USA v. State of Arizona, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant - Appellant,: STATE OF ARIZONA and JANICE K. BREWER, Governor of the State of Arizona, in her official capacity
Case Number: 10-16645
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 11, 2011 Summary USA v. State of Arizona, et al
August 8, 2012 Summary USA V. STATE OF ARIZONA

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2011 204 Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 08/10/2011. Supreme Court Number 11-182. [7858023] (LC)
July 6, 2011 202 Terminated Anne Lai for Friendly House in 10-16645 [7808538] (TB)
July 5, 2011 203 Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 06/30/2011. Time to file petition for writ of certiorari extended to and including August 10, 2011. [7809823] (TB)
July 5, 2011 201 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Friendly House Correspondence: Anne Lai - withdrawal as attorney of record. Date of service: 07/05/2011 [7808244] (AL)
June 29, 2011 200 MANDATE ISSUED.(JTN, RAP and CTB) [7801575] (TB)
April 11, 2011 199 Featured Case FILED OPINION (JOHN T. NOONAN, RICHARD A. PAEZ and CARLOS T. BEA) AFFIRMED; REMANDED. Judge: JTN Concurring, Judge: RAP Authoring, Judge: CTB Concurring & Dissenting. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7711547] (RP)
March 11, 2011 198 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/11/2011. [7677495] (DT)
March 1, 2011 197 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/01/2011. [7664236] (JB)
January 28, 2011 196 Attorneys Michael A. Cox substituted by Attorneys Bill Schuette [7628848] (JFF)
January 28, 2011 195 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Michigan Correspondence: Update docket to name Michigan Attorney General Bill Schuette in the place of former Michigan Attorney General Mike Cox.. Date of service: 01/28/2011 [7628515] (BER)
January 21, 2011 194 Added attorney Juniper Lesnik Downs for County of Santa Clara. [7620978] (JFF)
January 21, 2011 193 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Juniper Lesnik Downs for Amicus Curiae County of Santa Clara. Date of service: 01/21/2011. [7620966] (JLD)
January 6, 2011 192 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/06/2011. [7603183] (JB)
December 17, 2010 191 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/17/2010. [7583921] (MPA)
November 24, 2010 190 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae American Unity Legal Defense Fund citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/24/2010. [7557297] (BWZ)
November 4, 2010 189 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae County of Santa Clara citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/04/2010. [7535450] (GSH)
November 2, 2010 188 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [158] submitted by Center on the Administration of Criminal Law is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7531967] (FT)
November 1, 2010 187 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO JOHN T. NOONAN, RICHARD A. PAEZ and CARLOS T. BEA. [7529761] (GB)
October 29, 2010 186 Filed order (JOHN T. NOONAN, RICHARD A. PAEZ and CARLOS T. BEA) Arizona’s Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. The Center on the Administration of Criminal Law’s Motion for leave to file an Amicus brief is GRANTED and the clerk shall file the Amicus brief submitted by this party. [7528596] (WL)
October 29, 2010 185 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA)CBS Network News applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. CBS Network News' request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7528296] (PA)
October 29, 2010 184 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KTVU-Channel 2 News applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KTVU-Channel 2 News' request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7528268] (PA)
October 29, 2010 183 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): NBC-KNTV applied to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, audio-record for later broadcast and photograph with still camera the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. NBC-KNTV 's request to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, and audio-record for later broadcast GRANTED. NBC-KNTV 's request to photograph with still camera is DENIED. [7527745] (PA)
October 29, 2010 182 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KMSB-TV applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KMSB-TV's request videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7527676] (PA)
October 29, 2010 181 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA)AP Television applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. AP Television's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7527658] (PA)
October 28, 2010 180 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [7525539] filed by Fight for Equality By Any Means Necessary and The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration and Immigrant Rights. [7527042] (FT)
October 28, 2010 179 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KRON-4 News applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KRON-4 News' request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7526694] (PA)
October 28, 2010 178 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): The Associated Press applied to photograph with still camera the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. The Associated Press' request to photograph with still camera is DENIED. [7526640] (PA)
