Charles Nichols v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES NICHOLS
Defendant / Appellee: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Governor of California, KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of, KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of California, XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of California, XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General in his official capacity as Attorney General of California and GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Amicus Curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY, BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE and LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case Number: 14-55873
Filed: May 29, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 121 Appellee Edmund G. Brown Jr. in 14-55873 substituted by Appellee Gavin Newsom in 14-55873 [11223393] (QDL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:50 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 120 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Correspondence: Notice of substitution of public officer. Date of service: 03/11/2019. [11223236] [14-55873]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. 03/11/2019 by RY] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:03 PM]
December 7, 2018 Filing 119 Filed order (MARSHA S. BERZON, JAY S. BYBEE and SHARON L. GLEASON) Submission of this case remains vacated pending issuance of the mandate in Young v. Hawaii, No. 12-17808. [11114075] (OC) [Entered: 12/07/2018 01:26 PM]
December 6, 2018 Filing 118 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [Plaintiff-appellants unopposed motion to clarify the submission status of this appeal.]. Date of service: 12/06/2018. [11111621] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 12/06/2018 01:01 AM]
June 14, 2018 Filing 117 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/14/2018. [10908517] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/14/2018 09:46 AM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 116 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/01/2018. [10894135] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/01/2018 04:31 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 115 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/01/2018. [10894131] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/01/2018 04:29 PM]
May 31, 2018 Filing 114 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/31/2018. [10890574] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/31/2018 12:50 AM]
May 25, 2018 Filing 113 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/25/2018. [10886404] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/25/2018 02:29 PM]
May 5, 2018 Filing 112 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/05/2018. [10862882] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/05/2018 07:20 PM]
May 4, 2018 Filing 111 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/04/2018. [10862853] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/04/2018 08:13 PM]
March 9, 2018 Filing 110 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/09/2018. [10793750] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/09/2018 05:58 PM]
February 27, 2018 Filing 109 Filed order (MARSHA S. BERZON, JAY S. BYBEE and SHARON L. GLEASON) Submission of this case is vacated pending issuance of a decision in Young v. State of Hawaii, No. 12-17808. [10779630] (OC) [Entered: 02/27/2018 03:07 PM]
February 16, 2018 Filing 108 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [10767964] (DJW) [Entered: 02/16/2018 03:13 PM]
February 15, 2018 Filing 107 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO MARSHA S. BERZON, JAY S. BYBEE and SHARON L. GLEASON. [10766282] (DJW) [Entered: 02/15/2018 04:19 PM]
January 8, 2018 Filing 106 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Correspondence: Notice of California Assembly Bill 424 - Possession of a firearm in a school zone which went into effect on January 1, 2018.. Date of service: 01/08/2018 [10717361] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 01/08/2018 05:40 PM]
January 8, 2018 Filing 105 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Correspondence: Notice of Amendment to California Penal Code section 26400 which went into effect on January 1, 2018 - Assembly Bill 7. Date of service: 01/08/2018 [10717348] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 01/08/2018 05:35 PM]
January 8, 2018 Filing 104 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/08/2018. [10717344] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 01/08/2018 05:28 PM]
December 31, 2017 Filing 103 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/31/2017. [10708645] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 12/31/2017 03:51 PM]
December 11, 2017 Filing 102 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan Michael Eisenberg for Appellees Xavier Becerra and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.. [10686500] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 12/11/2017 03:46 PM]
December 7, 2017 Filing 101 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Party Charles Nichols. [10683341] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 12/07/2017 06:20 PM]
December 7, 2017 Filing 100 Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, February 15, 2018 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 3 - Pasadena CA. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). When you have reviewed the calendar, download the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form , complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: PASADENA Office. [10683244] (DJW) [Entered: 12/07/2017 04:45 PM]
November 18, 2017 Filing 99 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/18/2017. [10659818] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 11/18/2017 01:08 AM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 98 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/17/2017. [10659686] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:43 PM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 97 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/17/2017. [10659678] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:40 PM]
