Mack-University LLC, et al v. James Halstead, et al
Plaintiff: THUAN PHAN, an individual
Defendant: SUSAN HALSTEAD, EQUIPOINT FINANCIAL NETWORK, a California corporation formerly known as Harborside Financial Network Inc., BROOKE ROBBINS HARVEY, JAIME BARKER and BELLASAIRE INVESTMENTS
Plaintiff / Appellee: AMY FREY, an individual, MUSIA GLUZMAN, RALPH W. SHEETS, PMP VENTURES-PIPES, LLC, an Illinois Series Limited Liability Company, RANDAL WHITTLE, an individual, MICHAEL HEFNER, an individual, JOHN M. POWERS, Jr., an individual, GARY L. TOOKER, individually and as trustee of the Tooker Family Trust, BERNIE GERMANI, Sr., an individual, FRAN HARGADON, CHRISTINE MARSDEN, KAI W. ADLER, MICHAEL MANSER, an individual, JASON GLASS, REED HUMMEL, an individual, BRANDON KEENEN, an individual, MACK-UNIVERSITY LLC, a California limited liability company, ALAN E. GIRDLESTONE AND DOLORES GIRDLESTONE, Trustees of the Girdlestone Family 1989 Trust, FIRST TRUST CO. OF ONAGA, GLOBAL SOLUTIONS CONSULTING, INC., MICHELLE GLASS, Esquire, JASON WOJTYNA, an individual, JEFF MARSDEN, MARK CHILDERS, CLAUDINE HALLIBURTON, JANE MCELROY, an individual, TWELVE MORGAN LLC, CHERIE CHILDERS, JOHN M. POWERS, Sr., ndividually, FRED KOEPPE, Trustee of Koppe Trust, U/D/T, JENNIFER BRADLEY, JOHN PIERCE, TAMMY CAMPOS, YVES HALLIBURTON, an individual, MICHAEL BRACKETT, MELISSA HANSEN, NIGEL CHARLES PAGE, FIFTEEN MORGAN LLC, GREG VELASTEGUI, an individual, CUSTODIAN F/B/O GEORGE C. KENNEDY, SHIRLEY WAGNER, BERNIE GERMANI, Jr., an individual, JAMES E. LAWSON, LARRY RABINEAU, an individual, MARK R. SAWUSCH, ANNE FRANK, STEPHEN PEREBZAK, ROBERT CULVER, MELISSA J. POWERS, an individual, STEVEN COX, an individual, THOMAS HAZEN, JOHN TAYLOR, AMY MANSER, an individual, MARICELA DUSKY, KILPATRICK INVESTMENTS LP, ERIC BRADLEY, DIANE R. TOOKER, individually, BUILDERS FINANCIAL EXPEDITORS LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, JAMES KIM, MARIANNE BURNETT, Trustee of the Burnett Family Trust, U/D/T, JAMES L. FREY MD RESEARCH LTD, an Arizona corporation, JAMES L. FREY, individually, VADIM DAN GLUZMAN, KEBO INVESTMENTS, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company, DENNIS W. WILSON, an individual, ENRIQUE CAMPOS, ERNIE BURNETT, TRENT WALKER, SPECTRUM LENDING GROUP, BARBARA WOJTYNA, an individual, STEVE LOWE, an individual, MARILYN PLATFOOT, an individual, SALVADOR SAHAGUN, LAURA RASOR, ED SHERMAN, PROCLAIM, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company, ALINE KECHEJIAN, THE LAWSON MARKETING GROUP INC., a California corporation, MIKE AND GWEN CURTIS REVOCABLE TRUST U/D/T, PMP VENTURES-PIPES, LLC, an Ilinois Series Limited Liability Company, LISA LOWE, an individual, ROBERT HALLIBURTON, GEORGE C. KENNEY, ROBERT B. MCDONALD, JAMES MICHAEL FREY, an individual, FAKHRI TAHERI, ERIC RASOR, ANTHONY EDWARDS, LUKE ARNETT, THERAPY CARE INC. and DANIEL KECHEJIAN
Not Yet Classified: MARC HALLIBURTON, an individual, GAMEPLAN, INC. and JAMES R. HALSTEAD
Cross Defendant: JEANNE M. ROWZEE, GAMPLANIJH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability corporation and RICHARD E. MACKLIN
Case Number: 08-56718
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order filed (Deputy Clerk: RS) Dismissing case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1) Pursuant to Ninth Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to pay fees.; This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court.. (RS) [Entered: 01/20/2009 11:18 AM]
December 9, 2008 Filing 6 Filed order MOATT: (AW) docket fee due..Failure to pay the fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis shall result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. (KD) [Entered: 12/09/2008 02:52 PM]
October 27, 2008 Filing 5 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: No. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants Gameplan, Inc. and James R. Halstead on 10/07/2008. Designation of RT for Appellants due 10/17/2008. Designation of RT for Appellees Kai W. Adler, Alan E. Girdlestone, Dolores Girdlestone, Luke Arnett, Michael Brackett, Eric Bradley, Jennifer Bradley, Builders Financial Expeditors LLC, Ernie Burnett, Marianne Burnett, Enrique Campos, Tammy Campos, Cherie Childers, Mark Childers, Steven Cox, Robert Culver, Custodian F/B/O George C. Kennedy, Maricela Dusky, Anthony Edwards, Fifteen Morgan LLC, First Trust Co. of Onaga, Anne Frank, Amy Frey, James L. Frey, James Michael Frey, Bernie Germani Jr., Bernie Germani Sr., Jason Glass, Michelle Glass, Global Solutions Consulting, Inc., Musia Gluzman, Vadim Dan Gluzman, Claudine Halliburton, Marc Halliburton, Robert Halliburton, Yves Halliburton, Melissa Hansen, Fran