Maximized Living, Inc. v. John Doe
Respondent: GOOGLE, INC.
Appellee: JOHN DOE
Applicant: MAXIMIZED LIVING, INC.
Case Number: 12-15396
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2012 Filing 11 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CLR)Appellants unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [8206428] (KKW) [Entered: 06/07/2012 03:45 PM]
June 7, 2012 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Maximized Living, Inc. Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/07/2012. [8206006] (Micheletti, Christopher) [Entered: 06/07/2012 01:45 PM]
May 31, 2012 Filing 9 Filed order MEDIATION (CLB): This appeal is selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The court is informed that the parties have reached a tentative settlement of their dispute. Within 30 days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file either a motion or a stipulation to dismiss this matter pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or shall contact the Circuit Mediator. A copy of the motion or stipulation to dismiss shall be submitted at the time of filing to the Circuit Mediator via fax (415) 355-8566. [8197733] (KKW) [Entered: 05/31/2012 03:40 PM]
May 16, 2012 Filing 8 Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): schedule a further pre-briefing telephone conference on 05/18/2012 at 03:00 pm (Pacific Standard Time) [8179917] (KKW) [Entered: 05/16/2012 09:17 AM]
April 30, 2012 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): The assessment conference originally scheduled for April 18, 2012, is rescheduled to May 8, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. [8158685] (KKW) [Entered: 04/30/2012 03:09 PM]
March 13, 2012 Filing 6 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): Case referred to Mediation for assessment conference only. Telephone conference to be on 04/18/2012 at 10:00 am. (Pacific Standard Time) [8102493] (KKW) [Entered: 03/13/2012 03:36 PM]
March 13, 2012 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HH): The briefing schedule issued on February 28, 2012, is amended. Appellants opening brief and excerpts of record are due June 1, 2012; appellees answering brief is due July 2, 2012; and the optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8101629] (HH) [Entered: 03/13/2012 11:59 AM]
March 13, 2012 Filing 4 Entered appearance of Appellee John Doe. [8101600] (HH) [Entered: 03/13/2012 11:52 AM]
March 6, 2012 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Maximized Living, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/06/2012. [8092948] (Micheletti, Christopher) [Entered: 03/06/2012 03:25 PM]
February 28, 2012 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. NO APPEARANCE FROM APPELLEES.The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/06/2012. Appellant Maximized Living, Inc. opening brief due 06/04/2012. [8082687] (GR) [Entered: 02/28/2012 11:02 AM]
February 28, 2012 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELEE, The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/06/2012. Appellant Maximized Living, Inc. opening brief due 06/04/2012.. [8082631] (GR) [Entered: 02/28/2012 09:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Maximized Living, Inc. v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Robert Spanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Applicant: MAXIMIZED LIVING, INC.
Represented By: Demetrius X. Lambrinos
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Micheletti
Represented By: Kenton J. Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?