October 28, 2010 177 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):National Public Radio applied to audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. National Public Radio's request to audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7526485] (PA)
October 27, 2010 175 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):Vivo Media Group applied to videotape for later broadcast and photograph with still camera the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Vivo Media Group's request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED and request to photograph with still camera is DENIED. [7525589] (PA)
October 27, 2010 174 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KPFA, KPFK and KFCF applied to audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KPFA, KPFK and KFCF's request to audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7525587] (PA)
October 26, 2010 172 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):CNN applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. CNN's' request to televise live is GRANTED. [7523830] (PA)
October 26, 2010 171 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KGO-TV applied videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KGO- TV's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED.[7523101] (PA)
October 26, 2010 170 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): NBC-Universal News and NBC entities (including The Today Show, Nightly News, MSNBC, NBC News Channel [serving 186 affiliates around the country], Foreign clients and CNBC), applied to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, stream live and for later broadcast via webcast, the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. NBC-Universal News' request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7523090] (PA)
October 25, 2010 169 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KNXV-TV applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KNXV-TV's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7521173] (PA)
October 25, 2010 168 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): Fox News applied to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Fox News request to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7520893] (PA)
October 25, 2010 167 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KTVK-TV Phoenix applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KTVK- TV's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7520837] (PA)
October 25, 2010 166 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):Univision Network News applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Univision Network News' request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7520802] (PA)
October 22, 2010 165 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KNXV-TV applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KNXV-TV's request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7518842] (PA)
October 21, 2010 164 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):)Camino Bluff Production, Inc. applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Camino Bluff Production, Inc.'s request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7518459] (PA)
October 21, 2010 163 Added attorney Ricardo Solano Jr. for Center on the Administration of Criminal Law [7517876] (JFF)
October 21, 2010 162 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ricardo Solano, Jr. for Amicus Curiae - Pending Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. Date of service: 10/21/2010. [7517830] (RS)
October 21, 2010 161 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. [7517799] (FT)
October 20, 2010 160 Added attorney Nina Perales for Friendly House. [7515678] (JFF)
October 20, 2010 159 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nina Perales for Amicus Curiae Friendly House. Date of service: 10/20/2010. [7515344] (NP)
October 19, 2010 158 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. Date of service: 10/19/2010. [7514075] (RS)
October 18, 2010 157 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:WL): Amicus Curiae Friendly House Plaintiffs’ Motion to Participate in Oral Argument is DENIED. However, oral argument is extended to 30 minutes per side, and the parties can share their allotted time with Amici counsel if they so agree. [7512840] (WL)
October 18, 2010 156 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):NBC-Universal News and NBC entities (including The Today Show, Nightly News, MSNBC, NBC News Channel [serving 186 affiliates around the country], Foreign clients and CNBC), applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. NBC-Universal News' request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7512345] (PA)
October 15, 2010 155 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA response to motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 10/15/2010. [7510505] (TMB)
October 15, 2010 154 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KPNX-TV applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KPNX-TV's request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7510261] (PA)
October 15, 2010 153 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [147] filed by Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona. (Sent to panel) [7510127] (SD)
October 14, 2010 152 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AF): Defendants-Appellants’ Motion for Leave to File Response to the Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States is DENIED. [7508745] (AF)
