NRDC, et al v. Winter, et al
Plaintiff - Appellee,: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., THE INTERNATIONAL FUND FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CETACEAN SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, LEAGUE FOR COASTAL PROTECTION, OCEAN FUTURES SOCIETY and JEAN-MICHEL COUSTEAU
Defendant - Appellant,: DONALD C. WINTER, Secretary of the Navy, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, CARLOS M. GUTIERREZ, Secretary of the Department of Commerce, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICES, WILLIAM HOGARTH, Assistant Administrator for Fisheries of the National Oceanographic and Atmospheric Administration and CONRAD C LAUTENBACHER, Jr., Administrator of the National Oceanographic and Atmospheric Administration
Case Number: 08-55054
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 25, 2009 NRDC, et al v. Winter, et al
February 29, 2008 NRDC, et al v. Winter, et al
January 25, 2008 NRDC, et al v. Winter, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 920090325 Opinion
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080229 Opinion
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080219 Opinion
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920080125 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: NRDC, et al v. Winter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
Represented By: Alan J. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: THE INTERNATIONAL FUND FOR ANIMAL WELFARE
Represented By: Alan J. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: CETACEAN SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Alan J. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: LEAGUE FOR COASTAL PROTECTION
Represented By: Alan J. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: OCEAN FUTURES SOCIETY
Represented By: Alan J. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JEAN-MICHEL COUSTEAU
Represented By: Alan J. Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: DONALD C. WINTER, Secretary of the Navy
Represented By: Allen M. Brabender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Represented By: Allen M. Brabender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: CARLOS M. GUTIERREZ, Secretary of the Department of Commerce
Represented By: Allen M. Brabender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICES
Represented By: Allen M. Brabender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: WILLIAM HOGARTH, Assistant Administrator for Fisheries of the National Oceanographic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Allen M. Brabender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: CONRAD C LAUTENBACHER, Jr., Administrator of the National Oceanographic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Allen M. Brabender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?