Gibson Guitar Corp. v. Ebay Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee,: GIBSON GUITAR CORP., a Delaware corporation
Defendant - Appellant,: EBAY INC., a Delaware corporation
Defendant,: WOWWEE USA, INC., a California corporation, WAL-MART STORES, INC., a Delaware corporation, AMAZON.COM, INC., a Delaware corporation, BIG LOTS STORES, INC., an Ohio corporation, KMART CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation, TARGET CORPORATION, a Minnesota corporation, TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC., WALGREEN CO., an Illinois corporation, BROOKSTONE COMPANY, INC., a New Hampshire corporation, BEST BUY CO., INC., a Minnesota corporation, TOYWIZ, INC., a New York corporation and HSN, INC.
Case Number: 10-57019
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Filing 12 Order filed (Deputy Clerk: LN): These are preliminary injunction appeals. Appellants’ motion for voluntary dismissal of these appeals is granted. These appeals are dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All other pending motions are denied as moot. In light of this dismissal and the dismissal of the actions in the district court, the limited remand to the district court is moot. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [7604054] [10-57019, 10-57020, 10-57022] (AF)
December 29, 2010 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellants Amazon.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., Brookstone Company, Inc., HSN, Inc., KMart Corporation, Toys R US-Delaware, Inc., Walgreen Co. and Wowwee USA, Inc. in 10-57020 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/29/2010. [7595189] [10-57020, 10-57019, 10-57022] (AMP)
December 23, 2010 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) - Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. in 10-57019, 10-57020, Appellant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. in 10-57022 Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 12/23/2010. [7591450] [10-57019, 10-57020, 10-57022] (JCW)
December 23, 2010 Filing 9 Filed order (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER and SUSAN P. GRABER) These are preliminary injunction appeals. The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 10-57019, 10-57020 and 10-57022. These appeals are remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of enabling that court to state, orally or in writing, the reasons for its December 21, 2010, order granting appellee’s motion for a preliminary injunction. See Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 65(d)(1). The district court shall provide the oral or written statement within 14 days after the date of this order. Appellants’ motions for a stay of the district court’s December 21, 2010, order pending appeal are temporarily granted, pending further order of this court. Because these are preliminary injunction appeals, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of any proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule on the merits of the preliminary injunction appeals shall proceed as follows: the opening briefs and excerpts of record are due not later than January 19, 2011; the consolidated answering brief is due February 16, 2011, or 28 days after service of the last-filed opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). Appellants are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent possible. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. If an appellant fails to file timely its opening brief, that appellant’s appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district judge. [7591434] [10-57019, 10-57020, 10-57022] (KKW)
December 23, 2010 Filing 8 Added attorney Jeremy C. Wooden for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., in case 10-57019. [7591380] (EL)
December 23, 2010 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeremy C. Wooden for - Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Date of service: 12/23/2010. [7591370] (JCW)
December 23, 2010 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee Gibson Guitar Corp. response opposing motion (,motion to stay lower court action, ). Date of service: 12/23/2010. [7590924]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDFs of Opposition and Declaration with searchable versions. Spread filing in case number 10-57020. Resent NDA. 12/28/2010 by DB] (AEB)
December 23, 2010 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellee Gibson Guitar Corp. response opposing motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 12/23/2010. [7590808]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDFs of Opposition and Declaration with searchable versions. Resent NDA. 12/28/2010 by DB] (AEB)
December 22, 2010 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ebay Inc. EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 12/22/2010. [7590522] (JR)
December 22, 2010 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Ebay Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 12/22/2010. [7590394] (JN)
December 22, 2010 Filing 2 Received Appellant's Representation Statement. Served on 12/22/2010. [7590371] (JN)
December 22, 2010 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/29/2010. Referred to MOATT pursuant to FRAP 3-3. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL. [7590318] (JN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gibson Guitar Corp. v. Ebay Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: GIBSON GUITAR CORP., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Andrea E. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: EBAY INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lisa Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: WOWWEE USA, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: WAL-MART STORES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Laura Lindsay Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: AMAZON.COM, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: BIG LOTS STORES, INC., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: KMART CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: TARGET CORPORATION, a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Scott Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC.
Represented By: Adrian Mary Pruetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: WALGREEN CO., an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Adrian Mary Pruetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: BROOKSTONE COMPANY, INC., a New Hampshire corporation
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: BEST BUY CO., INC., a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: TOYWIZ, INC., a New York corporation
Represented By: Harvey S. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: HSN, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?