October 13, 2010 151 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [147] submitted by Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7507251] (FT)
October 13, 2010 150 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Notice of Lodging Proposed Brief and Proposed Brief. Date of service: 10/13/2010. [7506576]--[COURT UPDATE: changed docket text to reflect content of filing. 10/14/2010 by MS] (JB)
October 13, 2010 149 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [90] filed by Arizona Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis, and Somerton. (Sent to panel) [7506508] (SD)
October 12, 2010 148 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Motion to take judicial notice of pertinent portions of legislative history from the Immigration and Reform Act of 1986. Date of service: 10/12/2010. [7505521] (JB)
October 12, 2010 147 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona. Date of service: 10/12/2010. [7505486] (JB)
October 12, 2010 146 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA)Capitol Media Services/Arizona Public Radio applied to audiotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Capitol Media Services/Arizona Public Radio's application to audiotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7505436] (PA)
October 12, 2010 145 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KSAZ-TV applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. KSAZ-TV's request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7505343] (PA)
October 12, 2010 144 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): .Telemundo Network News applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Telemundo Network News' request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. (PANEL) [7505303] (PA)
October 12, 2010 140 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [101] filed by AILA. (Sent to panel) [7505042] (SD)
October 12, 2010 139 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):C-SPAN applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on November 1, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. C-SPAN's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. A maximum of two (2) video cameras will be permitted in the courtroom. C-SPAN will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application. [7504666] (PA)
October 12, 2010 138 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Friendly House Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave for Amici Curiae Friendly House Plaintiffs to Participate in Oral Argument]. Date of service: 10/12/2010. [7504026] (LJ)
October 7, 2010 143 Received original and 7 copies of Amicus Curiae Ray Elbert Parker brief in 9 pages. Major deficiencies: motion pending. Other deficiencies:. Served on 10/05/2010 [7505150] (FT)
October 7, 2010 142 Filed Amicus Curiae Ray Elbert Parker motion to to become amicus curiae, served on 10/04/2010. [7505131] (FT)
October 7, 2010 141 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Ray Elbert Parker. [7505124] (FT)
October 7, 2010 137 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [99] filed by LULAC, et al. (Sent to panel) [7500778] (SD)
October 7, 2010 134 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [22] filed by State Senator Russell Pearce. (Sent to panel) [7500685] (SD)
October 6, 2010 133 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [85] filed by Constitutional Accountability Center. (Sent to panel) [7499094] (SD)
October 6, 2010 132 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [21] filed by Joseph M. Arpaio. (Sent to panel) [7499074] (SD)
October 6, 2010 131 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [91] filed by The United Mexican States. (Sent to panel) [7499052] (SD)
October 6, 2010 130 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [97] filed by Anti-Defamation League. (Sent to panel)[7499041] (SD)
October 6, 2010 129 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [98] filed by Friendly House. (Sent to panel) [7499038] (SD)
October 6, 2010 128 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [95] filed by City of Tucson. (Sent to panel) [7499022] (SD)
October 5, 2010 127 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [96] filed by County of Santa Clara, California, et al. (Sent to panel) [7498526] (SD)
October 5, 2010 126 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Motion for miscellaneous relief [APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO THE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF THE UNITED MEXICAN STATES]. Date of service: 10/05/2010. [7498205] (JB)
October 5, 2010 125 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [87] filed by Legal Momentum. (Sent to panel) [7497815] (SD)
October 5, 2010 124 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [44] filed by Larry A. Dever. (Sent to panel) [7497794] (SD)
October 5, 2010 123 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [100] filed by National Council of La Raza. (Sent to panel) [7497783] (SD)
October 5, 2010 122 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [99] submitted by LULAC, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7497167] (LA)
October 4, 2010 136 Filed Amici Curiae - Pending Fight for Equality By Any Means Necessary and The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration and Immigrant Rights motion to become amicus curiae. Served on 09/30/2010. [7500735] (FT)
October 4, 2010 135 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pendings The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration and Immigrant Rights and Fight for Equality By Any Means Necessary. [7500720] (FT)
