Professional Basketball Club L v. Robert Brotherson, et al Featured Case
Petitioner,: PROFESSIONAL BASKETBALL CLUB LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company registered to do business in the State of Washington
Respondent,: ROBERT BROTHERSON, PATRICK SHEEHY and CAROLYN BECHTEL, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 09-80122
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2009 Filing 6 Terminated Frederick W. Schoepflin for Patrick Sheehy, Robert Brotherson and Carolyn Bechtel in 09-80122 [7109509] (PH)
October 23, 2009 Filing 5 Terminated Ian Jeremy Mensher for Patrick Sheehy, Robert Brotherson and Carolyn Bechtel in 09-80122 [7106075] (PH)
October 23, 2009 Filing 4 Order filed (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON) The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court’s July 1, 2009 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005) (per curiam). DENIED. [7105817] (BJB)
July 24, 2009 Filing 3 Filed Respondents Carolyn Bechtel, Robert Brotherson and Patrick Sheehy answer to petition for permission. Served on 07/23/2009. [7003277] (CW)
July 16, 2009 Filing 2 Filed Petitioner Professional Basketball Club LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement. Served on 07/15/2009. [6994266] (HC)
July 16, 2009 Filing 1 FILED ON 07/16/2009 ORIGINAL AND 4 COPIES OF PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 23(f). SERVED ON 07/15/2009. [6994253] (HC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Professional Basketball Club L v. Robert Brotherson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: PROFESSIONAL BASKETBALL CLUB LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company registered to do business in the State of Washington
Represented By: John A. Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: ROBERT BROTHERSON
Represented By: Mark Adam Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: PATRICK SHEEHY
Represented By: Mark Adam Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: CAROLYN BECHTEL, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Mark Adam Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?