October 21, 2017 Filing 96 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/21/2017. [10626757] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 10/21/2017 01:07 PM]
October 13, 2017 Filing 95 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Correspondence: Regarding possible dates for oral argument. Date of service: 10/13/2017 [10617794] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/13/2017 04:25 PM]
October 10, 2017 Filing 94 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Pasadena Please review the Pasadena sitting dates for February 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[10610781] (AW) [Entered: 10/10/2017 11:01 AM]
October 10, 2017 Filing 93 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): No judge has requested a vote to hear this case initially en banc within the time allowed by General Order 5.2a. Appellant's request (Docket Entry No. [ # 31 ]) is therefore denied. Appellant's motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 82 ]) to schedule oral argument with a related case is denied. [10610747] (OC) [Entered: 10/10/2017 10:48 AM]
July 21, 2017 Filing 92 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/21/2017. [10517884] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/21/2017 09:38 PM]
July 19, 2017 Filing 91 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/19/2017. [10515142] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/19/2017 07:47 PM]
July 14, 2017 Filing 90 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/14/2017. [10509955] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/14/2017 09:58 PM]
July 10, 2017 Filing 89 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/10/2017. [10502706] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/10/2017 11:59 AM]
July 7, 2017 Filing 88 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/07/2017. [10501273] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 07/07/2017 02:19 PM]
July 7, 2017 Filing 87 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/07/2017. [10500540] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/07/2017 10:05 AM]
July 6, 2017 Filing 86 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/06/2017. [10499142] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/06/2017 11:13 AM]
July 5, 2017 Filing 85 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/05/2017. [10497194] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:23 AM]
July 5, 2017 Filing 84 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 83 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/05/2017. [10496770] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:01 AM]
July 4, 2017 Filing 83 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/04/2017. [10496761] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/04/2017 02:00 PM]
July 4, 2017 Filing 82 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Motion to hear this case before the panel which will hear case George Young, Jr. v. State of Hawaii, et al No. 12-17808. Date of service: 07/04/2017. [10496744] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/04/2017 12:23 AM]
July 2, 2017 Filing 81 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/02/2017. [10495172] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/02/2017 03:16 AM]
July 1, 2017 Filing 80 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/01/2017. [10495153] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/01/2017 11:21 AM]
July 1, 2017 Filing 79 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/01/2017. [10495150] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/01/2017 08:26 AM]
June 29, 2017 Filing 78 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/29/2017. [10492786] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/29/2017 02:17 PM]
June 28, 2017 Filing 77 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Correspondence: Plaintiff-Appellant Nichols identified in his Statement of Related Cases on the last page of his initial brief George Young, Jr. v. State of Hawaii, et al No.: 12-17808. Both dockets should be updated to reflect the related case.. Date of service: 06/28/2017 [10490254] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/28/2017 01:01 AM]
June 21, 2017 Filing 76 Appellee Kamala D. Harris in 14-55873 substituted by Appellee Xavier Becerra in 14-55873 [10483151] (SW) [Entered: 06/21/2017 03:36 PM]
June 21, 2017 Filing 75 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Correspondence: Please take notice that Xavier Becerra is now the California Attorney General. Per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 43 c(2), he was automatically substituted as a party in this action, replacing his predecessor Kamala D. Harris, on January 24, 2017.. Date of service: 06/21/2017 [10481914] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/21/2017 02:27 AM]
June 21, 2017 Filing 74 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/21/2017. [10481913] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/21/2017 12:08 AM]
June 20, 2017 Filing 73 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/20/2017. [10480092] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/20/2017 12:26 AM]
June 17, 2017 Filing 72 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/17/2017. [10477673] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/17/2017 01:39 PM]
June 15, 2017 Filing 71 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/15/2017. [10475904] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/15/2017 09:26 PM]
June 12, 2017 Filing 70 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/12/2017. [10467915] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/12/2017 01:17 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 69 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/30/2017. [10451305] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/30/2017 01:15 AM]
May 23, 2017 Filing 68 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/23/2017. [10446163] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/23/2017 08:26 PM]
May 22, 2017 Filing 67 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/22/2017. [10443985] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/22/2017 03:51 PM]