October 4, 2010 121 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [95] submitted by City of Tucson is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495575] (LA)
October 4, 2010 120 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [101] submitted by American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA) is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495401] (LA)
October 4, 2010 119 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [100] submitted by National Council of La Raza, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495390] (LA)
October 4, 2010 118 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [97] submitted by Anti-Defamation League is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495378] (LA)
October 4, 2010 117 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [96] submitted by County of Santa Clara, California, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495369] (LA)
October 4, 2010 116 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [90] submitted by Arizona Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis, and Somerton is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495358] (LA)
October 4, 2010 115 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [87] submitted by Legal Momentum is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495350] (LA)
October 4, 2010 114 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [91] submitted by The United Mexican States is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495344] (LA)
October 4, 2010 113 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:WL): The following entities, individuals, and governments have filed Motions for leave to file an Amicus brief: (1) The United Mexican States; (2) Legal Momentum; (3) Arizona Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis, and Somerton; (4) City of Tucson; (5) The County of Santa Clara, California; (6) Anti-Defamation League; (7) Friendly House Plaintiffs; (8) League of United Latin American Citizens, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Chicanos Por La Causa, Inc., Magdalena Schwartz, Joseph David Sandoval, and David Salgado; (9) National Council of La Raza, United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, The Hispanic National Bar Association And Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association; and (10) American Immigration Lawyers Association. The following governments have moved for leave to join the Amicus brief of The United Mexican States: Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Costa Rica, Ecuador, El Salvador, Nicaragua, Paraguay, Peru, and Chile. All of the Motions are GRANTED and the clerk shall file the Amicus briefs submitted by these parties. [7495148] (WL)
October 4, 2010 112 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [98] submitted by Friendly House is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7495135] (LA)
October 1, 2010 111 Filed clerk order: Pursuant to the Court's order filed on September 20, 2010, the amicus brief [22] submitted by Arizona State Senator Russell Pearce is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7494371] (LA)
October 1, 2010 110 Filed clerk order: Pursuant to the Court's order filed on September 20, 2010, the amicus brief [44] submitted by Sheriff Larry A. Dever is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7494361] (LA)
October 1, 2010 109 Filed clerk order: Pursuant to the Court's order filed on September 20, 2010, the amicus brief [37] submitted by Landmark Legal Foundation is filed. Amicus curiae has already filed paper copies of this brief. [7494350] (LA)
October 1, 2010 108 Filed clerk order: Pursuant to the Court's order filed on September 20, 2010, the amicus brief [31] submitted by Foundation for the Preservation of Constitutionally Reserved Rights is filed. Amicus curiae has already filed paper copies of this brief. [7494343] (LA)
October 1, 2010 107 Filed clerk order: Pursuant to the Court's order filed on September 20, 2010, the amicus brief [21] submitted by Maricopa County Sheriff Joseph M. Arpaio is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7494321] (LA)
October 1, 2010 106 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending The Republic of Chile. [7494259] (JFF)
October 1, 2010 105 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending The Governments of Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Costa Rica, Ecuador, El Salvador, Nicaragua, Paraguay, and Peru. [7494248] (JFF)
October 1, 2010 104 Filed (ECF) The Governments of Argentina, Bolivia, Chile, Costa Rica, Ecuador, El Salvador, Paraguay, Peru, and Nicaragua Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 10/01/2010. [7494202] (CG)
October 1, 2010 103 Filed (ECF) The Republic of Chile Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 10/01/2010. [7494198] (CG)
October 1, 2010 102 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae: City of Tucson (#95), Friendly House(#98) and LULAC, et al. (#99) and Amici Curiae - Pending: Arizona Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis, and Somerton (#90), County of Santa Clara, California, et al. (#96), Anti-Defamation League (#97), National Council of La Raza, et al. (#100) and AILA (#101). [7494003] (LA)
September 30, 2010 101 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Immigration Lawyers Association (AILA). Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7493417] (VB)
