Joshua Frost v. Ron Van Boening
Petitioner - Appellant,: JOSHUA JAMES FROST
Respondent - Appellee,: RON VAN BOENING, Superintendent
Case Number: 11-35114
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 22, 2012 Summary Frost v. Van Boening
February 25, 2013 Summary JOSHUA FROST V. RON VAN BOENING
April 29, 2014 Summary JOSHUA FROST V. RON VAN BOENING
March 21, 2016 Summary JOSHUA FROST V. RON VAN BOENING
August 29, 2016 Summary JOSHUA FROST V. RON VAN BOENING

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9028327231 Filed order and amended opinion (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, STEPHEN REINHARDT, ALEX KOZINSKI, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RICHARD A. PAEZ, RICHARD C. TALLMAN, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON, JAY S. BYBEE, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN). Amending Disposition Opinion AFFIRMED. In light of the Washington State Bar Association Office of Disciplinary Counsel s dismissal of the grievance against Zachary C. Wagnild, ODC File No. 16-00470, the previous majority opinion and dissent filed March 21, 2016, and reported at 818 F.3d 469, are WITHDRAWN and REPLACED by the attached unanimous amended opinion. The petition for rehearing en banc filed by the King County Prosecutor s Office and Zachary C. Wagnild s joinder in the petition for rehearing are ordered to be FILED as amicus briefs. Future petitions for rehearing en banc will not be entertained from the filing of the amended opinion. [10103593]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joshua Frost v. Ron Van Boening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant,: JOSHUA JAMES FROST
Represented By: Erik B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee,: RON VAN BOENING, Superintendent
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?