Delgado, et al v. Holder
Petitioner,: HERNAN ISMAEL DELGADO
Respondent,: ERIC H. HOLDER, Jr., Attorney General
Case Number: 03-74442
Filed: December 4, 2003
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 2, 2010 Delgado, et al v. Holder
April 17, 2009 Delgado, et al v. Holder
August 19, 2011 Summary Delgado, et al. v. Holder, Jr.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 920100902 Opinion
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090417 Opinion
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920081007 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Delgado, et al v. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: HERNAN ISMAEL DELGADO
Represented By: Hernan Ismael Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: ERIC H. HOLDER, Jr., Attorney General
Represented By: CAS-District Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?