September 30, 2010 100 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by National Council of La Raza, United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, The Hispanic National Bar Association And Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7493410]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect contents of filing (motion included). 10/01/2010 by RY] (SFC)
September 30, 2010 99 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by League of United Latin American Citizens, National Coalition of Latino Clergy and Christian Leaders, Chicanos Por La Causa, Inc., Magdalena Schwartz, Joseph David Sandoval, and David Salgado. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7493409]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief (footnotes) and Exhibits. Removed Notice of Appearance. Resent notice. 10/04/2010 by RY]--[COURT UPDATE: Reattached motion. 10/05/2010 by RY] (CRH)
September 30, 2010 98 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by FRIENDLY HOUSE PLAINTIFFS. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7493383]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief (footnotes). Removed motion to become amicus (have consent per FRAP 29(a)). Resent notice. 10/01/2010 by RY] (LJ)
September 30, 2010 97 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Anti-Defamation League. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7493333] (PSK)
September 30, 2010 96 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by THE COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, CALIFORNIA, et al.. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7493170] (GSH)
September 30, 2010 95 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by City of Tucson. Date of service: 09/23/2010. [7493105]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief (footnotes). Resent notice. 10/04/2010 by RY] (MWM)
September 30, 2010 94 COURT DELETED ENTRY: Per filer's request; refiled correctly: [103]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending The United Mexican States Motion to join in Opening brief filed on. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492994] (CG)
September 30, 2010 93 COURT DELETED ENTRY: Reattached Motion to [90]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Arizona Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis, and Somerton Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492955] (DLA)
September 30, 2010 92 COURT DELETED ENTRY: Per filer's request; refiled correctly: [104]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending The United Mexican States Motion to join in Opening brief filed on 09/30/2010. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492930] (CG)
September 30, 2010 91 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by The United Mexican States. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492904]--[COURT UPDATE: Reattached separated motion and amicus brief for processing. 10/01/2010 by RY] (CG)
September 30, 2010 90 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Arizona Cities of Flagstaff, Tolleson, San Luis, and Somerton. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492861]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached Motion to become amicus. Resent notice. 09/30/2010 by RY] (DLA)
September 30, 2010 89 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [85] submitted by Constitutional Accountability Center is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7492664]--[Edited 10/01/2010 by LA to forward to panel] (FT)
September 30, 2010 88 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center, Amicus Curiae - Pendings The United Mexican States and Legal Momentum. [7492653] (FT)
September 30, 2010 87 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Legal Momentum. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492468]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached Certificate of Service. Resent notice. 10/01/2010 by RY] (JSM)
September 30, 2010 86 Deleted Docket Entry per filer, duplicative of #91. ORIGINAL DOCKET TEXT: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to intervene. Submitted by The United Mexican States. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7492281]--[Edited 10/01/2010 by SS] (CG)
September 30, 2010 85 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Constitutional Accountability Center. Date of service: 09/30/2010. [7491995] (EBW)
September 28, 2010 84 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KB): Appellants’ August 26, 2010 request for judicial notice is referred to the panel that will hear the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate.[7489369] (WL)
September 27, 2010 83 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [80] filed by USA. (Sent to panel) [7488334] (SD)
September 24, 2010 82 Filed Appellee USA supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volumes. [7486896] (FT)
September 23, 2010 81 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [80] submitted by USA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7485616] (LA)
September 23, 2010 80 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee USA. Date of service: 09/23/2010. [7485609] (DT)
September 21, 2010 79 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [37] filed by Landmark Legal Foundation. (Sent to panel) [7482026] (SD)
September 20, 2010 78 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AF): Arizona State Senator Russell Pearce’s Motion to Intervene is DENIED. The Court, however, treats the Motion as a Motion to File an Amicus Curiae brief. Treated as such, the clerk shall file the brief submitted by Senator Pearce as an Amicus Curiae brief. [7480867] (AF)
