Shawn Hedlin v. Ron Barnes
Petitioner / Appellant: SHAWN PAUL HEDLIN
Respondent / Appellee: RON BARNES, Warden
Case Number: 15-16635
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2016 Filing 3 Filed order (JEROME FARRIS and JAY S. BYBEE) The request for a certificate of appealability is denied because appellant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2); see also Miller-El v. Cockrell, 537 U.S. 322, 327 (2003). Any pending motions are denied as moot. DENIED. [9936645] (Trierweiler, Nicole) [Entered: 04/12/2016 02:23 PM]
September 1, 2015 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Shawn Paul Hedlin Motion for certificate of appealability. Date of service: 09/01/2015. [9667065] [15-16635] (Letarte, Diane) [Entered: 09/01/2015 01:17 AM]
August 18, 2015 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 08/06/2015. Record on appeal included: Yes. [9650409] (SML) [Entered: 08/18/2015 09:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shawn Hedlin v. Ron Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SHAWN PAUL HEDLIN
Represented By: Diane Letarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RON BARNES, Warden
Represented By: Allen R. Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?