May 21, 2017 Filing 66 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/21/2017. [10442491] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/21/2017 06:39 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 65 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/15/2017. [10433465] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/15/2017 07:34 AM]
April 6, 2017 Filing 64 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/06/2017. [10387426] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/06/2017 09:39 PM]
April 6, 2017 Filing 63 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/06/2017. [10387343] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/06/2017 05:11 PM]
March 20, 2017 Filing 62 No judge has requested a vote to hear this case initially en banc within the time allowed by General Order 5.2a. The request is therefore denied. [10362530] (HH) [Entered: 03/20/2017 08:57 AM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 61 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/17/2017. [10362322] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/17/2017 08:38 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 60 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/17/2017. [10362320] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/17/2017 08:29 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 59 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/17/2017. [10362318] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/17/2017 08:25 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 58 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/17/2017. [10362315] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/17/2017 08:22 PM]
March 13, 2017 Filing 57 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 44 ] filed by Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10353566] (RG) [Entered: 03/13/2017 11:41 AM]
March 9, 2017 Filing 56 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 41 ] filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10351208] (RG) [Entered: 03/10/2017 08:08 AM]
March 9, 2017 Filing 55 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 42 ] filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. [10350214] (RG) [Entered: 03/09/2017 12:46 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 54 Filed 4 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 48 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Charles Nichols. [10348282] (SML) [Entered: 03/08/2017 11:46 AM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 53 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The motion of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Docket Entry No. [ # 41 ]) for leave to file an amicus curiae brief and any response thereto is referred to the panel that will consider the merits of the case for resolution. The motion of Everytown for Gun Safety (Docket Entry No. [ # 42 ]) for leave to file an amicus curiae brief and any response thereto is referred to the panel that will consider the merits of the case for resolution. The motion of Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Docket Entry No. [ # 44 ]) for leave to file an amicus curiae brief and any response thereto is referred to the panel that will consider the merits of the case for resolution. Within 7 days after the date of this order, the above named amici curiae are ordered to file 7 copies of the briefs in paper formats, with green covers, accompanied by certifications (attached to the end of each copy of the briefs) that the briefs are identical to the versions submitted electronically. A sample certification is available on the Courts website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov at the Electronic Filing - ECF link. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF versions of the briefs created from the word processing applications, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. For regular U.S. mail, the address is P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939. For overnight mail, the address is 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, CA 94103-1526. [10345042] (HC) [Entered: 03/06/2017 03:24 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 52 Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 49 ] filed by Charles Nichols. [10344317] (RG) [Entered: 03/06/2017 12:55 PM]
March 2, 2017 Filing 51 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/02/2017. [10339445] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/02/2017 01:57 AM]
March 1, 2017 Filing 50 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 49 ] submitted by Charles Nichols is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 48 ] submitted by Charles Nichols. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10337681] (SML) [Entered: 03/01/2017 09:40 AM]
March 1, 2017 Filing 49 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Charles Nichols. Date of service: 03/01/2017. [10337393] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/01/2017 12:22 AM]
March 1, 2017 Filing 48 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Charles Nichols. Date of service: 03/01/2017. [10337392] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/01/2017 12:18 AM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 47 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10335280] (SML) [Entered: 02/27/2017 04:45 PM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 46 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10333740] (SML) [Entered: 02/27/2017 09:32 AM]
February 27, 2017 Filing 45 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Everytown for Gun Safety. [10333735] (SML) [Entered: 02/27/2017 09:30 AM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 44 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 02/24/2017. [10333361] [14-55873] (Frankel, Simon) [Entered: 02/24/2017 05:58 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 42 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Everytown for Gun Safety. Date of service: 02/24/2017. [10332593] [14-55873] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 02/24/2017 01:38 PM]
February 24, 2017 Filing 41 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 02/24/2017. [10331950] [14-55873]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief and motion. 02/27/2017 by SLM] (Dixon, Megan) [Entered: 02/24/2017 09:42 AM]
