USACM Liquitating Trust, et al v. Deloitte & Touche, LLP
Plaintiff - Appellant,: USACM LIQUITATING TRUST
Plaintiff,: USA CAPITAL DIVERSIFIED DEED FUND, LLC
Defendant - Appellee,: DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP
Case Number: 11-15626
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 22, 2013 USACM LIQUIDATING TRUST V. DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP
February 18, 2014 Summary USACM LIQUIDATING TRUST V. DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP
March 14, 2014 Summary USACM LIQUIDATING TRUST V. DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP
June 6, 2014 Summary USACM LIQUIDATING TRUST V. DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9026095911 Filed order and amended opinion (J. CLIFFORD WALLACE, SANDRA S. IKUTA and MARVIN J. GARBIS).The opinion filed February 18, 2014, and appearing at 2014 WL 612503, is amended. The amended opinion will be filed concurrently with this order. The petition for rehearing is DENIED. No further petitions for rehearing and/or rehearing en banc will be entertained. AFFIRMED. [9122206]
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9025851939 Filed ORDER FOR PUBLICATION (J. CLIFFORD WALLACE, SANDRA S. IKUTA and MARVIN J. GARBIS) The order, filed on February 18, 2014, is amended as follows: Page 3, lines 10 11, replace No petitions for rehearing and/or rehearing en banc will be entertained. with Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of the amendment of this order to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. [9015575]
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9025771739 FILED ORDER AND OPINION (J. CLIFFORD WALLACE, SANDRA S. IKUTA and MARVIN J. GARBIS) The mandate issued on May 15, 2013, is hereby recalled. Appellee Deloitte & Touche s request for publication is GRANTED, and the Memorandum Disposition filed on April 22, 2013, is withdrawn. The withdrawn memorandum disposition is replaced and superseded by the attached opinion. No petitions for rehearing and/or rehearing en banc will be entertained. (ECF Filing) AFFIRMED Judge: JCW , Judge: SSI , Judge: MJG Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8980456]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USACM Liquitating Trust, et al v. Deloitte & Touche, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: USACM LIQUITATING TRUST
Represented By: J. Maxwell Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: USA CAPITAL DIVERSIFIED DEED FUND, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP
Represented By: Melanie M. Blunschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?