Nelson, et al v. NASA, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant,: ROBERT M. NELSON and WILLIAM BRUCE BRANERDT, ; JULIA BELL; JOSETTE BELLAN; DENNIS V. BYRNES; GEORGE CARLISLE; KENT ROBERT CROSSIN; LARRY R. D'ADDARIO; RILEY M. DUREN; PETER R. EISENHARDT; SUSAN D.J. FOSTER; MATTHEW P. GOLOMBEK; VAROUJAN GORJIAN; ZAREH GORJIAN; ROBERT J. HAW;
Defendant - Appellee,: NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, an Agency of the United States, MICHAEL GRIFFIN, Director of NASA, in his official capacity only, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, CARLOS M. GUTIERREZ, Secretary of Commerce, in his official capacity only and CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Amicus Curiae,: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Case Number: 07-56424
Filed: October 4, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 4, 2009 Nelson, et al v. NASA, et al
June 19, 2008 Nelson, et al v. NASA, et al
October 11, 2007 Nelson, et al v. NASA, et al
April 11, 2011 Nelson, et al v. NASA, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090604 Opinion
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080619 Opinion
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080111 Opinion
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 920071011 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nelson, et al v. NASA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ROBERT M. NELSON
Represented By: Virginia Keeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: WILLIAM BRUCE BRANERDT, ; JULIA BELL; JOSETTE BELLAN; DENNIS V. BYRNES; GEORGE CARLISLE; KENT ROBERT CROSSIN; LARRY R. D'ADDARIO; RILEY M. DUREN; PETER R. EISENHARDT; SUSAN D.J. FOSTER; MATTHEW P. GOLOMBEK; VAROUJAN GORJIAN; ZAREH GORJIAN; ROBERT J. HAW;
Represented By: Virginia Keeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, an Agency of the United States
Represented By: Wendy Ertmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MICHAEL GRIFFIN, Director of NASA, in his official capacity only
Represented By: Wendy Ertmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Wendy Ertmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CARLOS M. GUTIERREZ, Secretary of Commerce, in his official capacity only
Represented By: Wendy Ertmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: Mark T. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jennifer Granick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?