September 20, 2010 77 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AF): The following individuals and entities have filed Motions for leave to file an Amicus brief: (1) Maricopa County Sheriff Joseph M. Arpaio; (2) Ray Elbert Parker; (3) Foundation for the Preservation of Constitutionally Reserved Rights; (4) Landmark Legal Foundation; (5) Amici States; (6) Various Members of Congress; (7) Washington Legal Foundation; (8) Sheriff Larry A. Dever. All of the Motions are GRANTED and the clerk shall file the Amicus briefs submitted by these parties. [7480792] (AF)
September 20, 2010 76 Filed (ECF) State Senator Russell Pearce reply to response ([64] ). Date of service: 09/20/2010. [7479280]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of filing (not motion to intervene). Resent notice. 09/20/2010 by RY] (JP)
September 20, 2010 75 Notice of Oral Argument on NOVEMBER 1 2010 SF Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7479078] (AW)
September 10, 2010 74 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [31] filed by Foundation for the Preservation of Constitutionally Reserved Rights. (Sent to panel, not requested) [7476529] (SD)
September 10, 2010 73 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [42] filed by State Legislators for Legal Immigration. (Sent to panel) [7471014] (SD)
September 10, 2010 72 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [45] filed by Congressmen Ed Royce, Lamar Smith, Ted Poe, Tom McClintock, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and Individual Rights Foundation. (Sent to panel) [7469923] (SD)
September 10, 2010 71 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [39] filed by Members of Congress of the United States. (Sent to panel) [7469900] (SD)
September 10, 2010 70 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [43] filed by Allied Educational Foundation, U.S. Representatives Dan Burton, Lynn Jenkins, Tom McClintock, and Jerry Moran, CCFILE, National Border Patrol Council and WLF. (Sent to panel) [7469889] (SD)
September 9, 2010 69 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [32] filed by Justice and Freedom Fund. (Sent to panel) [7468339] (SD)
September 9, 2010 68 Deleted Duplicate Docket Entry. See docket entry [67]. (SD)
September 9, 2010 67 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [33] filed by Mountain States Legal Foundation. (Sent to panel) [7468202] (SD)
September 9, 2010 66 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [30] filed by American Unity Legal Defense Fund. (Sent to panel) [7468200] (SD)
September 8, 2010 65 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [41] filed by Center for Security Policy, Society of Americans for National Existence and Thomas More Law Center. (Sent to panel) [7467729] (SD)
September 8, 2010 64 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA response opposing motion (,motion to intervene). Date of service: 09/08/2010. [7467019] (TMB)
September 8, 2010 63 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [38] filed by Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, State of Idaho, State of Alabama, State of Florida, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of Pennsylvania, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas and State of Virginia. (Sent to panel) [7466624] (SD)
September 7, 2010 62 Added attorney Thomas Mark Bondy for USA. [7464308] (JFF)
September 7, 2010 61 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas M. Bondy for Appellee USA. Date of service: 09/07/2010. [7464295] (TMB)
September 3, 2010 60 Added attorney David Yerushalmi for Society of Americans for National Existence Center for Security Policy Thomas More Law Center. [7463828] (JFF)
September 3, 2010 59 Added attorney Richard Abbott Samp for National Border Patrol Council WLF Lynn Jenkins Jerry Moran Dan Burton Tom McClintock CCFILE Allied Educational Foundation [7463823] (JFF)
September 3, 2010 58 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Yerushalmi for Amici Curiae Center for Security Policy, Society of Americans for National Existence and Thomas More Law Center. Date of service: 09/03/2010. [7463748] (DY)
September 3, 2010 57 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Abbott Samp for Amici Curiae Allied Educational Foundation, Dan Burton, CCFILE, Lynn Jenkins, Tom McClintock, Jerry Moran, National Border Patrol Council and WLF. Date of service: 09/03/2010. [7463690] (RAS)
September 3, 2010 56 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [45] submitted by Congressmen Ed Royce, Lamar Smith, Ted Poe, Tom McClintock, Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence and Individual Rights Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463397] (LA)
September 3, 2010 55 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [43] submitted by WLF, U.S. Representatives Dan Burton, Lynn Jenkins, Tom McClintock, Jerry Moran, Allied Educational Foundation, CCFILE and National Border Patrol Council is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463351] (LA)
September 3, 2010 54 Added attorney John C. Eastman for Tom McClintock, in case 10-16645. [7463328] (LA)
September 3, 2010 53 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [42] submitted by State Legislators for Legal Immigration is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463318] (LA)
September 3, 2010 52 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [41] submitted by Thomas More Law Center, Center for Security Policy, Society of Americans for National Existence is filed. A motion to become amici is unnecessary pursuant to FRAP 29(a) because all parties have consented to the filing of the brief. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463259] (LA)
