Conklin Development, et al v. City Of Spokane Valley Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant,: CONKLIN DEVELOPMENT, a Washington general partnership and ROBERT J. HEITMAN, Jr., individually and on behalf of the marital community
Defendant - Appellee,: CITY OF SPOKANE VALLEY, a political subdivision of the State of Washington
Case Number: 10-35322
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2010 Filing 13 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): On or before October 27, 2010, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7505415] (KM)
September 16, 2010 Filing 12 Terminated Michael F. Connelly for City Of Spokane Valley in 10-35322 [7476926] (PH)
September 3, 2010 Filing 11 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously established by the court is vacated. On or before October 4, 2010, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. . [7462931] (KM)
August 4, 2010 Filing 10 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously established by the court is vacated. On or before September 2, 2010, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7428282] (KM)
July 1, 2010 Filing 9 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously established by the court is vacated. On or before July 14, 2010, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. . [7391213] (KM)
June 21, 2010 Filing 8 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously established by the court is vacated. On or before July 2, 2010, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7379345] (KM)
May 18, 2010 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): On or before June 2, 2010, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7340726] (KM)
April 22, 2010 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Conklin Development and Robert J. Heitman, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/22/2010. [7310813] (NGS)
April 12, 2010 Filing 5 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The conference previously scheduled for April 27, 2010, is rescheduled for April 22, 2010, at 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time [7297860] (KM)
April 5, 2010 Filing 4 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court., filed 4/5/10 [7292243] (CW)
April 2, 2010 Filing 3 Filed order MEDIATION (LW): Case referred to Mediation for assessment conference only. Telephone conference to be on 04/27/2010 at 02:30 pm. (Pacific Standard Time) [7288926] (KM)
April 2, 2010 Filing 2 Filed Appellants' Conklin Development and Robert J. Heitman, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 04/02/2010. (pdf attached to NOA). [7288642] (HC)
April 2, 2010 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/03/2010. Transcript due 06/01/2010. Appellant Conklin Development and Appellant Robert J. Heitman Jr. opening brief due 07/12/2010. Appellee City Of Spokane Valley answering brief due 08/10/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7288637] (HC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Conklin Development, et al v. City Of Spokane Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: CONKLIN DEVELOPMENT, a Washington general partnership
Represented By: Timothy Michael Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ROBERT J. HEITMAN, Jr., individually and on behalf of the marital community
Represented By: Timothy Michael Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CITY OF SPOKANE VALLEY, a political subdivision of the State of Washington
Represented By: Kenneth W. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?