Ernest Swinson v. Department of Labor
Plaintiff: Ernest Antoine Swinson
Defendant: Department of Labor
Case Number: 25-1218
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2025 JUDGMENT FILED - This premature appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant's [ # 5496497-2 ] motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied as moot. LAVENSKI R. SMITH, RALPH R. ERICKSON and DAVID R. STRAS Adp Mar 2025 [5497788] [25-1218] (HAG) [Entered: 03/19/2025 02:40 PM]
March 16, 2025 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Ernest Antoine Swinson(received electronically), w/service 03/17/2025. [5496497] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 03/17/2025 09:32 AM]
March 4, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 03/03/2025, Order Affirming Denial of In Forma Pauperis Status and Denying In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal. [5492004] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 03/04/2025 11:09 AM]
March 4, 2025 CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/01/2025, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [5492024] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 03/04/2025 11:25 AM]
February 14, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 02/10/2025, Administrative Order Reassigning Case. [5486238] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 02/14/2025 03:26 PM]
February 4, 2025 Civil case docketed. [5482165] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 02/04/2025 02:25 PM]
February 4, 2025 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 01/26/2025, and Judgment 01/27/2025. [5482173] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 02/04/2025 02:31 PM]
February 4, 2025 CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 02/25/2025, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5482176] [25-1218] (CJO) [Entered: 02/04/2025 02:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ernest Swinson v. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Antoine Swinson
Represented By: Ernest Antoine Swinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?