Paul Viriyapanthu v. Thomas Brandon
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAUL VIRIYAPANTHU
Defendant / Appellee: THOMAS E. BRANDON, in his official capacity as acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives and B. TODD JONES, in his official capacity as acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Case Number: 14-55187
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Filing 44 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 17-5019 Filed on: 06/21/2017 Cert Petition Action 1: Denied, 10/02/2017 [10604207] (HH) [Entered: 10/03/2017 02:39 PM]
June 28, 2017 Filing 43 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 17-5019 Filed on: 06/21/2017 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [10490934] (RR) [Entered: 06/28/2017 12:28 PM]
May 23, 2017 Filing 42 MANDATE ISSUED.(RAP, MSB and MBC) [10444710] (CW) [Entered: 05/23/2017 10:01 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 41 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (RICHARD A. PAEZ, MARSHA S. BERZON and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) Viriyapanthus Motion to Take Judicial Notice (Docket No. 21) is DENIED. The documents relate only to arguments raised for the first time in his reply brief and are not relevant to the issues properly before the court. Cf. Holland Am. Line Inc. v. Wartsila N. Am., Inc., 485 F.3d 450, 459 n.6 (9th Cir. 2007) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10378634] (RMM) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:28 AM]
March 30, 2017 Filing 40 Appellee B. Todd Jones in 14-55187 substituted by Appellee Thomas E. Brandon in 14-55187. [10377821] (HH) [Entered: 03/30/2017 02:41 PM]
March 14, 2017 Filing 39 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [10354872]--[Edited 03/14/2017 by ASW: Attached correct document, resent notice.] (DJW) [Entered: 03/14/2017 08:40 AM]
March 10, 2017 Filing 38 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO RICHARD A. PAEZ, MARSHA S. BERZON and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN. [10352047] (DJW) [Entered: 03/10/2017 01:06 PM]
January 12, 2017 Filing 37 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Party Paul Viriyapanthu. [10263156] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 01/12/2017 12:05 AM]
January 10, 2017 Filing 36 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Geoffrey D. Wilson for Appellee B. Todd Jones. [10260896] [14-55187] (Wilson, Geoffrey) [Entered: 01/10/2017 02:08 PM]
December 28, 2016 Filing 35 Notice of Oral Argument on Friday, March 10, 2017 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 2 - Pasadena CA. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). When you have reviewed the calendar, download the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form , complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: PASADENA Office. [10248440] (DJW) [Entered: 12/28/2016 02:23 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 34 This case is being considered for the March 2017 Pasadena oral argument calendar. The exact date of your oral argument has not been determined at this time. The following is a link to the upcoming court sessions: # http://cdn.ca9.uscourts.gov/datastore/uploads/calendar/sitdates_2017.pdf . Please review these upcoming dates immediately to determine if you have any conflicts with them. If you do have conflicts, please inform the Court within 3 days of this notice by sending a letter to the Court using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). The Court discourages motions to continue after this 3-day period. The clerk's office takes conflict dates into consideration in scheduling oral arguments but cannot guarantee that every request will be honored. Your case will be assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. Note that your case will be set for hearing in due course if it is not assigned to this calendar. In addition, if parties would like to discuss settlement before argument is scheduled, they should jointly request a referral to the mediation unit. Such a referral will postpone the calendaring of oral argument. All such requests must be made within 3 days of this notice by sending a letter to the Court using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation). Once the case is calendared, it is unlikely that the court will postpone argument for settlement discussions.[10201682] (AW) [Entered: 11/17/2016 03:41 PM]
October 1, 2016 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Correspondence: Unavailable (out of country) January and February. Please consider for March Pasadena oral argument calendar.. Thank you. Date of service: 10/01/2016 [10144931] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 10/01/2016 10:57 PM]
September 30, 2016 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellee B. Todd Jones Correspondence: consider oral argument for the February Pasadena oral argument calendar.. Date of service: 09/30/2016 [10144854] [14-55187] (Wilson, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/30/2016 05:39 PM]
September 29, 2016 Filing 31 This case is being considered for the January 2017 Pasadena oral argument calendar. The exact date of your oral argument has not been determined at this time. The following is a link to the upcoming court sessions: # http://cdn.ca9.uscourts.gov/datastore/uploads/calendar/sitdates_2017.pdf . Please review these upcoming dates immediately to determine if you have any conflicts with them. If you do have conflicts, please inform the Court within 3 days of this notice by sending a letter to the Court using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). The Court discourages motions to continue after this 3-day period. The clerk's office takes conflict dates into consideration in scheduling oral arguments but cannot guarantee that every request will be honored. Your case will be assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. Note that your case will be set for hearing in due course if it is not assigned to this calendar. In addition, if parties would like to discuss settlement before argument is scheduled, they should jointly request a referral to the mediation unit. Such a referral will postpone the calendaring of oral argument. All such requests must be made within 3 days of this notice by sending a letter to the Court using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation). Once the case is calendared, it is unlikely that the court will postpone argument for settlement discussions.[10142138] (AW) [Entered: 09/29/2016 12:12 PM]
March 9, 2015 Filing 30 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: PK): Appellants petition for initial hearing en banc is denied. [9450220] (HH) [Entered: 03/09/2015 03:15 PM]
February 20, 2015 Filing 29 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): The courts January 22, 2015 order is withdrawn to the extent that the order refers the amended petition for initial hearing en banc to the merits panel. The amended petition for initial hearing en banc will be addressed by separate order. The amended petition for initial hearing en banc has been filed. Briefing is complete. [9429155] (SM) [Entered: 02/20/2015 04:45 PM]
February 9, 2015 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu petition for rehearing en banc (from 02/09/2015 opinion). Date of service: 02/09/2015. [COURT UPDATE: Modified event to reflect content of pleading: Motion for hearing enbanc. 3/4/15 by JI; resent notice.] [9415373] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 02/09/2015 11:50 PM]