September 3, 2010 51 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [39] submitted by Members of Congress of the United States is filed. A motion for leave to participate as amici curiae is unnecessary pursuant to FRAP 29(a) because all parties have consented to the participation of the amici. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463242] (LA)
September 3, 2010 50 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [38] submitted by State of Michigan, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, State of Idaho, State of Alabama, State of Florida, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of Pennsylvania, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas and State of Virginia is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463230] (LA)
September 3, 2010 49 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [33] submitted by Mountain States Legal Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463213] (LA)
September 3, 2010 48 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [32] submitted by Justice and Freedom Fund is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463206] (LA)
September 3, 2010 47 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [30] submitted by American Unity Legal Defense Fund is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7463199] (LA)
September 3, 2010 46 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae: (1) State of Michigan, State of Alabama, State of Florida, STATE OF IDAHO, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, State of Pennsylvania, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Virginia, (2) Members of Congress of the United States, (3) Thomas More Law Center, Center for Security Policy, Society of Americans for National Existence, (4) State Legislators for Legal Immigration, (5) WLF, Dan Burton, Lynn Jenkins, Tom McClintock, Jerry Moran, Allied Educational Foundation, CCFILE, National Border Patrol Council, (6) Congressmen Ed Royce, Lamar Smith, Ted Poe, Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence and Individual Rights Foundation; Amici Curiae - Pending: (1) Landmark Legal Foundation and (2) Larry A. Dever. [7463182] (LA)
September 2, 2010 45 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Congressmen Ed Royce (CA-40), Lamar Smith (TX-21), Ted Poe (TX-2), Tom McClintock (CA-4); Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence; and Individual Rights Foundation. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7462222] (JCE)
September 2, 2010 44 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Sheriff Larry A. Dever. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7462216] (BB)
September 2, 2010 43 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Washington Legal Foundation, et al. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7462210] (RAS)
September 2, 2010 42 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by STATE LEGISLATORS FOR LEGAL IMMIGRATION. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461938] (GSK)
September 2, 2010 41 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Thomas More Law Center, Center for Security Policy, Society of Americans for National Existence. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461760] (RJM)
September 2, 2010 40 Filed (ECF) Landmark Legal Foundation corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461758] (RPH)
September 2, 2010 39 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Various Members of Congress. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461720] (JS)
September 2, 2010 38 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Amici States. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461700] (BER)
September 2, 2010 37 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Landmark Legal Foundation. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461553] (RPH)
September 2, 2010 36 Added attorney James Scott Detamore for Mountain States Legal Foundation. [7461389] (JFF)
September 2, 2010 35 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Scott Detamore for Amicus Curiae - Pending Mountain States Legal Foundation. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461378] (JSD)
September 2, 2010 34 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pendings American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Foundation for the Preservation of Constitutionally Reserved Rights, Justice and Freedom Fund and Mountain States Legal Foundation. [7461268] (FT)
September 2, 2010 33 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Mountain States Legal Foundation. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461120] (JSD)
September 2, 2010 32 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Justice and Freedom Fund. Date of service: 09/02/2010. [7461042] (JLH)
September 1, 2010 31 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Foundation for the Preservation of Constitutionally Reserved Rights. Date of service: 09/01/2010. [7460456]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief (footnotes). Resent notice. 09/03/2010 by RY] (BG)
September 1, 2010 30 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Unity Legal Defense Fund. Date of service: 09/01/2010. [7459952] (BWZ)
August 30, 2010 29 Filed Amicus Curiae - Pending Ray Elbert Parker motion for leave to file amicus curiae memorandum in support of defendants opposition to motion to dismiss file by appellant after docketing the notice of appeal with amicus curiae memorandum in support of the State of Arizona's opposition to motion to dismiss. Served on 08/25/2010. [7457850] (JFF)
