SunEarth, Inc., et al v. Sun Earth Solar Power Co., Ltd, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant,: SUNEARTH, INC., a California corporation and THE SOLARAY CORPORATION, a Hawaiian corporation
Defendant - Appellee,: SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO., LTD., a Chinese limited liability company, FKA Ningbo Solar Electric Power Co., Ltd. and NBSOLAR USA INC., a California corporation
Case Number: 13-17622
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 24, 2016 SUNEARTH, INC. V. SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO.
May 24, 2016 SUNEARTH, INC. V. SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO.
September 14, 2016 Summary SUNEARTH, INC. V. SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO.
October 24, 2016 Summary SUNEARTH, INC. V. SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO.
November 16, 2016 SUNEARTH, INC. V. SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9028372065 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (SIDNEY R. THOMAS)Upon the vote of a majority of nonrecused active judges, it is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(a) and Circuit Rule 35-3. The three-judge panel disposition shall not be cited as precedent by or to any court of the Ninth Circuit. [10123244] [13-17622, 15-16096]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: SunEarth, Inc., et al v. Sun Earth Solar Power Co., Ltd, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: SUNEARTH, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Daniel Ballard
Represented By: Stephen Brent Mosier
Represented By: Clark Edward Proffitt
Represented By: Norman P. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: THE SOLARAY CORPORATION, a Hawaiian corporation
Represented By: Daniel Ballard
Represented By: Stephen Brent Mosier
Represented By: Clark Edward Proffitt
Represented By: Norman P. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: SUN EARTH SOLAR POWER CO., LTD., a Chinese limited liability company, FKA Ningbo Solar Electric Power Co., Ltd.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: NBSOLAR USA INC., a California corporation
Represented By: James J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?