February 23, 2017 Filing 43 Filed 4 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 35 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellees Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris. [10332807] (SML) [Entered: 02/24/2017 02:25 PM]
February 23, 2017 Filing 40 Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 36 ] filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris. [10330488] (RG) [Entered: 02/23/2017 10:45 AM]
February 22, 2017 Filing 39 Streamlined request [38] by Appellant Charles Nichols to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due 04/03/2017. [10328741] (DJW) [Entered: 02/22/2017 12:02 PM]
February 22, 2017 Filing 38 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellant Charles Nichols. New requested due date is 04/03/2017. [10328370] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 02/22/2017 10:17 AM]
February 21, 2017 Filing 37 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 36 ] submitted by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 35 ] submitted by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10325899] (SML) [Entered: 02/21/2017 09:08 AM]
February 17, 2017 Filing 36 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris. Date of service: 02/17/2017. [10325346] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 02/17/2017 04:13 PM]
February 16, 2017 Filing 35 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Kamala D. Harris. Date of service: 02/16/2017. [10323651] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 02/16/2017 08:10 PM]
January 18, 2017 Filing 34 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Before: Peter L. Shaw, Appellate Commissioner Appellees opposed late motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 32 ]) for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due February 17, 2017. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Appellants request (Docket Entry No. [ # 33 ]) for sanctions is denied. Appellants petition for rehearing en banc (Docket Entry No. [ # 31 ]) will be addressed in a separate order. (Pro Mo) [10269637] (LL) [Entered: 01/18/2017 10:57 AM]
December 20, 2016 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols response opposing motion ([ # 32 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 32 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 12/20/2016. [10239389] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 12/20/2016 12:14 AM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellees Kamala D. Harris and Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 02/17/2017. Date of service: 12/16/2016. [10236871] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 12/16/2016 02:07 PM]
December 14, 2016 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/01/2014 opinion). Date of service: 12/14/2016. [10232220] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 12/14/2016 12:08 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 30 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 26 ] filed by Charles Nichols. [10199355] (RG) [Entered: 11/16/2016 01:42 PM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 29 Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 27 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellant Charles Nichols. [10198903] (SML) [Entered: 11/16/2016 10:50 AM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 28 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 26 ] submitted by Charles Nichols is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 27 ] submitted by Charles Nichols. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10192113] (SML) [Entered: 11/09/2016 02:43 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 27 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Charles Nichols. Date of service: 11/09/2016. [10191843] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 11/09/2016 01:10 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 26 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Charles Nichols. Date of service: 11/09/2016. [10191823] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 11/09/2016 01:01 PM]
July 22, 2016 Filing 25 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion (docket entry [ # 23 ]) to further stay appellate proceedings pending disposition of the petitions for full court rehearing in Peruta v. County of San Diego, case no. 10-56971, and Richards v. Prieto, case no. 11-16255, is granted. This case is stayed until November 17, 2016. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief is due December 19, 2016. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [10060696] (AF) [Entered: 07/22/2016 05:01 PM]
July 17, 2016 Filing 24 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols status report (as required by Court order dated 04/05/2016). Date of service: 07/17/2016 [10052556] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/17/2016 11:00 PM]
July 17, 2016 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 07/17/2016. [10052555] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 07/17/2016 10:56 PM]
April 5, 2016 Filing 22 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending disposition of two en banc cases, Peruta v. County of San Diego, case no. 10- 56971, and Richards v. Prieto, case no. 11-16255, is granted. This case is stayed until July 20, 2016. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief is due August 19, 2016. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [9928156] (OC) [Entered: 04/05/2016 02:12 PM]
March 17, 2016 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols status report (as required by Court order dated 02/04/2016). Date of service: 03/17/2016 [9904668] [14-55873] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 03/17/2016 by TYL] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/17/2016 12:15 AM]
March 17, 2016 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 03/17/2016. [9904667] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 03/17/2016 12:12 AM]
February 4, 2016 Filing 19 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending disposition of two en banc cases, Peruta v. County of San Diego, case no. 10- 56971, and Richards v. Prieto, case no. 11-16255, is granted. This case is stayed until April 8, 2016. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief is due May 9, 2016. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [9855106] (OC) [Entered: 02/04/2016 03:43 PM]