August 27, 2010 28 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [23] filed by Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona. [7454958] (FT)
August 27, 2010 27 Filed Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona excerpts of record in 3 volumes. Served on 08/26/2010. [7454922] (FT)
August 26, 2010 26 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [23] submitted by Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7454216] (FT)
August 26, 2010 25 Entered appearance Maricopa County Sheriff Joseph M. Arpaio of Amicus Curiae - Pending Joseph M. Arpaio. [7454194] (FT)
August 26, 2010 24 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 08/26/2010. [7454121] (JB)
August 26, 2010 23 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona. Date of service: 08/26/2010. [7454038] (JB)
August 26, 2010 22 Submitted (ECF) Intervenor brief for review and filed Motion to intervene. Submitted by State Senator Russell Pearce. Date of service: 08/26/2010. [7453535] (PO)
August 26, 2010 21 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Maricopa County Sheriff Joseph M. Arpaio. Date of service: 08/26/2010. [7453456] (TPL)
August 18, 2010 20 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [16] filed by Kansas Speaker of the House Michael O'Neal and Kansas Senate Majority Leader Derek Schmidt. [7444630] (SD)
August 11, 2010 19 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [16] submitted by Kansas Senate Majority Leader Derek Schmidt and Kansas Speaker of the House Michael O'Neal is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7436642] (LA)
August 11, 2010 18 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Derek Schmidt and Michael O'Neal. [7436628] (LA)
August 11, 2010 17 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): Based on a review of the Mediation Questionnaire, this case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel for any party interested in obtaining assistance from the court in pursuing settlement of the case on appeal or learning more about the Mediation Program is encouraged to contact Stephen Liacouras, Circuit Mediator, by e-mail at stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov or fax at (415) 355-8566. The communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. Counsel are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. [7435301] (WL)
August 11, 2010 16 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Kansas Senate Majority Leader Derek Schmidt and Kansas Speaker of the House Michael O'Neal. Date of service: 08/11/2010. [7435215] (JRK)
August 5, 2010 14 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2010. [7429200] (JB)
August 4, 2010 15 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 07/27/10 [7429861] (JFF)
July 30, 2010 13 Filed order MOATT: (KB) The appeal filed July 29, 2010 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. To the extent that appellants seek to expedite the appeal beyond the provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3(b), appellants’ motion is denied. See 9th Cir. R. 27-12. Accordingly, briefing shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than August 26, 2010; the answering brief is due September 23, 2010 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) shall not apply to this appeal. The Clerk shall not grant any extensions of time to file the briefs absent extraordinary and compelling circumstances. The Clerk shall calendar this case during the week of November 1, 2010 in San Francisco, California. If appellants fail to file timely the opening brief, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [7424013] [7424013] (KD)
July 29, 2010 12 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA response to motion (,motion to expedite case). Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422786] (DT)
July 29, 2010 11 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422441] (JGA)
July 29, 2010 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice K. Brewer and State of Arizona Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422367] (JGA)
July 29, 2010 9 Filed representation notice. [7422248] (GR)
July 29, 2010 8 Added attorney Mark B. Stern for USA [7422237] (JFF)
July 29, 2010 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark B. Stern for Appellee USA. Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422229] (MPA)
July 29, 2010 5 Added attorney Beth S. Brinkmann, Daniel Tenny for USA. [7422170] (JFF)
July 29, 2010 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Beth S. Brinkmann for Appellee USA. Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422155] (MPA)
July 29, 2010 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Tenny for Appellee USA. Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422152] (DT)
July 29, 2010 2 Added attorney Michael P. Abate for USA. [7422143] (JFF)
July 29, 2010 1 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael P. Abate for Appellee USA. Date of service: 07/29/2010. [7422122] (MPA)
July 29, 2010 7 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/05/2010. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL. RULE 3-3 APPLIES. ALL FILINGS TO MOATT. [7422235] (GR)

Search for this case: USA v. State of Arizona, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael P. Abate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: John J. Bouma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: JANICE K. BREWER, Governor of the State of Arizona, in her official capacity
Represented By: John J. Bouma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?