Edward Peruta, et al v. County of San Diego, et al

Plaintiff - Appellant,: EDWARD PERUTA, MICHELLE LAXSON, JAMES DODD, LESLIE BUNCHER, Dr., MARK CLEARY and CALIFORNIA RIFLE AND PISTOL ASSOCIATION FOUNDATION
Defendant - Appellee,: COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO and WILLIAM D. GORE, individually and in his capacity as Sheriff
Case Number: 10-56971
Filed: December 16, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
February 13, 2014 Summary Peruta v. County of San Diego
November 12, 2014 Summary EDWARD PERUTA V. COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO
March 26, 2015 Summary EDWARD PERUTA V. COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO
June 9, 2016 Summary EDWARD PERUTA V. COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

Search for this case: Edward Peruta, et al v. County of San Diego, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: EDWARD PERUTA
Represented By: Paul Neuharth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: MICHELLE LAXSON
Represented By: Paul Neuharth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: JAMES DODD
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: LESLIE BUNCHER, Dr.
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: MARK CLEARY
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: CALIFORNIA RIFLE AND PISTOL ASSOCIATION FOUNDATION
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO
Represented By: James Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WILLIAM D. GORE, individually and in his capacity as Sheriff
Represented By: James Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?