Crawford v. Astrue, et al
Plaintiff,: CLARA CRAWFORD
Defendant - Appellee,: MICHAEL J. ASTRUE, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Real-party-in-interest - Appellant,: BRIAN C. SHAPIRO
Case Number: 06-55822
Filed: June 15, 2006
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 4, 2009 Crawford v. Astrue, et al
May 27, 2009 Crawford v. Astrue, et al
September 24, 2008 Crawford v. Astrue, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920091104 Opinion
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920091103 Opinion
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090527 Opinion
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080924 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Crawford v. Astrue, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: CLARA CRAWFORD
Represented By: Brian C. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MICHAEL J. ASTRUE, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Marcus Kerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real-party-in-interest - appellant,: BRIAN C. SHAPIRO
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?