Cindy Garcia v. Google, Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant,: CINDY LEE GARCIA
Defendant,: NAKOULA BASSELEY NAKOULA, an individual, AKA Sam Bacile, MARK BASSELEY YOUSSEF, ABANOB BASSELEY NAKOULA, MATTHEW NEKOLA, AHMED HAMDY, AMAL NADA, DANIEL K. CARESMAN, KRITBAG DIFRAT, SOBHI BUSHRA, ROBERT BACILY, NICOLA BACILY, THOMAS J. TANAS, ERWIN SALAMEH, YOUSSEFF M. BASSELEY and MALID AHLAWI
Defendant - Appellee,: GOOGLE, INC., a Delaware Corporation and YOUTUBE, LLC, a California limited liability company
Case Number: 12-57302
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 26, 2014 Summary Garcia v. Google, Inc.
March 13, 2014 Summary CINDY GARCIA V. GOOGLE, INC.
July 11, 2014 Summary CINDY GARCIA V. GOOGLE, INC.
November 12, 2014 Summary CINDY GARCIA V. GOOGLE, INC.
May 18, 2015 Summary CINDY GARCIA V. GOOGLE, INC.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2013 Filing 30 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO ALEX KOZINSKI, RONALD M. GOULD and N. RANDY SMITH. [8683845] (SB)
May 21, 2013 Filing 29 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Timothy L. Alger, Esquire for Appellees Youtube, LLC and Google, Inc.. [8638403] (TLA)
May 20, 2013 Filing 28 Notice of Oral Argument on JUNE 26 2013 Seattle Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SEATTLE Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8636519] (AW)
May 20, 2013 Filing 27 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: Wednesday, 06/26/2013 - 3:00 PM - 7th Floor Courtroom - William K. Nakamura US Courthouse - Seattle, Washington. [8636502] (RB)
May 20, 2013 Filing 26 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Oral argument will be held Wednesday, June 26, 2013, at 3 p.m. in the 7th Floor Courtroom of the William K. Nakamura U.S. Courthouse, 1010 Fifth Avenue, Seattle, WA. [8636469] (AF)
April 3, 2013 Filing 25 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: moved to week of 06/24/2013 Seattle, WA SE Nakamura Cthse ** exact date & time to be determined ** [8576472] (AW)
April 3, 2013 Filing 24 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Appellees’ motion to reschedule oral argument is granted. Oral argument will take place during the week of June 24, 2013, in Seattle, Washington, which is the court’s next available sitting. The date and time of oral argument will be determined by separate order. [8576054] (AF)
March 29, 2013 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC Motion to continue hearing of case. Date of service: 03/29/2013. [8570995] (TLA)
March 28, 2013 Filing 22 Notice of Oral Argument on JUNE Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8567239] (LN)
March 21, 2013 Filing 21 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Cindy Lee Garcia. Date of service: 02/05/2013. [8559948] (MCA)
March 21, 2013 Filing 20 Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8559190] (SS)
March 6, 2013 Filing 19 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [14] filed by Cindy Lee Garcia. (sent to panel) [8539789] (SD)
March 6, 2013 Filing 18 Mail returned on 03/05/2013 addressed to Credence E. Sol, Esquire for Cindy Lee Garcia, re: Case Opening Material. Resending to: CASE FILES (Credence Sol is located in France - spoke with associate counsel M. Cris Armenta who has been working with Ms. Sol. Ms. Armenta informed me that Ms. Sol received the package through her). [8539220] (JN)
February 28, 2013 Filing 17 Added attorney Sunita Bali for Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 12-57302. [8532038] (EL)
February 28, 2013 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sunita Bali for Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8531694] (SB)
February 28, 2013 Filing 15 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [14] submitted by Cindy Lee Garcia is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8531386] (WP)
February 28, 2013 Filing 14 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Cindy Lee Garcia. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8531151] (MCA)
February 25, 2013 Filing 13 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [9] filed by Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC. [8527087] (DB)
February 20, 2013 Filing 12 Filed Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [9] in 1 volume. [8520834] (LA)
February 20, 2013 Filing 11 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [9] submitted by Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [9] submitted by Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8520822] (LA)
February 15, 2013 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC Motion for miscellaneous relief [APPELLEES GOOGLE INC. AND YOUTUBE, LLCS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE]. Date of service: 02/15/2013. [8516961] (TLA)
February 15, 2013 Filing 9 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees Google, Inc. and Youtube, LLC. Date of service: 02/15/2013. [8516960]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced brief (statement of rel cases), resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (TLA)
February 5, 2013 Filing 8 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [5] filed by Cindy Lee Garcia. [8501241] (SD)
January 30, 2013 Filing 7 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [5] submitted by Cindy Lee Garcia is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8494651] (WP)
January 22, 2013 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Cindy Lee Garcia paper copies of excerpts of record [5] in 4 volume(s). [8485490] (WP)
January 18, 2013 Filing 5 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record in 4 volume(s) for review. Submitted by Appellant Cindy Lee Garcia. Date of service: 01/18/2013. [8479689]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 01/25/2013 by RY] (MCA)
January 7, 2013 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Cindy Lee Garcia Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/07/2013. [8463223] (MCA)
December 21, 2012 Filing 3 Filed clerk order: (HMB) The appeal filed December 21, 2012 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire remains due December 28, 2012. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 18, 2013; the answering brief is due February 15, 2013 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [8450831][COURT UPDATE - Replaced incorrect clerk order to correct briefing schedule dates. Resend NDA. 12/21/12 by JI] (KD)
December 21, 2012 Filing 2 Filed Appellant's Representation Statement. Served on 12/21/2012. [8450511] (JN)
December 21, 2012 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/28/2012. Referred to MOATT pursuant to FRAP 3-3. (Preliminary Injunction) [8450491] (JN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cindy Garcia v. Google, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: CINDY LEE GARCIA
Represented By: M. Cris Armenta
Represented By: Credence E. Sol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: NAKOULA BASSELEY NAKOULA, an individual, AKA Sam Bacile
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: MARK BASSELEY YOUSSEF
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ABANOB BASSELEY NAKOULA
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: MATTHEW NEKOLA
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: AHMED HAMDY
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: AMAL NADA
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: DANIEL K. CARESMAN
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: KRITBAG DIFRAT
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: SOBHI BUSHRA
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ROBERT BACILY
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: NICOLA BACILY
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: THOMAS J. TANAS
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ERWIN SALAMEH
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: YOUSSEFF M. BASSELEY
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: MALID AHLAWI
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: GOOGLE, INC., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: YOUTUBE, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?