Smith v. Mitchell
Petitioner - Appellant,: SHIRLEY REE SMITH
Respondent - Appellee,: GWENDOLYN MITCHELL
Case Number: 04-55831
Filed: May 14, 2004
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 29, 2010 Smith v. Mitchell
February 26, 2008 Smith v. Mitchell
December 4, 2007 Smith v. Mitchell
February 3, 2012 Summary SMITH V. MITCHELL

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080226 Opinion
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 920071204 Opinion
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 920060713 Opinion
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 920060208 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Smith v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant,: SHIRLEY REE SMITH
Represented By: Michael Joseph Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee,: GWENDOLYN MITCHELL
Represented By: Richard T. Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?