Sama Abdisalan v. Eric Holder, Jr.
Petitioner,: SAMA ABDIAZIZ ABDISALAN
Respondent,: ERIC H. HOLDER, Jr., Attorney General
Case Number: 10-73215
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 6, 2013 Summary Abdisalan v. Holder
May 7, 2014 Summary SAMA ABDISALAN V. ERIC HOLDER, JR.
December 15, 2014 Summary SAMA ABDISALAN V. ERIC HOLDER, JR.
January 6, 2015 Summary SAMA ABDISALAN V. ERIC HOLDER, JR.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9026016079 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (ALEX KOZINSKI) Upon the vote of a majority of nonrecused active judges, it is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(a) and Circuit Rule 35-3. The three-judge panel opinion shall not be cited as precedent by or to any court of the Ninth Circuit. Judge Owens did not participate in the deliberations or vote in this case. [9087174] [10-73215, 11-71124]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sama Abdisalan v. Eric Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: SAMA ABDIAZIZ ABDISALAN
Represented By: Sama Abdiaziz Abdisalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: ERIC H. HOLDER, Jr., Attorney General
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?