Hargadon, Thomas Hazen, Michael Hefner, Reed Hummel, James L. Frey MD Research LTD, Kebo Investments, Aline Kechejian, Daniel Kechejian, Brandon Keenen, George C. Kenney, Kilpatrick Investments LP, James Kim, Fred Koeppe, James E. Lawson, Lisa Lowe, Steve Lowe, Mack-University LLC, Amy Manser, Michael Manser, Christine Marsden, Jeff Marsden, Robert B. McDonald, Jane McElroy, Mike and Gwen Curtis Revocable Trust U/D/T 01-14-1999, PMP Ventures-Pipes, Nigel Charles Page, Stephen Perebzak, Thuan Phan, John Pierce, Marilyn Platfoot, John M. Powers Jr., John M. Powers Sr., Melissa J. Powers, Proclaim, Larry Rabineau, Eric Rasor, Laura Rasor, Salvador Sahagun, Mark R. Sawusch, Ralph W. Sheets, Ed Sherman, Spectrum Lending Group, Fakhri Taheri, John Taylor, The Lawson Marketing Group Inc., Therapy Care Inc., Diane R. Tooker, Gary L. Tooker, Twelve Morgan LLC, Greg Velastegui, Shirley Wagner, Trent Walker, Randal Whittle, Dennis W. Wilson, Barbara Wojtyna and Jason Wojtyna due 10/27/2008. Transcript order for Appellants due 11/06/2008. Transcript due for Court Reporter Theresa Doty on 02/04/2009. Certificate of record due 02/11/2009. Appellants' opening brief due 03/23/2009. Appellees' answering brief due 04/22/2009. Appellants' optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (JN) [Entered: 10/27/2008 01:55 PM]
October 24, 2008 Filing 4 Entered appearance of -s Brooke Robbins Harvey and Jeanne M. Rowzee. (JN) [Entered: 10/24/2008 04:00 PM]
October 24, 2008 Filing 3 Entered appearance of -s Gamplanijh, Susan Halstead, Jaime Barker, Bellasaire Investments, Equipoint Financial Network and Richard E. Macklin, Appellee PMP Ventures-Pipes. (JN) [Entered: 10/24/2008 03:25 PM]
October 24, 2008 Filing 2 Entered appearance of Appellees Bernie Germani Sr., Bernie Germani Jr., Ed Sherman, Jane McElroy, Steve Lowe, Lisa Lowe, Michael Manser, Amy Manser, John M. Powers Sr., John M. Powers Jr., Barbara Wojtyna, Kilpatrick Investments LP, Randal Whittle, Thuan Phan, Anthony Edwards, Reed Hummel, Steven Cox, Melissa J. Powers, Gary L. Tooker, Diane R. Tooker, Jason Wojtyna, Proclaim, Dennis W. Wilson, Michael Hefner, Kebo Investments, Brandon Keenen, James Michael Frey, Amy Frey, James L. Frey MD Research LTD, Maricela Dusky, Melissa Hansen and Salvador Sahagun. (JN) [Entered: 10/24/2008 02:15 PM]
October 24, 2008 Filing 1 Entered appearance of Appellees Jeff Marsden, Christine Marsden, Robert B. McDonald, Nigel Charles Page, Stephen Perebzak, Greg Velastegui, John Pierce, Trent Walker, Eric Rasor, Laura Rasor, Mark R. Sawusch, Ralph W. Sheets, Spectrum Lending Group, Fakhri Taheri, John Taylor, Therapy Care Inc., Twelve Morgan LLC, Shirley Wagner, Thomas Hazen, James E. Lawson, The Lawson Marketing Group Inc., Larry Rabineau, Marc Halliburton, Builders Financial Expeditors LLC, Marilyn Platfoot, Robert Culver, Claudine Halliburton, Robert Halliburton and Yves Halliburton. (JN) [Entered: 10/24/2008 10:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mack-University LLC, et al v. James Halstead, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMY FREY, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MUSIA GLUZMAN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RALPH W. SHEETS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PMP VENTURES-PIPES, LLC, an Illinois Series Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Marvin E. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDAL WHITTLE, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL HEFNER, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN M. POWERS, Jr., an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY L. TOOKER, individually and as trustee of the Tooker Family Trust
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERNIE GERMANI, Sr., an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRAN HARGADON
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTINE MARSDEN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAI W. ADLER
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL MANSER, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JASON GLASS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: REED HUMMEL, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRANDON KEENEN, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MACK-UNIVERSITY LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Marvin E. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALAN E. GIRDLESTONE AND DOLORES GIRDLESTONE, Trustees of the Girdlestone Family 1989 Trust
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIRST TRUST CO. OF ONAGA
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLOBAL SOLUTIONS CONSULTING, INC.