January 20, 2016 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 01/20/2016. [9832291] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 01/20/2016 01:03 AM]
November 9, 2015 Filing 17 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellants unopposed motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending disposition of two en banc cases, Peruta v. County of San Diego, case no. 10- 56971, and Richards v. Prieto, case no. 11-16255, is granted. This case is stayed until February 8, 2016. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief is due March 9, 2016. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [9749950] (OC) [Entered: 11/09/2015 04:10 PM]
October 8, 2015 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 10/08/2015. [9713043] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 10/08/2015 09:29 PM]
July 21, 2015 Filing 15 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending disposition of two en banc cases, Peruta v. County of San Diego, case no. 10-56971, and Richards v. Prieto, case no. 11-16255, is granted. This case is stayed until November 9, 2015. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief will be due December 9, 2015. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [9617794] (SM) [Entered: 07/21/2015 04:24 PM]
July 17, 2015 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 07/17/2015. [9613382] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 07/17/2015 09:18 AM]
April 13, 2015 Filing 13 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings pending disposition of two en banc cases, Peruta v. County of San Diego, case no. 10-56791, and Richards v. Prieto, case no. 11-16255, is granted. This case is stayed until August 14, 2015. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellant files the opening brief, the answering brief will be due September The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [9493503] (SM) [Entered: 04/13/2015 03:19 PM]
April 9, 2015 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Unopposed Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 04/09/2015. [9490307] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 04/09/2015 03:41 PM]
January 21, 2015 Filing 11 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner):Appellants motion to file sur-reply in opposition to appellees motion to stay proceedings is granted. Appellants sur-reply and the previously submitted filings concerning the motion to stay proceedings have been considered. Appellees opposed motion to stay proceedings pending the courts ruling whether to grant the petition for en banc review in Richards v. Prieto, No. 11-16255 is granted. Within 90 days after the date of this order or within 14 days after the court rules on the petition for en banc review in Richards, whichever occurs first, appellees shall file an appropriate motion addressing the status of this appeal and requesting a further stay or other relief. Appellants motion to file an oversized opening brief is granted in part. Appellant may file an opening brief that does not exceed 18,000 words. The opening brief is due within 14 days after the stay granted in the preceding paragraph (or any subsequent stay) expires. Appellants unopposed motion for an extension to file a shortened opening brief is granted. The answering brief is due within 45 days after the stay expires. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. (Pro Mo) [9389344] (MS) [Entered: 01/21/2015 09:54 AM]
December 24, 2014 Filing 10 Streamlined request [9] by Appellees Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2. [9362274] (GS) [Entered: 12/24/2014 04:17 PM]
December 24, 2014 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Kamala D. Harris and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.. New requested due date is 01/30/2015. [9361612] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 12/24/2014 11:24 AM]
December 15, 2014 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Motion for miscellaneous relief [motion to file sur-reply in opposition to motion to stay proceedings with sur-reply attached]. Date of service: 12/15/2014. [9348557] [14-55873] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 12/17/2014 by TL] (CN) [Entered: 12/15/2014 08:02 AM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris reply to response (). Date of service: 12/08/2014. [9340537] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 12/08/2014 01:07 PM]
December 1, 2014 Filing 6 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Charles Nichols. Date of service: 12/01/2014. [9332447] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 12/01/2014 05:51 PM]
November 29, 2014 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols response opposing motion (motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 11/29/2014. [9329997] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 11/29/2014 04:02 PM]
November 23, 2014 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/02/2015. Date of service: 11/23/2014. [9323238] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 11/23/2014 02:19 AM]
November 19, 2014 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/19/2014. [9319541] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 11/19/2014 04:00 PM]
October 16, 2014 Filing 2 Streamlined request by Appellant Charles Nichols to extend time to file the opening brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Charles Nichols opening brief is due 12/02/2014. Appellees Edmund G. Brown Jr. and Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General answering brief is due 01/02/2015. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [9278766] (DO)
May 29, 2014 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APPELLANT IN PRO SE AND COUNSEL FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/26/2014. Transcript due 09/24/2014. Appellant Charles Nichols opening brief due 11/03/2014. Appellees Edmund G. Brown Jr. and Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General answering brief due 12/03/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9112138] (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Nichols v. Gavin Newsom, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES NICHOLS
Represented By: Charles Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Megan Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?