National Meat Association, et al v. Edmund Brown, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee,: NATIONAL MEAT ASSOCIATION
Defendant,: EDMUND G. BROWN, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California and STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Defendant-intervenor - Appellant,: THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, FARM SANCTUARY, INC., HUMANE FARMING ASSOCIATION and ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Plaintiff-intervenor,: AMERICAN MEAT INSTITUTE
Case Number: 09-15486
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2011 Filing 46 Transmitted to the U.S. Supreme Court: 1 volume(s) of 9th Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals record proceedings; the District Court record is fully electronic. U.S. Supreme Court Case Number: 10-224. Tracking Information: FedEx 943607193936. [7852894] [09-15483, 09-15486] (SS)
June 27, 2011 Filing 45 Received notice from the Supreme Court. Petition for certiorari GRANTED on 06/27/2011. Supreme Court Number 10-224. [7798829] [09-15483, 09-15486] (LC)
August 27, 2010 Filing 44 Attorneys Sarah Conant substituted by attorney Peter Alfred Brandt [7454364] [09-15483, 09-15486] (LC)
August 26, 2010 Filing 43 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Peter Brandt for Appellants ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15486, - ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15483. Date of service: 08/26/2010. [7452729] [09-15486, 09-15483] (SC)
August 19, 2010 Filing 41 Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 08/13/2010. Supreme Court Number 10-224. [7446084] [09-15483, 09-15486] (LC)
August 16, 2010 Filing 42 Received copy of the Petition for writ of certiorari filed in the Supreme Court -- Proof of service attched. (copy of petition for writ of certiorari in CASEFILES) [7446187] [09-15483, 09-15486] (LC)
May 25, 2010 Filing 40 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI)Plaintiff-Appellee’s motion to stay the mandate pending the filing of a timely petition for certiorari is granted. See Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(2). [7348941] [09-15483, 09-15486] (KKW)
May 24, 2010 Filing 39 Filed (ECF) - ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15483, Appellants ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15486 response opposing motion (,motion to stay the mandate). Date of service: 05/24/2010. [7347588] [09-15483, 09-15486] (SC)
May 20, 2010 Filing 38 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Meat Association in 09-15486 Motion to stay the mandate. Date of service: 05/20/2010. [7344182] [09-15483, 09-15486] (HMM)
May 18, 2010 Filing 37 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) The petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc is denied. See Fed. R. App. P. 35, 40. [7340312] [09-15483, 09-15486] (KKW)
April 21, 2010 Filing 36 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Meat Association in 09-15483 petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 03/31/2010 opinion). Date of service: 04/21/2010. [7310559] [09-15483, 09-15486]--[COURT UPDATE: Backdated to original filing date. 04/22/2010 by RY] (HMM)
April 21, 2010 Filing 35 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY: Correct entry: [36]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Appellee National Meat Association in 09-15483 petition for rehearing en banc (from 03/31/2010 opinion). Date of service: 04/21/2010. [7310054] [09-15483, 09-15486] (HMM)
April 6, 2010 Filing 34 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LC): Granting (ECF Filing) Appellee National Meat Association's 7-day motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing. Petition for rehearing and/ or rehearing en banc due on or before 04/21/2010 [7291152] [09-15483, 09-15486] (LC)
April 6, 2010 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Meat Association in 09-15486 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 04/21/2010. Date of service: 04/06/2010. [7290626] [09-15483, 09-15486] (HMM)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FILED OPINION (ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and BARRY G. SILVERMAN) VACATED. No costs. Judge: AK Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7284170] [09-15483, 09-15486] (RP)
August 11, 2009 Filing 31 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and BARRY G. SILVERMAN. [7025134] [09-15483, 09-15486] (SC)
August 6, 2009 Filing 30 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and BARRY G. SILVERMAN)Oral argument shall be limited to ten minutes for each side. [7017932] [09-15483, 09-15486] (KKW)
June 24, 2009 Filing 29 Notice of Oral Argument on AUGUST 11, 2009 Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [6967710] [09-15483, 09-15486] (AM)
May 28, 2009 Filing 28 CALENDARED: 08/11/2009 9:30 AM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 [08-16738, 09-10148, 09-10151, 08-10188, 08-10326, 09-10043, 09-15483, 09-15486] (MW)
May 27, 2009 Filing 27 Received 10 paper copies of Reply brief [25] filed by ALDF, The Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary, Inc. and Humane Farming Association in 09-15483, 09-15486. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [09-15483, 09-15486] (SD)
May 27, 2009 Filing 26 Calendar materials being prepared. [08-16738, 09-10148, 09-10151, 08-10188, 08-10326, 09-10043, 09-15483, 09-15486] (AM)
May 22, 2009 Filing 30 Filed clerk order: Reply Brief [25] filed by ALDF, The Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary, Inc. and Humane Farming Association. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Grey cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
May 21, 2009 Filing 25 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15486. Date of service: 05/21/2009. [6928893] [09-15486, 09-15483] (SC)
May 20, 2009 Filing 24 Received 10 paper copies of Reply brief [22] filed by Edmund G. Brown, State of California and Arnold Schwarzenegger in 09-15483. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [09-15483, 09-15486] (SD)
May 18, 2009 Filing 26 Filed clerk order: Reply Brief [22] filed by Edmund G. Brown, State of California and Arnold Schwarzenegger. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Grey cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
May 18, 2009 Filing 23 Calendar check performed. [09-15483, 09-15486] (MW)
May 15, 2009 Filing 22 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California in 09-15483, - Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California in 09-15486. Date of service: 05/15/2009. [6922993] [09-15483, 09-15486] (SKS)
May 15, 2009 Filing 21 Filed clerk order: Electronically-filed document [20] Reply to Response to Motion (ECF Filing) is stricken because there is an error in the document. See Order for details. [09-15483, 09-15486] (RL)
May 15, 2009 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellants Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California in 09-15483, - Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California in 09-15486 reply to response (Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 05/15/2009. [6922796] [09-15483, 09-15486] (SKS)
