USA v. Daniel Milli Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant - Appellant,: DANIEL J. MILLIS
Case Number: 09-10134
Filed: April 3, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 2, 2010 USA v. Daniel Milli

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FILED OPINION (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and JAY S. BYBEE) REVERSED. Judge: SRT Authoring, Judge: MMM , Judge: JSB Dissenting. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7460942] (PH)
March 2, 2010 Filing 21 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO SIDNEY R. THOMAS, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and JAY S. BYBEE. [7252175] (DT)
January 14, 2010 Filing 20 Notice of Oral Argument on MARCH 2 2010 Univ of Nevada Las Vegas Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7196081] (AW)
October 5, 2009 Filing 19 Received 10 paper copies of Reply brief [16] filed by Daniel J. Millis in 09-10134. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [7086432] (SD)
October 1, 2009 Filing 18 Filed clerk order: Reply Brief [16] filed by Daniel J. Millis. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Grey cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7081369] (PK)
September 29, 2009 Filing 17 Filed Appellant Daniel J. Millis supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [7079210] (EB)
September 28, 2009 Filing 16 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Daniel J. Millis. Date of service: 09/28/2009. [7077140] (WGW)
September 18, 2009 Filing 15 Filed Appellee USA excerpts of record in 1 volume. Served on 09/14/2009. [7068219] (PK)
September 18, 2009 Filing 14 Received 10 paper copies of Answering brief [12] filed by USA in 09-10134. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [7067225] (SD)
September 15, 2009 Filing 13 Filed clerk order: Answering Brief [12] filed by USA. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7061915] (PK)
September 14, 2009 Filing 12 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee USA. Date of service: 09/14/2009. [7060544] (ALD)
August 31, 2009 Filing 11 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 10/23/08 8/27/09 [7046312] (CW)
July 28, 2009 Filing 10 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 10/23/08 [7006573] (CW)
July 24, 2009 Filing 9 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 10/23/08 [7002352] (CW)
July 22, 2009 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH): The appellee’s motion for an extension of time in which to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due September 14, 2009. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Court records do not currently reflect that the district court has issued the certificate of record. The appellant shall monitor the issuance of the certificate. [6999689] (AF)
July 21, 2009 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 09/14/2009. Date of service: 07/21/2009. [6998463] (ALD)
July 16, 2009 Filing 5 Received 10 paper copies of Opening brief [3] filed by Daniel J. Millis in 09-10134. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [6994460] (SD)
July 15, 2009 Filing 4 Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [3] filed by Daniel J. Millis. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [6992266] (PK)
July 13, 2009 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Daniel J. Millis excerpts of record in 1 volume. Served on 07/10/2009. [6995395] (PK)
July 10, 2009 Filing 3 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Daniel J. Millis. Date of service: 07/10/2009. [6987967] (WGW)
June 26, 2009 Filing 2 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellant Daniel J. Millis brief. [6970199] Appellant Daniel J. Millis opening brief due 07/13/2009. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 08/12/2009. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. (CB)
April 3, 2009 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Filed in District Court on 03/27/2009. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed:. Transcript shall be ordered by 04/17/2009 for Appellant Daniel J. Millis. Transcript shall be filed by 05/18/2009. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 06/29/2009 for Daniel J. Millis. Appellee brief due 07/29/2009 for United States of America. Appellant reply brief due by 08/12/2009 for Daniel J. Millis. (WF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Daniel Milli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ann L. DeMarais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: DANIEL J. MILLIS
Represented By: William G. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?