Teri Pham v. Michael Flynn Featured Case
Appellant,: TERI PHAM
Plaintiff - Appellee,: DENNIS MONTGOMERY, an individual and MONTGOMERY FAMILY TRUST, a California Trust
Defendant,: ETREPPID TECHNOLOGIES, a Nevada LLC, WARREN TREPP, an individual, EDRA BLIXSETH and OPSPRING, LLC
Case Number: 10-15958
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) Appellant Teri Pham Motion to take judicial notice of The recent order issued in case nos. 3:06-CV-00056-PMP-VPC and 3:06-CV-00145-PMP-VPC. Date of service: 01/12/2011. [7610623] (DL)
December 7, 2010 Filing 27 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [25] filed by Teri Pham. [7570131] (SD)
December 3, 2010 Filing 26 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [25] submitted by Teri Pham is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7566543] (FT)
December 1, 2010 Filing 25 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Teri Pham. Date of service: 12/01/2010. [7563022] (DL)
October 29, 2010 Filing 24 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [19] filed by Michael Flynn. [7528512] (SD)
October 27, 2010 Filing 22 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH): The appellant's motion for an extension of time in which to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due December 1, 2010. [7524102] (WL)
October 25, 2010 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellant Teri Pham Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 12/01/2010 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521995] (DL)
October 22, 2010 Filing 20 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [19] submitted by Michael Flynn is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7519163] (FT)
October 20, 2010 Filing 23 Filed Appellee Michael Flynn supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volumes. [7527709] (FT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 19 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Michael Flynn. Date of service: 10/18/2010. [7511809] (CC)
August 24, 2010 Filing 18 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH): The appellee’s motion for an extension of time in which to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due October 18, 2010. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief.[7449915] (WL)
August 23, 2010 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael Flynn Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 10/18/2010 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 08/23/2010. [7449167] (CC)
August 23, 2010 Filing 16 Added attorney Christopher Conant for Michael Flynn. [7449149] (JFF)
August 23, 2010 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher James Conant for Appellee Michael Flynn. Date of service: 08/23/2010. [7449104] (CC)
August 9, 2010 Filing 14 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [9] filed by Teri Pham. [7433901] (SD)
August 4, 2010 Filing 13 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [9] submitted by Teri Pham is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7428043] (FT)
August 3, 2010 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Teri Pham excerpts of record in 7 volumes. Served on 08/02/2010. [7427874] (FT)
August 2, 2010 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellant Teri Pham Correspondence: Appellant's Notice of Filing Portions of Excerts of Record Under Seal. Date of service: 08/02/2010 [7426090] (DL)
August 2, 2010 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Teri Pham Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 08/02/2010. [7426069] (DL)
August 2, 2010 Filing 9 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Teri Pham. Date of service: 08/02/2010. [7426029] (DL)
July 2, 2010 Filing 8 Case rejected from Circuit Mediation Program. [7392099] [10-15686, 10-15816, 10-15958, 10-15960, 10-15966, 10-15980, 10-16011, 10-16062, 10-16126, 10-16153, 10-16154, 10-16155, 10-16156, 10-16157, 10-16160, 10-16182, 10-16187, 10-16232, 10-16243, 10-35433, 10-35453, 10-35464, 10-35562, 10-55143, 10-55331, 10-55416, 10-55515, 10-55516, 10-55714] (SB)
May 27, 2010 Filing 7 Terminated Thomas H. Casey for Dennis Montgomery in 10-15958, Dennis L. Kennedy for Montgomery Family Trust in 10-15958, Timothy Ryan O'Reilly for Dennis Montgomery in 10-15958 [7351864] (HH)
May 27, 2010 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:HH): The briefing schedule set on April 27, 2010, is amended as follows: Appellant’s opening brief and excerpts of record are due August 2, 2010; appellee’s answering brief is due September 1, 2010; and the optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7351748] (HH)
May 26, 2010 Filing 5 Entered appearance of Appellee Michael Flynn in 10-15958 and 10-15960. [7350336] [10-15958, 10-15960] (HH)
May 14, 2010 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Teri Pham Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/14/2010. [7338450] (DL)
May 12, 2010 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Teri Pham Correspondence: Modification of caption to appropriately reflect the parties and issues on appeal. Date of service: 05/12/2010 [7334949]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached Certificate of Service. 05/13/2010 by RY] (DL)
April 27, 2010 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Teri Pham Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 04/23/2010. [7316099] (GR)
April 27, 2010 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/24/2010. Transcript due 06/22/2010. Appellant Teri Pham opening brief due 08/02/2010. Appellee Dennis Montgomery and Appellee Montgomery Family Trust answering brief due 09/01/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7316088] (GR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Teri Pham v. Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant,: TERI PHAM
Represented By: John Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: DENNIS MONTGOMERY, an individual
Represented By: Thomas H. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: MONTGOMERY FAMILY TRUST, a California Trust
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ETREPPID TECHNOLOGIES, a Nevada LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: WARREN TREPP, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: EDRA BLIXSETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: OPSPRING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?