Yvon Wagner v. County of Maricopa, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant,: YVON WAGNER, as the personal representative of the Estate of Eric Vogel
Defendant - Appellee,: COUNTY OF MARICOPA, a political subdivision of the State of Arizona, JOSEPH M. ARPAIO, husband and UNKNOWN ARPAIO, Named as Jane Doe Arpaio - wife
Case Number: 10-15501
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 7, 2012 Summary Wagner v. County of Maricopa, et al.
November 16, 2012 Summary YVON WAGNER V. COUNTY OF MARICOPA
February 13, 2013 Summary YVON WAGNER V. COUNTY OF MARICOPA
December 30, 2013 Summary YVON WAGNER V. COUNTY OF MARICOPA

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9025631631 Filed order and amended opinion (JOHN T. NOONAN, N. RANDY SMITH and FREDERIC BLOCK). The amended opinion filed on February 13, 2013 is amended by eliminating the following part of the opinion: (See order for full text) In light of these amendments, Judges Noonan and Block vote to deny the petition for rehearing and recommend denying the petition for rehearing en banc. Judge N.R. Smith votes to grant the petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc, and no judge of the court has requested a vote on it. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc are denied. No further petitions for rehearing or for rehearing en banc shall be entertained. ; Amending REVERSED AND REMANDED. [8919134]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Yvon Wagner v. County of Maricopa, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: YVON WAGNER, as the personal representative of the Estate of Eric Vogel
Represented By: Joel Brooks Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: COUNTY OF MARICOPA, a political subdivision of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOSEPH M. ARPAIO, husband
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: UNKNOWN ARPAIO, Named as Jane Doe Arpaio - wife
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?