Tio Sessoms v. D Runnel
Petitioner - Appellant,: TIO DINERO SESSOMS
Respondent - Appellee,: D. L. RUNNELS
Case Number: 08-17790
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 3, 2011 Summary Sessoms v. Runnel
December 15, 2011 Summary Tio Sessoms v. D Runnel
December 15, 2011 Summary Tio Sessoms v. D Runnel
August 16, 2012 Summary Sessoms v. Runnels
September 22, 2014 Summary TIO SESSOMS V. D RUNNELS
January 23, 2015 Summary TIO SESSOMS V. D RUNNELS

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tio Sessoms v. D Runnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant,: TIO DINERO SESSOMS
Represented By: Eric Martin Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee,: D. L. RUNNELS
Represented By: Jeffrey Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?