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHELLE GLASS, Esquire
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JASON WOJTYNA, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFF MARSDEN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARK CHILDERS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLAUDINE HALLIBURTON
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANE MCELROY, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TWELVE MORGAN LLC
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHERIE CHILDERS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN M. POWERS, Sr., ndividually
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRED KOEPPE, Trustee of Koppe Trust, U/D/T
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER BRADLEY
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN PIERCE
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAMMY CAMPOS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: YVES HALLIBURTON, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL BRACKETT
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELISSA HANSEN
Represented By: Kyle E. Lakin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NIGEL CHARLES PAGE
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIFTEEN MORGAN LLC
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREG VELASTEGUI, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CUSTODIAN F/B/O GEORGE C. KENNEDY
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHIRLEY WAGNER
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERNIE GERMANI, Jr., an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES E. LAWSON
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARRY RABINEAU, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARK R. SAWUSCH
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNE FRANK
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEPHEN PEREBZAK
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT CULVER
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELISSA J. POWERS, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN COX, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS HAZEN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN TAYLOR
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMY MANSER, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARICELA DUSKY
Represented By: Kyle E. Lakin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KILPATRICK INVESTMENTS LP
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERIC BRADLEY
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANE R. TOOKER, individually
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BUILDERS FINANCIAL EXPEDITORS LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES KIM
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIANNE BURNETT, Trustee of the Burnett Family Trust, U/D/T
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES L. FREY MD RESEARCH LTD, an Arizona corporation
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES L. FREY, individually
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VADIM DAN GLUZMAN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEBO INVESTMENTS, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENNIS W. WILSON, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ENRIQUE CAMPOS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERNIE BURNETT
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRENT WALKER
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SPECTRUM LENDING GROUP
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARBARA WOJTYNA, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVE LOWE, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARILYN PLATFOOT, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SALVADOR SAHAGUN
Represented By: Kyle E. Lakin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAURA RASOR
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ED SHERMAN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PROCLAIM, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALINE KECHEJIAN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE LAWSON MARKETING GROUP INC., a California corporation
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIKE AND GWEN CURTIS REVOCABLE TRUST U/D/T
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PMP VENTURES-PIPES, LLC, an Ilinois Series Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Marvin E. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA LOWE, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT HALLIBURTON
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE C. KENNEY
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT B. MCDONALD
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES MICHAEL FREY, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FAKHRI TAHERI
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERIC RASOR
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTHONY EDWARDS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUKE ARNETT
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THERAPY CARE INC.
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL KECHEJIAN
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARC HALLIBURTON, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GAMEPLAN, INC.
Represented By: Gameplan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES R. HALSTEAD
Represented By: James R. Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN HALSTEAD
Represented By: David L. Casterline Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIPOINT FINANCIAL NETWORK, a California corporation formerly known as Harborside Financial Network Inc.
Represented By: Louis A. Gonzalez Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKE ROBBINS HARVEY
Represented By: Scott M. Schlegel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIME BARKER
Represented By: David L. Casterline Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELLASAIRE INVESTMENTS
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THUAN PHAN, an individual
Represented By: William Lee Buus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: JEANNE M. ROWZEE
Represented By: Jeanne M. Rowzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GAMPLANIJH, LLC, a Nevada limited liability corporation
Represented By: David L. Casterline Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: RICHARD E. MACKLIN
Represented By: Marvin E. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?