January 22, 2015 Filing 27 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CC): The untimely motion to file the initial en banc petition is granted. The request to file an oversize petition is denied. The amended petition is due February 9, 2015. The petition shall be no more than 4200 words. See Fed. R. App. P. 35(b)(2). Any amended petition shall be referred to the panel assigned to decide the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. Appellants motion to take judicial notice also is referred to the panel assigned to decide the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. Briefing is complete. [9391234] (SM) [Entered: 01/22/2015 09:34 AM]
January 20, 2015 Filing 26 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 23 ] filed by Paul Viriyapanthu. [9387436] (SD) [Entered: 01/20/2015 10:26 AM]
January 8, 2015 Filing 25 Filed (ECF) Appellee B. Todd Jones Correspondence: This office represents Fed Deft Aplee. on 12/29/14, Aplnt filed a motion to file late petition for rehearing & or petition for rehearing en banc and a motion to take judicial notice. While aplnt's request for en banc review lacks merit, Fed Deft does not. Date of service: 01/08/2015 [9375695] [14-55187] (Wilson, Geoffrey) [Entered: 01/08/2015 02:57 PM]
January 6, 2015 Filing 24 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 23 ] submitted by Paul Viriyapanthu is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9372601] (GV) [Entered: 01/06/2015 03:19 PM]
January 5, 2015 Filing 23 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu. Date of service: 01/05/2015. [9371126] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 01/05/2015 07:52 PM]
January 2, 2015 Filing 22 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 18 ] filed by B. Todd Jones. [9368470] (SD) [Entered: 01/02/2015 01:19 PM]
December 29, 2014 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 12/29/2014. [9364851] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 12/29/2014 09:54 PM]
December 29, 2014 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Motion to file late petition for rehearing and/or petition for rehearing en banc of 80 pages. Date of service: 12/29/2014. [9364850] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 12/29/2014 09:43 PM]
December 24, 2014 Filing 19 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 18 ] submitted by B. Todd Jones is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9361387] (KT) [Entered: 12/24/2014 09:57 AM]
December 23, 2014 Filing 18 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee B. Todd Jones. Date of service: 12/23/2014. [9360016] [14-55187] (Wilson, Geoffrey) [Entered: 12/23/2014 11:39 AM]
November 26, 2014 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Errata to Opening brief ([ # 10 ] Brief Submitted for Review). Filed by Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu. Date of service: 11/26/2014. [9328687] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 11/26/2014 02:53 PM]
November 18, 2014 Filing 16 Streamlined request [15] by Appellee B. Todd Jones to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee B. Todd Jones answering brief due 12/26/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [9317684] (BJK) [Entered: 11/18/2014 03:12 PM]
November 18, 2014 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee B. Todd Jones. New requested due date is 12/26/2014. [9316619] [14-55187] (Wilson, Geoffrey) [Entered: 11/18/2014 09:05 AM]
November 5, 2014 Filing 14 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 10 ] filed by Paul Viriyapanthu. [9306449] (SD) [Entered: 11/07/2014 04:10 PM]
November 5, 2014 Filing 13 Filed Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 10 ] in 3 volume(s). [9305827] (GV) [Entered: 11/07/2014 12:38 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 12 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 10 ] submitted by Paul Viriyapanthu is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 10 ] submitted by Paul Viriyapanthu. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format. [9294397] (GV) [Entered: 10/29/2014 12:08 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 11 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The appellants motion for an additional extension of time in which to file the opening brief is denied as unnecessary. The opening brief was timely submitted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief. The answering brief remains due November 26, 2014. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9294206] (SM) [Entered: 10/29/2014 11:05 AM]
October 27, 2014 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu. Date of service: 10/27/2014. [9292029] [14-55187] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 10/27/2014 11:16 PM]
October 23, 2014 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/28/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 10/23/2014. [9288770] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 10/23/2014 09:01 PM]
September 4, 2014 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) for a second ext. of time to file the opening brief filed by Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu opening brief due 10/27/2014. Appellee B. Todd Jones answering brief due 11/26/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9228596] (TH) [Entered: 09/04/2014 12:01 PM]
September 4, 2014 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 10/27/2014 at 00:59 pm. Date of service: 09/04/2014. [9228578] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 09/04/2014 11:50 AM]
June 30, 2014 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant to extend time to file the opening brief filed by Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu opening brief due 09/12/2014. Appellee B. Todd Jones answering brief due 10/14/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9149846] (TH) [Entered: 06/30/2014 09:53 AM]
June 29, 2014 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 09/10/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 06/29/2014. [9149544] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 06/29/2014 01:50 PM]
April 8, 2014 Filing 4 Filed order (ALFRED T. GOODWIN and WILLIAM C. CANBY) The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in appellees brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. [9050121] (SM) [Entered: 04/08/2014 04:20 PM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis]. Date of service: 03/10/2014. [9010027] (Viriyapanthu, Paul) [Entered: 03/10/2014 09:11 PM]
February 4, 2014 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. [8965892] (MT) [Entered: 02/04/2014 04:06 PM]
February 3, 2014 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APPELLANT IN PRO SE AND COUNSEL FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 03/03/2014. Transcript due 06/02/2014. Appellant Paul Viriyapanthu opening brief due 07/14/2014. Appellee B. Todd Jones answering brief due 08/13/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8963242] (JN) [Entered: 02/03/2014 01:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paul Viriyapanthu v. Thomas Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL VIRIYAPANTHU
Represented By: Paul Viriyapanthu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS E. BRANDON, in his official capacity as acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. TODD JONES, in his official capacity as acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?