Susan Latta, et al v. C. Otter, et al
Plaintiff - Appellee,: SUSAN LATTA, TRACI EHLERS, LORI WATSEN, SHARENE WATSEN, SHELIA ROBERTSON, ANDREA ALTMAYER, AMBER BEIERLE and RACHAEL ROBERTSON
Defendant - Appellant,: C. L. OTTER, "Butch"; Governor of the State of Idaho, in his official capacity
Defendant,: CHRISTOPHER RICH, Recorder of Ada County, Idaho, in his official capacity
Intervenor-Defendant,: STATE OF IDAHO
Case Number: 14-35420
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 7, 2014 Summary Latta v. Otter
October 15, 2014 Summary SUSAN LATTA , et al. V. C. L. OTTER, et al.
January 9, 2015 Summary SUSAN LATTA , et al. V. C. L. OTTER, et al.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9026454227 Filed per curiam OPINION RE ORDER (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, RONALD M. GOULD and MARSHA S. BERZON).(SEE OPINION FOR FULL TEXT) Notwithstanding the above, we have determined to exercise our discretion to afford the state a second opportunity to obtain an emergency stay of our order from the Supreme Court, even though we see no possible basis for such a stay. For that reason, our order of October 13, 2014 is not made effective until 9 a.m. PDT (noon EST) on October 15, 2014. Otherwise we have determined that the stay of the district court s order enjoining enforcement of Idaho s same-sex marriage bans shall be dissolved and have entered the order of this court to that effect. [9276808] [14-35420, 14-35421] --[Edited: Resending to include full opinion. 10/15/2014 by TL]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Susan Latta, et al v. C. Otter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SUSAN LATTA
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: TRACI EHLERS
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: LORI WATSEN
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SHARENE WATSEN
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SHELIA ROBERTSON
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: ANDREA ALTMAYER
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: AMBER BEIERLE
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: RACHAEL ROBERTSON
Represented By: Craig H. Durham
Represented By: Deborah A. Ferguson
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: C. L. OTTER, "Butch"; Governor of the State of Idaho, in his official capacity
Represented By: Daniel W. Bower
Represented By: Thomas C. Perry
Represented By: Monte N. Stewart
Represented By: Cally Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: CHRISTOPHER RICH, Recorder of Ada County, Idaho, in his official capacity
Represented By: Clay R. Smith
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Clay R. Smith
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?