Robert McDaniels v. Richard Kirkland, et al
Petitioner - Appellant,: ROBERT MCDANIELS
Respondent - Appellee,: RICHARD KIRKLAND, Warden and KRAMER, Warden
Case Number: 09-17339
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 25, 2014 Summary McDaniels v. Kirkland
February 26, 2015 Summary ROBERT MCDANIELS V. RICHARD KIRKLAND
December 24, 2015 Summary ROBERT MCDANIELS V. RICHARD KIRKLAND
December 24, 2015 ROBERT MCDANIELS V. RICHARD KIRKLAND
October 14, 2016 Summary ROBERT MCDANIELS V. RICHARD KIRKLAND

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert McDaniels v. Richard Kirkland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant,: ROBERT MCDANIELS
Represented By: Robert McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee,: RICHARD KIRKLAND, Warden
Represented By: John R. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee,: KRAMER, Warden
Represented By: John R. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?