Binyam Mohamed, et al v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc.
Plaintiff - Appellant,: BINYAM MOHAMED, ABOU ELKASSIM BRITEL, AHMED AGIZA, MOHAMED FARAG AHMAD BASHMILAH and BISHER AL-RAWI
Intervenor - Appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant - Appellee,: JEPPESEN DATAPLAN, INC.
Amicus Curiae,: PROFESSORS OF CONSTITUTIONAL LAW, FEDERAL JURISDICTION, AND FOREIGN RELATIONS LAW, FORMER UNITED STATES DIPLOMATS, WILLIAM G. WEAVER, ROBERT PALLITTO, COMMONWEALTH LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, JUSTICE, REDRESS, INTERNATIONAL COMMISSION OF JURISTS, THE FOUNDATION FOR THE DEFENSE OF DEMOCRACIES, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION and ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Case Number: 08-15693
Filed: March 31, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 8, 2010 Binyam Mohamed, et al v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc.
September 8, 2010 Binyam Mohamed, et al v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc.
October 27, 2009 Binyam Mohamed, et al v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc.
April 28, 2009 Binyam Mohamed, et al v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920091027 Opinion
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090831 Opinion
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090428 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Binyam Mohamed, et al v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: BINYAM MOHAMED
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ABOU ELKASSIM BRITEL
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: AHMED AGIZA
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: MOHAMED FARAG AHMAD BASHMILAH
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: BISHER AL-RAWI
Represented By: Benjamin Elihu Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor - appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael P. Abate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JEPPESEN DATAPLAN, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Paul Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: PROFESSORS OF CONSTITUTIONAL LAW, FEDERAL JURISDICTION, AND FOREIGN RELATIONS LAW
Represented By: Natalie Laura Bridgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: FORMER UNITED STATES DIPLOMATS
Represented By: Barbara Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: WILLIAM G. WEAVER
Represented By: Jean-Paul Jassy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: ROBERT PALLITTO
Represented By: Jean-Paul Jassy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: COMMONWEALTH LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: James M. Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: JUSTICE
Represented By: James M. Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: REDRESS
Represented By: William Aceves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: INTERNATIONAL COMMISSION OF JURISTS
Represented By: William Aceves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: THE FOUNDATION FOR THE DEFENSE OF DEMOCRACIES
Represented By: Andrew G. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Richard Abbott Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Richard Abbott Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Cindy Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?