Case Number: 25-1217
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2025 RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Bench Trial - District Court document #69 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / EA, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/18/2024, No. of Pgs.: 51, Court Reporter: Flora, Valarie [5502452] [25-1217] (STL) [Entered: 04/02/2025 11:23 AM]
March 18, 2025 CLERK ORDER: The [ # 5496737-2 ] motion for extension of time to file the brief filed on March 17, 2025 by Larry Joe Steele is granted. Brief of Red Mule Express LLC due 04/07/2025. Appendix due on 04/07/2025. The [ # 5495968-2 ] motion for extension of time to file the brief filed on March 14, 2025 by Larry Joe Steele is denied as moot. [5497100] [25-1217] (HAG) [Entered: 03/18/2025 10:13 AM]
March 17, 2025 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/07/2025, filed by Attorney Larry Joe Steele for Appellant Red Mule Express LLC w/service 03/17/2024. [5496737] [25-1217] (LJS) [Entered: 03/17/2025 01:11 PM]
March 14, 2025 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/07/2025, filed by Attorney Larry Joe Steele for Appellant Red Mule Express LLC w/service 03/14/2025. [5495968] [25-1217] (LJS) [Entered: 03/14/2025 10:52 AM]
February 14, 2025 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Red Mule Express LLC. w/service 02/14/2025 [5486145] [25-1217] (LJS) [Entered: 02/14/2025 12:44 PM]
February 14, 2025 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Red Mule Express LLC - w/service 02/14/2025. [5486143] [25-1217] (LJS) [Entered: 02/14/2025 12:43 PM]
February 14, 2025 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Red Mule Express LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/14/2025 [5486146] [25-1217] (LJS) [Entered: 02/14/2025 12:46 PM]
February 7, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Larry J. Steele for Appellant Red Mule Express LLC w/service 02/07/2025 [5483691] [25-1217] (LJS) [Entered: 02/07/2025 02:18 PM]
February 7, 2025 APPEARANCE filed by Josh Sanford for Appellee Richard Monahan w/service 02/07/2025 [5483712] [25-1217] (JS) [Entered: 02/07/2025 02:37 PM]
February 4, 2025 Civil case docketed. [5481917] [25-1217] (RDB) [Entered: 02/04/2025 10:44 AM]
February 4, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 12/20/2024, Judgment dated 12/20/2024, Order dated 1/24/2025 [5481919] [25-1217] (RDB) [Entered: 02/04/2025 10:46 AM]
February 4, 2025 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 03/17/2025. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Red Mule Express LLC due 03/17/2025. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5481923] [25-1217] (RDB) [Entered: 02/04/2025 10:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Monahan v. Red Mule Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Monahan
Represented By: Sean Short
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Mule Express LLC
Represented By: Larry Joe Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?