So. California Darts Assoc v. So. California Darts Assoc Inc, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee,: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DARTS ASSOCIATION, a California unincorporated association
Defendant - Appellant,: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DARTS ASSOCIATION, INC., a California corporation
Defendant,: DINO M. ZAFFINA, an individual
Case Number: 12-55951
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 25, 2013 SO. CALIFORNIA DARTS ASSOC V. SO. CALIFORNIA DARTS ASSOC INC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2013 Filing 36 MANDATE ISSUED.(KMW, RMG and MLW) [8638366] [12-55951, 12-56173] (RR)
April 25, 2013 Filing 35 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and MARK L. WOLF) This disposition resolves the recently filed Appellee’s Motion for Dismissal of Appeal as Moot .; DISMISSED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8604303] [12-55951, 12-56173] (DD)
April 22, 2013 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. response opposing motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 04/22/2013. [8598395]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-56173. Resent NDA. 04/22/2013 by RY] (JBF)
April 19, 2013 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellee Southern California Darts Association Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/19/2013. [8597226]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to 12-55951. Resent NDA. 04/19/2013 by RY] (JK)
April 19, 2013 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellee Southern California Darts Association Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/19/2013. [8597222] (JK)
March 7, 2013 Filing 31 SUBMITTED ON THE BRIEFS TO KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and MARK L. WOLF. [8541060] [12-55951, 12-56173] (FB)
February 22, 2013 Filing 30 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The panel unanimously finds that the facts and legal arguments in this case are adequately presented in the briefs and record, and that the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. Therefore, this case is ordered submitted without oral argument on Thursday, March 7, 2013, at Pasadena, California. Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2). IT IS SO ORDERED. [8524008] [12-55951, 12-56173] (AF)
January 18, 2013 Filing 29 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. James Kawahito for Appellee Southern California Darts Association. [8479841]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-56173. Resent NDA. 01/18/2013 by RY] (JK)
January 18, 2013 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Jason Benjamin Fink for Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc.. [8479553]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-56173. Resent NDA. 01/18/2013 by RY] (JBF)
January 10, 2013 Filing 27 Notice of Oral Argument on MARCH Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8469713] [12-55951, 12-56173] (LN)
January 7, 2013 Filing 26 Filed Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. excerpts of record in 1 volume. (Already sent to panel) [8463795] [12-55951, 12-56173] (LA)
January 7, 2013 Filing 25 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WL): Defendant-Appellant's December 13, 2012 motions in the above-captioned cases requesting leave to file late excerpts of record in No. 12-55951 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file Defendant-Appellant's excerpts of record received on July 2, 2012. [8463393] [12-55951, 12-56173] (WL)
December 13, 2012 Filing 24 Filed (ECF) Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. Motion for miscellaneous relief (to file late excerpts of record). Date of service: 12/13/2012. [8437195]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct relief and content of filing. Spread docket text to 12-56173. Resent NDA. 12/13/2012 by RY] (JBF)
October 9, 2012 Filing 23 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AS): These are preliminary injunction appeals. The court has received notice of appearance of counsel on behalf of appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. in No. 12-55951. Accordingly, these appeals may proceed. Principal briefing is complete. The optional consolidated reply brief shall be filed within 14 days after the date of this order. [8351383] [12-55951, 12-56173] (WL)
September 28, 2012 Filing 22 Filed Appellant Dino M. Zaffina response to court order. Served on 09/25/2012. [8343421] [12-55951, 12-56173] (JFF)
September 27, 2012 Filing 21 Attorney Robert Edward Racine substituted by Attorney Jason Benjamin Fink [8339670] [12-55951, 12-56173] (JFF)
September 27, 2012 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jason Benjamin Fink for Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. in 12-55951. Date of service: 09/27/2012. [8339523] [12-55951, 12-56173] (JBF)
September 24, 2012 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellee Southern California Darts Association Correspondence: NOTICE OF (1) DISTRICT COURT'S ORDER AND (2) DEFAULT BY CLERK. Date of service: 09/24/2012 [8335091]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 12-56173, resent notice. 09/25/2012 by ASW] (JK)
September 19, 2012 Filing 18 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): These are consolidated appeals. The motion by Robert Edward Racine, Esq., to withdraw as retained counsel for appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc., is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect the following address for appellant: Dino M. Zaffina, 3250 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1510, Los Angeles, CA 90010. A corporation must be represented by counsel. See In re Highley, 459 F.2d 554, 555 (9th Cir. 1972). The court has reviewed the September 4, 2012 filing in appeal No. 12-56173, but no notice of appearance by appellant Southern California Darts Association Inc.’s new counsel has been filed with the court to date. Within 28 days after the date of this order, appellant Southern California Darts Association Inc.’s new counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the automatic dismissal of appeal No. 12-55951 by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Principal briefing is complete. A new deadline for the submission of the optional consolidated reply brief shall be established upon compliance with this order. . (MOATT) [8329717] [12-55951, 12-56173] (TSP)