May 14, 2009 Filing 19 Filed order MOATT: (HS) These are consolidated preliminary injunction appeals.Appellant Humane Society of the United States’ oral request for an extension of time to file appellants’ reply brief in appeal no. 09-15486 is granted. Appellants’ reply brief in appeal no. 09-15486 is now due May 21, 2009.These consolidated cases are ready for calendaring. . [09-15483, 09-15486] (KKW)
May 6, 2009 Filing 18 Received 10 paper copies of Answering brief [16] filed by National Meat Association in 09-15483, 09-15486. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [09-15483, 09-15486] (SD)
May 5, 2009 Filing 17 Case rejected from Circuit Mediation Program. [09-15230, 09-15286, 09-15296, 09-15298, 09-15363, 09-15448, 09-15463, 09-15483, 09-15486, 09-15530, 09-15641, 09-15642, 09-15664, 09-35212, 09-55049, 09-55119, 09-55123, 09-55154, 09-55354, 09-55478, 09-55532] (SB)
May 4, 2009 Filing 19 Filed clerk order: Answering Brief [16] filed by National Meat Association. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
May 1, 2009 Filing 16 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee National Meat Association in 09-15483, 09-15486. Date of service: 05/01/2009. [6905475] [09-15483, 09-15486] (HMM)
April 29, 2009 Filing 15 Filed order MOATT: (HS) Granting Motion (ECF Filing) This is a preliminary injunction appeal. Appellee National Meat Association’s motion for an enlargement of brief size is granted. Appellee is granted an enlargement of 5 pages, 1,400 words or 130 lines of monospaced text. See Ninth Circuit Rule 28-4. The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. [09-15483, 09-15486] (SC)
April 16, 2009 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Meat Association in 09-15483 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Enlargement of Brief Size]. Date of service: 04/16/2009. [6886354] [09-15483, 09-15486] (ZB)
April 9, 2009 Filing 13 Received 10 paper copies of Opening brief [10] filed by ALDF, The Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary, Inc. and Humane Farming Association. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
April 8, 2009 Filing 12 Received 10 paper copies of Opening brief [9] filed by Edmund G. Brown, State of California and Arnold Schwarzenegger. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
April 6, 2009 Filing 12 Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [9] filed by Edmund G. Brown, State of California and Arnold Schwarzenegger. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
April 6, 2009 Filing 11 Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [10] filed by ALDF, The Humane Society of the United States, Farm Sanctuary, Inc. and Humane Farming Association. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
April 6, 2009 Filing 11 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed - ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association, The Humane Society of the United States and Appellants Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California four excerpts of record in 5 volumes. Served on 04/03/2009 [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
April 6, 2009 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15486. Date of service: 04/06/2009. [6871524] [09-15486, 09-15483] (SC)
April 3, 2009 Filing 9 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Edmund G. Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger and State of California in 09-15483. Date of service: 04/03/2009. [6871145] [09-15483, 09-15486] (SKS)
April 3, 2009 Filing 8 Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [7] will not be filed because of deficiencies (no statement of related cases). Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer shall submit a new brief via ECF curing the deficiencies. If a motion was filed with the brief, the motion should be filed again with the submission of the new brief. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [6870112] [09-15483, 09-15486] (GLS)
April 3, 2009 Filing 7 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States in 09-15486. Date of service: 04/03/2009. [6869632] [09-15486, 09-15483] (SC)
March 18, 2009 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) courtesy copy of transcript designation forms. Date of service: 03/18/2009. [6850855] [09-15486, 09-15483] (SKS)
March 17, 2009 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) courtesy copy of transcript designation forms. Date of service: 03/17/2009. [6848544] [09-15486, 09-15483] (PAB)
March 17, 2009 Filing 4 Filed order MOATT: (HS)The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 09-15483 and 09-15486. These appeals are consolidated. These appeals filed March 5, 2009, and March 6, 2009, respectively, are preliminary injunction appeals. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days of the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule is established as follows: the opening briefs are due not later than April 3, 2009; the answering briefs are due May 1, 2009 or 28 days after service of the opening briefs, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply briefs are due within 14 days of service of the answering briefs. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. If appellants fail to file timely the opening briefs, these appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [09-15483, 09-15486] (KKW)
March 13, 2009 Filing 3 Filed Appellants ALDF, Farm Sanctuary, Inc., Humane Farming Association and The Humane Society of the United States Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Served on 03/06/2009. (RT)
March 13, 2009 Filing 2 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC None (RT)
March 13, 2009 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: No. The schedule is set as follows: to be selt. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. Circuit Rule 3-3. All filings to MOATT. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Meat Association, et al v. Edmund Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: NATIONAL MEAT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Zachary Bulthuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: EDMUND G. BROWN, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Susan K. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Susan K. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Susan K. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-intervenor - appellant,: THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Peter Alfred Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-intervenor - appellant,: FARM SANCTUARY, INC.
Represented By: Peter Alfred Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-intervenor - appellant,: HUMANE FARMING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Peter Alfred Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-intervenor - appellant,: ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Peter Alfred Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff-intervenor,: AMERICAN MEAT INSTITUTE
Represented By: Michele B. Corash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?