Movsesian, et al v. Versicherung AG, et al
Plaintiff - Appellee,: VAZKEN MOVSESIAN, HARRY ARZOUMANIAN, GARO AYALTIN, MIRAN KHAGERIAN and ARA KHAJERIAN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated including thousands of senior citizens, disabled persons, and orphans as well as on behalf of the general public and acting in the public interest
Defendant,: VICTORIA VERSICHERUNG AG, a German corporation and ERGO VERSICHERUNGSGRUPPE AG, a German corporation
Defendant - Appellant,: MUNCHENER RUCKVERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT AG, a German corporation
Amicus Curiae,: ARMENIAN BAR ASSOCIATION, ET AL, CENTER FOR THE STUDY OF LAW AND GENOCIDE, HON. ADAM B. SCHIFF and HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANIZATION
Amicus Curiae - Pending,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Case Number: 07-56722
Filed: November 30, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 10, 2010 Movsesian, et al v. Versicherung AG, et al
November 7, 2011 Summary Movsesian, et al v. Versicherung AG, et al
November 7, 2011 Summary Movsesian, et al v. Versicherung AG, et al
February 23, 2012 Summary MOVSESIAN V. VERSICHERUNG AG

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 920101210 Opinion
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090820 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Movsesian, et al v. Versicherung AG, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: VAZKEN MOVSESIAN
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: HARRY ARZOUMANIAN
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: GARO AYALTIN
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: MIRAN KHAGERIAN
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: ARA KHAJERIAN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated including thousands of senior citizens, disabled persons, and orphans as well as on behalf of the general public and acting in the public interest
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: VICTORIA VERSICHERUNG AG, a German corporation
Represented By: Johanna S. Schiavoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ERGO VERSICHERUNGSGRUPPE AG, a German corporation
Represented By: Johanna S. Schiavoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: MUNCHENER RUCKVERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT AG, a German corporation
Represented By: Christopher P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: ARMENIAN BAR ASSOCIATION, ET AL
Represented By: David M. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CENTER FOR THE STUDY OF LAW AND GENOCIDE
Represented By: Harry W.R. Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: HON. ADAM B. SCHIFF
Represented By: John P. McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Marco Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae - pending,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Angela Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?