September 6, 2012 Filing 17 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [12] filed by Southern California Darts Association, Inc.. [8312754] (SD)
August 30, 2012 Filing 16 COURT-ENTERED FILING to replace incorrect entry [14]. Filed (ECF) Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. and Appellee Southern California Darts Association Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 08/30/2012. [8309193] (ASW)
August 30, 2012 Filing 15 Filed Appellee Southern California Darts Association supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 2 volumes. [8306825] (GV)
August 30, 2012 Filing 14 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [16]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. response to Court order dated 08/30/2012. Date of service: 08/30/2012. [8306405] (RER)
August 30, 2012 Filing 13 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [12] submitted by Southern California Darts Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8305668] (GV)
August 29, 2012 Filing 12 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Southern California Darts Association. Date of service: 08/29/2012. [8303632]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with searchable version, resent notice. 08/30/2012 by ASW] (JK)
July 13, 2012 Filing 11 Filed order MOATT: (SM) Appellant Dino M. Zaffina’s July 10, 2012 opposed motion to expedite briefing and hearing schedule, filed in no. 12-56173, is denied. Appellee Southern California Darts Association’s July 6, 2012 motion to consolidate appeals, filed in no. 12-55951, is denied in part. Appeal nos. 12-55951 and 12-56173 are to be related and calendared together. The opening brief in appeal no. 12-55951 was filed on June 25, 2012. The briefing schedule for these related appeals is now as follows: the opening brief in appeal no. 12-56173 is due July 30, 2012; the answering briefs for appeal nos. 12-55951 and 12-56173 are due August 29, 2012; the optional reply briefs for appeal nos. 12-55951 and 12-56173 are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief(s). [8249577] [12-55951, 12-56173] (DEV)
July 6, 2012 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee Southern California Darts Association Motion to consolidate cases 12-55951, 12-56173. Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8240714]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. Resent NDA. 07/11/2012 by RY] (NS)
July 2, 2012 Filing 9 Received Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc. excerpts of record in 1 volume. Served on 06/30/2012. Deficiencies: untimely. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [8237987] (LA)
July 2, 2012 Filing 8 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [6] filed by Southern California Darts Association, Inc.. [8234996] (SD)
June 25, 2012 Filing 7 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [6] submitted by Southern California Darts Association, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8227385] (LA)
June 19, 2012 Filing 6 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc.. Date of service: 06/19/2012. [8220691]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corp disclosure statement and statement of related cases, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW] (RER)
June 11, 2012 Filing 5 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): Based on a review of the Mediation Questionnaire, this case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel for any party interested in obtaining assistance from the court in pursuing settlement of the case on appeal or learning more about the Mediation Program is encouraged to contact Roxane G. Ashe, Circuit Mediator, by fax (415) 355-8566. The communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. Counsel are requested to send copies of this order to their clients.[8209516] (WL)
June 7, 2012 Filing 4 Filed (Faxed) Appellant Southern California Darts Association, Inc.'s Mediation Questionnaire. [8206162] (HH)
May 31, 2012 Filing 3 (ORDER RESENT WITH CORRECT DATE)Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MGS): The Court of Appeals’ records do not indicate that appellant has filed a Mediation Questionnaire in accordance with Circuit Rule 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing of this order, appellant shall: (a) file a Mediation Questionnaire (available on the court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov); (b) dismiss the appeal voluntarily pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); or (c) show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [8196714]--[Edited 05/31/2012 by BY] (WL)
May 24, 2012 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AS): The appeal filed May 22, 2012 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than June 19, 2012; the answering brief is due July 17, 2012 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [8191188] (WL)
May 22, 2012 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/29/2012. Referred to MOATT pursuant to FRAP 3-3. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL. [8187032] (JN)

Search for this case: So. California Darts Assoc v. So. California Darts Assoc Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DARTS ASSOCIATION, a California unincorporated association
Represented By: Noelle M. Shanahan Cutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DARTS ASSOCIATION, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Robert E. Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: DINO M. ZAFFINA, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?