Carter Bryant v. Mattel, Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff-counter-defendant,: CARTER BRYANT, an individual
Defendant-counter-claimant - Appellee,: MATTEL, INC., a Delaware corporation
Counter-defendant - Appellant,: MGA ENTERTAINMENT, INC., MGA ENTERTAINMENT (HK) LIMITED, a Hong Kong Special Administrative Region business entity, MGAE DE MEXICO, S.R.L. DE C.V., a Mexico business entity and ISAAC LARIAN, an individual
Counter-defendant,: CARLOS GUSTAVO MACHADO GOMEZ, an individual
Case Number: 10-57048
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 6, 2011 Carter Bryant v. Mattel, Inc., et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2011 Filing 8 MANDATE ISSUED.(AK, SST and KMW) [7627782] (TB)
January 24, 2011 Filing 7 Mail returned on 01/19/2011 addressed to Mr. John Ely Andrews, Esquire for MGA Entertainment, Inc., Isaac Larian, MGA Entertainment (HK) Limited and MGAE de Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., re: Case Opening Material. Resending to: CASE FILES. [7621949] (JN)
January 6, 2011 Filing 6 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN S. TROTT and KIM MCLANE WARDLAW); MGA's motion to stay the trial is denied as moot. DISMISSED in 10-57048; DENIED in 10-80235. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7602423] [10-57048, 10-80235] (DD)
January 4, 2011 Filing 5 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, STEPHEN S. TROTT and KIM MCLANE WARDLAW) The panel that decided Nos. 09-55812 & 09-55673 retains jurisdiction over this petition and appeal, and any other motions, petitions and appeals arising from the underlying district court case. [7599961] [10-57048, 10-80235] (KD)
January 3, 2011 Filing 4 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 455.00 Date paid: 12/28/2010. [7598222] (BY)
December 30, 2010 Filing 3 Terminated Daniel Paul Collins for Mattel, Inc. in 10-57048, Matthew Christopher Heyn for Mattel, Inc. in 10-57048, Ronald L. Olson for Mattel, Inc. in 10-57048, David M. Stern for Mattel, Inc. in 10-57048. Added in error. [7596419] (RY)
December 29, 2010 Filing 2 Received Appellant's Representation Statement. Served on 12/28/2010. [7595872] (JN)
December 28, 2010 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Isaac Larian, Appellant MGA Entertainment (HK) Limited, Appellant MGA Entertainment, Inc. and Appellant MGAE de Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V. on 12/28/2010. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/05/2011. Transcript ordered by 01/27/2011. Transcript due 04/27/2011. Appellant Isaac Larian, Appellant MGA Entertainment (HK) Limited, Appellant MGA Entertainment, Inc. and Appellant MGAE de Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V. opening brief due 06/06/2011. Appellee Mattel, Inc. answering brief due 07/06/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7595870] (JN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carter Bryant v. Mattel, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff-counter-defendant,: CARTER BRYANT, an individual
Represented By: Peter H. Bonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-counter-claimant - appellee,: MATTEL, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Daniel Paul Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant - appellant,: MGA ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: John E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant - appellant,: MGA ENTERTAINMENT (HK) LIMITED, a Hong Kong Special Administrative Region business entity
Represented By: John E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant - appellant,: MGAE DE MEXICO, S.R.L. DE C.V., a Mexico business entity
Represented By: John E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant - appellant,: ISAAC LARIAN, an individual
Represented By: John E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant,: CARLOS GUSTAVO MACHADO GOMEZ, an individual
Represented By: Alexander Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?