State of Hawaii, et al v. Donald Trump, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: STATE OF HAWAII and ISMAIL ELSHIKH
Defendant - Appellant,: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, REX W. TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 17-15589
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 21, 2017 STATE OF HAWAII V. DONALD TRUMP

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2017 17 Added attorney Jeffrey Bryan Wall for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS U.S. Department of State Donald J. Trump, in case 17-15589. [10381524] (SW) [Entered: 04/03/2017 03:36 PM]
April 3, 2017 16 Added attorney Lowell Sturgill Jr. for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS U.S. Department of State Donald J. Trump, in case 17-15589. [10381516] (SW) [Entered: 04/03/2017 03:35 PM]
April 3, 2017 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey B. Wall for Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, USA and USDHS. Date of service: 04/03/2017. [10381232] [17-15589] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 04/03/2017 02:22 PM]
April 3, 2017 14 Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and ANDREW D. HURWITZ) Appellants’ unopposed motion to expedite the briefing and consideration of a motion to stay and to expedite the briefing and consideration of the merits of this preliminary injunction appeal (Docket Entry No. [12]) is granted. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and the motion for a stay pending appeal are due April 7, 2017; the answering brief and the response to the motion for a stay pending appeal are due April 21, 2017; and the optional reply brief and the reply in support of the motion for a stay pending appeal are due April 28, 2017. Any amicus briefs are due April 21, 2017. The parties’ request for expedited argument is granted. This case shall be heard on the calendar for May 2017, taking into account the limited dates the parties have advised they are available for argument. See 9th Cir. Gen. Order 3.3(g). This case shall be heard by a panel composed of three members of this court. See 9th Cir. Gen. Order 3.3(h). [10381034] (ME) [Entered: 04/03/2017 01:18 PM]
April 3, 2017 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, USA and USDHS. Date of service: 04/03/2017. [10380468] [17-15589] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 04/03/2017 09:56 AM]
March 31, 2017 12 Filed (ECF) Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, USA and USDHS Unopposed Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 03/31/2017. [10379547] [17-15589] (Swingle, Sharon) [Entered: 03/31/2017 02:46 PM]
March 31, 2017 11 Added attorney Colleen Sinzdak for Ismail Elshikh State of Hawaii, in case 17-15589. [10379281] (SW) [Entered: 03/31/2017 01:09 PM]
March 31, 2017 10 Added attorney Neal Katyal for Ismail Elshikh State of Hawaii, in case 17-15589. [10379276] (SW) [Entered: 03/31/2017 01:07 PM]
March 31, 2017 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Colleen Elizabeth Roh Sinzdak for Appellees Ismail Elshikh and State of Hawaii. Date of service: 03/31/2017. [10379062] [17-15589] (Sinzdak, Colleen) [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:50 AM]
March 31, 2017 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Neal Kumar Katyal for Appellees Ismail Elshikh and State of Hawaii. Date of service: 03/31/2017. [10379042] [17-15589] (Sinzdak, Colleen) [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:43 AM]
March 31, 2017 7 Added attorney Anne Murphy for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS U.S. Department of State Donald J. Trump, in case 17-15589. [10378822] (SW) [Entered: 03/31/2017 10:34 AM]
March 31, 2017 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Anne Murphy for Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, USA and USDHS. Date of service: 03/31/2017. [10378728] [17-15589] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 03/31/2017 10:07 AM]
March 31, 2017 5 Added attorney H. Thomas Byron III for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS U.S. Department of State Donald J. Trump, in case 17-15589. [10378693] (SW) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:56 AM]
March 31, 2017 4 Added attorney Sharon Swingle for USA John F. Kelly Rex W. Tillerson USDHS U.S. Department of State Donald J. Trump, in case 17-15589. [10378686] (SW) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:52 AM]
March 31, 2017 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of H. Thomas Byron III for Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, USA and USDHS. Date of service: 03/31/2017. [10378647] [17-15589] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:34 AM]
March 31, 2017 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sharon Marie Swingle for Appellants John F. Kelly, Rex W. Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, USA and USDHS. Date of service: 03/31/2017. [10378601] [17-15589] (Swingle, Sharon) [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:15 AM]
March 30, 2017 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. Circuit Rule 3-3. [10378209] (RT) [Entered: 03/30/2017 04:20 PM]

Search for this case: State of Hawaii, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Alexander Biays Bowerman
Represented By: Douglas Chin
Represented By: Kimberly Tsumoto Guidry
Represented By: Donna H. Kalama
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Represented By: Deirdre Marie-Iha
Represented By: Robert Tadao Nakatsuji
Represented By: Thomas Schmidt
Represented By: Colleen Sinzdak
Represented By: Sara Solow
Represented By: Clyde James Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: ISMAIL ELSHIKH
Represented By: Alexander Biays Bowerman
Represented By: Douglas Chin
Represented By: Kimberly Tsumoto Guidry
Represented By: Donna H. Kalama
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Represented By: Deirdre Marie-Iha
Represented By: Robert Tadao Nakatsuji
Represented By: Thomas Schmidt
Represented By: Colleen Sinzdak
Represented By: Sara Solow
Represented By: Clyde James Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: REX W. TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?